Missouri Western District Court
Judge:M Douglas Harpool
Case #: 6:20-mc-09001
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2020
Defendant
Lens.com, Inc.
Objector
5G Acquisitions, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company
Plaintiff
Alcon Vision LLC

GPO Sep 16 2020
ORDER finding as moot 8 motion for leave to file; granting 1 motion to compel. The Court hereby orders 5G Acquisitions, LLC, to produce all non-privileged responsive documents in its possession, custody, or control within 14 days. Signed on 09/16/2020 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Maerz, Mary)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion to Compel Wed 09/16 2:56 PM
ORDER finding as moot8 motion for leave to file; granting1 motion to compel. The Court hereby orders 5G Acquisitions, LLC, to produce all non-privileged responsive documents in its possession, custody, or control within 14 days. Signed on 09/16/2020 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Maerz, Mary)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2020
10 10 respm Suggestions in Support of Motion Fri 09/04 2:21 PM
SUGGESTIONS in support re8 MOTION for leave to file Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority filed by Robert Ryan Harding on behalf of Plaintiff Alcon Vision LLC. Related [+] (Harding, Robert)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
9 9 respm Response to Motion Tue 08/25 7:17 PM
RESPONSE to motion re8 MOTION for leave to file Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority filed by Blake D. Hill on behalf of Objector 5G Acquisitions, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company. Reply suggestions due by 9/8/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hill, Blake)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
8 8 motion Leave to File Document Tue 08/11 2:00 PM
MOTION for leave to file Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority filed by Robert Ryan Harding on behalf of Alcon Vision LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/25/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Harding, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
7 7 respm Reply Suggestions to Motion Wed 07/29 2:19 PM
REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re1 MOTION to compel Motion for Order to Compel Non-Party 5G Acquisitions, LLC to Comply with Properly Served Subpoena Plaintiff's Reply Suggestions in Support of Motion to Compel Non-Party 5G Acquisitions, LLC to Comply with Properly Served Subpoena filed by Robert Ryan Harding on behalf of Plaintiff Alcon Vision LLC. Related [+] (Harding, Robert)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Neal F. Burstyn
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
6 6 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/22 4:20 PM
ORDER granting5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Neal F. Burstyn for Alcon Vision LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/22 4:05 PM
Motion to allow Neal F. Burstyn to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6957990) filed by Robert Ryan Harding on behalf of Alcon Vision LLC. (Harding, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
4 4 respm Suggestions in Opposition to Motion Wed 07/15 11:43 PM
SUGGESTIONS in opposition re1 MOTION to compel Motion for Order to Compel Non-Party 5G Acquisitions, LLC to Comply with Properly Served Subpoena filed by Blake D. Hill on behalf of Objector 5G Acquisitions, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company. Reply suggestions due by 7/29/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Hill, Blake)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Transfer Order MDL No. 2626,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Transfer Order MDL No. 2626,
Att: 3 Went Declaration,
Att: 4 Morrison Declaration
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/15 11:11 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Blake D. Hill on behalf of 5G Acquisitions, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Attorney Blake D. Hill added to party 5G Acquisitions, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (pty:obj))(Hill, Blake)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
2 2 respm Suggestions in Support of Motion Wed 07/01 3:57 PM
SUGGESTIONS in support re1 MOTION to compel Motion for Order to Compel Non-Party 5G Acquisitions, LLC to Comply with Properly Served Subpoena Plaintiff's Suggestions in Support of Motion to Compel Non-Party 5G Acquisitions, LLC to Comply with Properly Served Subpoena filed by Robert Ryan Harding on behalf of Plaintiff Alcon Vision LLC. Related [+] (Harding, Robert)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 motion Compel Wed 07/01 3:55 PM
MOTION to compel Motion for Order to Compel Non-Party 5G Acquisitions, LLC to Comply with Properly Served Subpoena filed by Robert Ryan Harding on behalf of Alcon Vision LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/15/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Harding, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10