Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Elayna J Youchah
Case #: 2:20-cv-01239
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2020
Terminated:Jan 29, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 29, 2020 3:00 AM PST
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Jennifer L Braster
Naylor & Braster
contact info
Andrew J Sharples
Naylor & Braster Attorneys At Law, PLLC
contact info
Katherine A. Neben
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Represented By
Jennifer Rebecca Bergh
Quilling, Selander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser, P.C.
contact info
Trevor Waite
Alverson Taylor & Sanders
contact info
Plaintiff
Fernanda N. Andrade
Represented By
Kevin L. Hernandez
Law Office Of Kevin L. Hernandez
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Terminated: 10/27/2020
Defendant
Loanpal, LLC
Terminated: 11/23/2020
Represented By
Breane Page Stryker
The Amin Law Group
contact info
Timothy J Lepore
Ropers, Majeski, Kohn & Bentley
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, January 29, 2021
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/29 2:49 PM
ORDER granting26 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant TransUnion with Prejudice. (Trans Union was the only remaining defendant.) Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/29/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Stipulation Dismissal Fri 01/29 9:56 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Trans Union LLC with Prejudice by Plaintiff Fernanda N. Andrade. (Hernandez, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 01/20 5:43 PM
ORDER Granting24 Stipulation of Dismissal of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/20/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Stipulation Dismissal Wed 01/20 3:19 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. with Prejudice by Plaintiff Fernanda N. Andrade. (Hernandez, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 11/23 2:51 PM
ORDER granting22 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Loanpal, LLC with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Stipulation Dismissal Mon 11/23 12:03 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Loanpal, LLC by Plaintiff Fernanda N. Andrade. (Hernandez, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
utility Add and Terminate Parties Tue 10/27 8:48 AM
Party Equifax Information Services, LLC terminated pursuant to21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (DRS)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
21 21 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Mon 10/26 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Fernanda N. Andrade. of Equifax Information Services, LLC (Hernandez, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
20 20 notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Wed 09/16 2:58 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRS)
Related: [-]
19 19 4 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Wed 09/16 2:57 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting18 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/2/2021. Motions due by 3/4/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/16/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Wed 09/16 9:41 AM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Fernanda N. Andrade. (Hernandez, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2020
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/10 10:33 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Loanpal, LLC.(Lepore, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2020
16 16 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 09/04 1:29 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Trans Union LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion for Trans Union LLC added. (Bergh, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/04 1:27 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Trans Union LLC.(Bergh, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice Appearance Fri 09/04 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Rebecca Bergh on behalf of Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2020
13 13 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 08/06 8:50 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. added. (Sharples, Andrew)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/06 8:48 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/20/2020.(Sharples, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 08/05 9:41 AM
ORDER granting9 Stipulation to Respond or Plead to Re:1 Complaint; Loanpal, LLC answer due 9/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 08/04 2:36 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Loanpal, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lepore, Timothy)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Stipulation Tue 08/04 2:35 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant Loanpal's Response to1 Complaint by Defendant Loanpal, LLC. (Lepore, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 23, 2020
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/23 2:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fernanda N. Andrade. Loanpal, LLC served on 7/21/2020. (Hernandez, Kevin)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/23 2:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fernanda N. Andrade. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 7/21/2020. (Hernandez, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 07/13 2:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fernanda N. Andrade. Trans Union LLC waiver sent on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Hernandez, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 07/08 8:21 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fernanda N. Andrade. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Hernandez, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 07/02 1:02 PM
Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Loanpal, LLC, Trans Union LLC re1 Complaint,,. (DRS)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Standing Order Thu 07/02 12:58 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 07/02 12:54 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Fernanda N. Andrade. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hernandez, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/02 12:24 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6068137) by Fernanda N. Andrade. Proof of service due by 9/30/2020. (Hernandez, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Loanpal, LLC,
Att: 3 Summons Equifax Information Services, LLC,
Att: 4 Summons Experian Information Solutions, Inc.,
Att: 5 Summons Trans Union LLC
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 07/02 12:57 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (DRS)
Related: [-]