Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:W Scott Hardy
Case #: 2:20-cv-00985
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2020
Terminated:Dec 17, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 28, 2020 5:39 AM EST
Defendant
JEFFREY MARTIN
Represented By
Sarah J. Simkin
Pennsylvania Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Scott A. Bradley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
ROBERT MCGRAW
Represented By
Sarah J. Simkin
Pennsylvania Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Scott A. Bradley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
FRANK PAWLOWSKI
Represented By
Sarah J. Simkin
Pennsylvania Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Scott A. Bradley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
TROY STEINHAUSER
Represented By
Sarah J. Simkin
Pennsylvania Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Scott A. Bradley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
JANICE WILSON
Represented By
Sarah J. Simkin
Pennsylvania Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Scott A. Bradley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
JORDAN BROWN
Represented By
Alexander B Wright
Law Offices Of Timothy P. O'Brien
contact info
Margaret Schuetz Coleman
Law Offices Of Timothy P. O'Brien
contact info
Steven M. Barth
Barth & Associates
contact info
Timothy P. O'Brien
Law Offices Of Timothy P. O'Brien
contact info

GPO Oct 10 2024
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 141 Motion to Re-open Expert Discovery. See Memorandum Order for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 10/10/2024. (ck) Modified text on 10/10/2024. (ck)
GPO Oct 10 2024
MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that 143 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, which the Court construes as Defendants' motion for leave to file a motion for judgment on the pleadings pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c), is DENIED. See Memorandum Order for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 10/10/24. (lwp)
GPO Nov 18 2024
1/18/24. (kw)MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 204 Plaintiff's Motion Regarding Jury Selection as follows: (1) the Motion is DENIED to the extent that Plaintiff requests the Court to utilize a juror questionnaire; (2) the Motion is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff has been permitted to submit proposed voir dire questions, which the Court will review, and any appropriate questions will be included along with the Court's standard voir dire; (3) the Motion is GRANTED to the extent that the Court will conduct voir dire in open court, but it will conduct individual voir dire privately concerning certain matters. During individual voir dire, counsel will be afforded the opportunity to ask follow-up questions as the Court deems appropriate under the circumstances; and, (4) the Motion is DENIED to the extent that Plaintiff seeks to limit the Court's voir dire questioning in any manner. See Memorandum Order for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 1
GPO Dec 10 2024
MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that, for the reasons set forth in full on the record this day, the motions for judgment as a matter of law pursuant to Rule 50(a), filed by Plaintiff (Docket No. 271) and by Defendants (Docket No. 272), are both denied. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 12/10/2024. (kas)
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
295 295 misc Transcript Tue 05/06 10:42 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re Jury Trial--Verdict held on December 12, 2024 before Judge W. Scott Hardy. Court Reporter Deborah Ann Betzler, Telephone number 412-330-1365. Tape Number: debbetz917@gmail.com. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 5/13/2025. Redaction Request due 5/27/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2025. (dab)
Related: [-]
294 294 misc Transcript Tue 05/06 10:40 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re Jury Trial held on December 11, 2024--PM before Judge W. Scott Hardy. Court Reporter Deborah Ann Betzler, Telephone number 412-330-1365. Tape Number: debbetz917@gmail.com. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 5/13/2025. Redaction Request due 5/27/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2025. (dab)
Related: [-]
293 293 misc Transcript Tue 05/06 10:38 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re Jury Trial held on December 10, 2024 -- AM before Judge W. Scott Hardy. Court Reporter Deborah Ann Betzler, Telephone number 412-330-1365. Tape Number: debbetz917@gmail.com. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 5/13/2025. Redaction Request due 5/27/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2025. (dab)
Related: [-]
292 292 misc Transcript Tue 05/06 10:37 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re Jury Trial held on December 9, 2024--AM before Judge W. Scott Hardy. Court Reporter Deborah Ann Betzler, Telephone number 412-330-1365. Tape Number: debbetz917@gmail.com. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 5/13/2025. Redaction Request due 5/27/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2025. (dab)
Related: [-]
291 291 misc Transcript Tue 05/06 10:35 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re Jury Trial held on December 6, 2024 before Judge W. Scott Hardy. Court Reporter Deborah Ann Betzler, Telephone number 412-330-1365. Tape Number: debbetz917@gmail.com. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 5/13/2025. Redaction Request due 5/27/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2025. (dab)
Related: [-]
290 290 misc Transcript Tue 05/06 10:33 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re Jury Trial held on December 4, 2024 before Judge W. Scott Hardy. Court Reporter Deborah Ann Betzler, Telephone number 412-330-1365. Tape Number: debbetz917@gmail.com. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 5/13/2025. Redaction Request due 5/27/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2025. (dab)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
289 289 order Order Thu 05/01 3:36 PM
ORDER indicating that Plaintiff having filed the283 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or in the alternative Motion for a New Trial, and the parties having briefed the same at284 ,287 ,288 , IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall provide supplemental briefing as to the following: (1) whether Plaintiff's Rule 50(b) motion follows a motion under Rule 50(a) that was made after the party against whom such motion was made had been "fully heard," Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a)(1); (2) to the extent that the Court could construe Plaintiff's arguments concerning materiality, affidavit reconstruction, fabrication, and child statements as challenges to the appropriateness and/or completeness of the final jury instructions (in addition or as opposed to an argument regarding the sufficiency of evidence on which the jury's verdict was based), whether such challenges were preserved in the course of trial; and (3) any matters pertaining to preservation that may be relevant to the parties' briefing of items (1) and (2). The parties shall file such supplemental briefs on or before 5/22/2025, and such submissions shall be no longer than 15-pages, double-spaced 12pt. font. The parties may respond to each other's supplemental briefs on or before 5/29/2025, such responsive briefs to be no longer than 10-pages, double-spaced 12pt. font. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 5/1/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas)
Related: [-]