Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:18-bk-23538

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert D Drain
Case #: 7:20-ap-06423
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2020
Terminated:Feb 11, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wing Hing Shoes Factory Ltd.
Represented By
Wing Hing Shoes Factory Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kmart Holding Corporation
3333 Beverly Road
Hoffman Estates, IL 60179
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sears, Roebuck and Co.
3333 Beverly Road
Hoffman Estates, IL 60179
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, February 11, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 02/11 12:42 PM
Adversary Case 7:20-ap-6423 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
3 3 notice Notice, Dismissal Wed 02/10 2:29 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Kmart Holding Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co..(McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, July 06, 2020
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference TO BE DETERMINED (Use with Supervisor Approval ONLY) Mon 07/06 3:23 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office. Pre-Trial date to be determined by Court Order. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 06/30 2:44 PM
Adversary case 20-06423 Complaint against Wing Hing Shoes Factory Ltd. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Kmart Holding Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B