TECLAI v. PAULK
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | W Louis Sands |
Referred: | Stephen Hyles |
Case #: | 7:20-cv-00127 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Jul 02, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 23, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 29, 2020 4:40 AM EST |
Notice
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
|
|
Petitioner
YOWHANS TESFAMARIAM TECLAI
56976 IRWIN COUNTY DETENTION CTR 132 COTTON DR
OCILLA, GA 31774 |
|
Respondent
DAVID PAULK
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 23, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
order
Judgment
Tue 03/23 4:39 PM
JUDGMENT dismissing the case. (sbd) |
|
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 03/23 4:08 PM
ORDER accepting and adopting20 Report and Recommendations; granting16 Motion to Dismiss. The Petition is dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 3/23/2021. (sbd) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Report and Recommendation Order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Hearing
Mon 03/01 1:09 PM
ORDER denying as moot11 Motion for Discovery; granting12 Motion to Accept Reply; denying as moot14 Motion for Report and Recommendation; denying as moot15 Motion for Hearing. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re:16 MOTION to Dismiss. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 3-1-21. (rcg) |
|
Monday, February 08, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 02/08 11:40 AM
Mail Returned -17 Order for Response to Motion sent to Yowhans Tesfamariam Teclai returned as undeliverable. (sbd) |
|
Friday, January 29, 2021 | ||
utility
REMARK
Fri 01/29 4:28 PM
REMARK : Petitioner called and updated his address to 4229 Dunstan Court, St. Mountain, GA 30083. Clerk asked him to send in the change of address also by mail. (sbd) |
||
Thursday, January 28, 2021 | ||
utility
REMARK
Thu 01/28 12:12 PM
REMARK : Petitioner called and changed his address. New address is 1993 Kimberly Village Lane, Apt. F, Marietta, GA 30067. Clerk asked Petitioner to send in change of address in writing. (sbd) |
||
Monday, January 25, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 01/25 11:45 AM
Mail Returned -17 Order for Response to Motion sent to Yowhans Tesfamariam Teclai returned as undeliverable. (sbd) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order for Response to Motion
Tue 01/19 11:26 AM
ORDER notifying Petitioner of16 MOTION to Dismiss. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 1-19-21. (rcg) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss
Tue 01/19 9:30 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's application for habeas corpus relief by DAVID PAULK filed by AMELIA G HELMICK.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HELMICK, AMELIA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Order of Supervision | ||
Monday, January 04, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 01/04 2:10 PM
SECOND MOTION Requesting for Report and Recommendation and/or Hearing filed by YOWHANS TESFAMARIAM TECLAI. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(sbd) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, November 03, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Hearing
Tue 11/03 11:44 AM
MOTION for Report and Recommendation and/or Hearing Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 2243 filed by YOWHANS TESFAMARIAM TECLAI. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(sbd) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, October 13, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 10/13 9:57 AM
RESPONSE filed by DAVID PAULK re11 MOTION Freedom of Information Act Request/Motion for Discovery,12 MOTION for the Acceptance of Timely Reply (HELMICK, AMELIA) |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 09/24 11:16 AM
MOTION for the Acceptance of Timely Reply filed by YOWHANS TESFAMARIAM TECLAI. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(sbd) |
|
Att: 1 Copy of Envelope and Receipt, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, September 22, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 09/22 2:39 PM
Freedom of Information Act Request/Motion for Discovery filed by YOWHANS TESFAMARIAM TECLAI.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(sbd) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
10 | 10
respoth
Response in Opposition - Unrelated to a Motion
Tue 09/22 2:38 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 Response to Habeas Petition,1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus.(sbd) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, September 14, 2020 | ||
utility
REMARK
Mon 09/14 3:50 PM
REMARK : Petitioner called and advised that he sent his reply to the government's response to the Clerk's office in Valdosta and his document was returned to him by the U.S. Postal Service stating the address was vacant. He will resend his reply today. (rlw) |
||
Tuesday, August 25, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc)
Tue 08/25 1:43 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner must file any reply by September 4, 2020. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-25-20. (rcg) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time (Misc)
Tue 08/25 11:04 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the government's response to the petition filed by YOWHANS TESFAMARIAM TECLAI. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(sbd) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, August 20, 2020 | ||
utility
REMARK
Thu 08/20 3:11 PM
REMARK : Petitioner called re: extension of time. He is mailing in a request for extension of time to reply to the response. (sbd) |
||
Monday, August 10, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Mon 08/10 11:21 AM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by DAVID PAULK. Related document:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by YOWHANS TESFAMARIAM TECLAI.(SIMON, LANCE)Attorney LANCE SIMON added to party DAVID PAULK(pty:res) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Deportation Officer Michael White, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Notice to Appear; B - Form I-213, Record of Deportable/Inadmissible Alien; C - Decision of IJ dated 5-16-06; D - Cobb County Final Disposition Documents; E - Gwinnett County Final Disposition Documents; F - Notice of Hearing 7-19-18; G - Notice of Hearing 1-17-19; H - Notice of Hearing 4-17-19; I - Order of IJ dated 5-21-19; J - Filing Receipt for Appeal; K - BIA Decision of 10-30-19; L - Decision to Continue Detention 7-16-20 | ||
Friday, July 10, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order for Response (Habeas Petition)
Fri 07/10 10:11 AM
ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7-10-20. (rcg) |
|
5 | 5
respoth
Return Response (28:2241)
Fri 07/10 8:47 AM
RETURN RESPONSE re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by DAVID PAULK (HELMICK, AMELIA) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order for Response (Habeas Petition)
Tue 07/07 7:53 AM
ORDER for Respondents to File Responsive Pleading re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7-7-20. (rcg) |
|
Thursday, July 02, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Consent Form (28 USC 636) Sent
Thu 07/02 1:08 PM
Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to YOWHANS TESFAMARIAM TECLAI. (sbd) |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/02 1:07 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (sbd) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 07/02 1:07 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (Filing fee $ 5, Receipt number 42477), filed by YOWHANS TESFAMARIAM TECLAI.(sbd) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |