Andrade v. Loanpal, LLC et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Gloria M Navarro |
Referred: | Elayna J Youchah |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-01239 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 02, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 29, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 29, 2020 3:00 AM PST |
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fernanda N. Andrade
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Terminated: 10/27/2020
|
|
Defendant
Loanpal, LLC
Terminated: 11/23/2020
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, January 29, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
![]() ORDER granting26 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant TransUnion with Prejudice. (Trans Union was the only remaining defendant.) Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/29/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) |
|
26 | 26
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Trans Union LLC with Prejudice by Plaintiff Fernanda N. Andrade. (Hernandez, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, January 20, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
![]() ORDER Granting24 Stipulation of Dismissal of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/20/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) |
|
24 | 24
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. with Prejudice by Plaintiff Fernanda N. Andrade. (Hernandez, Kevin) |
|
Monday, November 23, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ORDER granting22 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Loanpal, LLC with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) |
|
22 | 22
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal of Loanpal, LLC by Plaintiff Fernanda N. Andrade. (Hernandez, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, October 27, 2020 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Parties
Tue 10/27 8:48 AM
Party Equifax Information Services, LLC terminated pursuant to21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (DRS) |
||
Monday, October 26, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Fernanda N. Andrade. of Equifax Information Services, LLC (Hernandez, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge
Wed 09/16 2:58 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRS) |
|
19 | 19
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER granting18 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/2/2021. Motions due by 3/4/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/16/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Fernanda N. Andrade. (Hernandez, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Loanpal, LLC.(Lepore, Timothy) |
|
Friday, September 04, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Trans Union LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion for Trans Union LLC added. (Bergh, Jennifer) |
|
15 | 15
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Trans Union LLC.(Bergh, Jennifer) |
|
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Rebecca Bergh on behalf of Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, August 06, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. added. (Sharples, Andrew) |
|
12 | 12
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/20/2020.(Sharples, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, August 04, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER granting9 Stipulation to Respond or Plead to Re:1 Complaint; Loanpal, LLC answer due 9/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) |
|
10 | 10
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Loanpal, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lepore, Timothy) |
|
9 | 9
![]() STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant Loanpal's Response to1 Complaint by Defendant Loanpal, LLC. (Lepore, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, July 23, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fernanda N. Andrade. Loanpal, LLC served on 7/21/2020. (Hernandez, Kevin) |
|
7 | 7
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fernanda N. Andrade. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 7/21/2020. (Hernandez, Kevin) |
|
Monday, July 13, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fernanda N. Andrade. Trans Union LLC waiver sent on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Hernandez, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, July 08, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fernanda N. Andrade. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Hernandez, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, July 02, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Loanpal, LLC, Trans Union LLC re1 Complaint,,. (DRS) |
|
3 | 3
order
Standing Order
Thu 07/02 12:58 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Fernanda N. Andrade. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hernandez, Kevin) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6068137) by Fernanda N. Andrade. Proof of service due by 9/30/2020. (Hernandez, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Thu 07/02 12:57 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (DRS) |