California Northern District Court
Judge:Lucy H Koh
Referred: Paul Singh Grewal
Case #: 5:14-cv-02269
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:May 15, 2014
Terminated:Apr 06, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 20, 2015 8:05 AM PST
Defendant
Apple Inc.
Represented By
Kai Shields Bartolomeo
Morrison Foerster LLP
contact info
Tiffany Cheung
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
David Michael Walsh, Esq.
Morrison & Foerster
contact info
Interested Party
Adam Backhaut
Represented By
Theodore H. Chase
Audet And Partners, LLP
contact info
Joshua Caleb Ezrin
Audet & Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Adrienne Moore
Represented By
Roy Arie Katriel
The Katriel Law Firm
contact info

GPO Jun 03 2014
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 13 Motion to Relate Case. Case 14-cv-02285 is related to this case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
GPO Nov 10 2014
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
GPO Nov 13 2014
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on November 13, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
GPO Feb 27 2015
ORDER RE JCMS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on February 27, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
GPO Mar 02 2015
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 2, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
GPO Mar 16 2015
ORDER RE PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 16, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
GPO Mar 20 2015
ORDER RE REFERRAL JUDGE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 20, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
GPO May 01 2015
ORDER DENYING MOORE'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER AND GRANTING APPLE'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying (44) in case 5:14-cv-02269-LHK ; granting (45) in case 5:14-cv-02269-LHK; granting (43) in case 5:14-cv-02285-LHK (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
GPO Jun 03 2015
ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part (63) in case 5:14-cv-02285-LHK (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2015)
GPO Aug 04 2015
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 55 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 56 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 59 Stipulation; denying 80 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 82 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 91 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 92 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 97 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 101 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
GPO Aug 04 2015
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 57 Motion to Certify Class; granting 98 Motion for Leave to File Surreply (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
GPO Nov 20 2015
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 128 Motion for Leave to File; denying 143 Motion for Leave to File (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
GPO Nov 24 2015
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 77 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
GPO Dec 03 2015
ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART RENEWED MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 161; granting-in-part 162 (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
GPO Mar 02 2016
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING THE PARTIES TO A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 2, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
GPO Mar 28 2016
STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S PERSONAL APPEARANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/28/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
GPO Apr 06 2016
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 6, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016) **THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THE CASE FILE** Modified on 4/6/2016 (sms, COURT STAFF).

1. iMessage deactivation problems earn Apple a federal lawsuit (arstechnica.com)
Submitted Wed 11/12/2014
2. Apple must confront lawsuit over lost texts (siliconbeat.com)
Submitted Wed 11/12/2014
3. Android user sues Apple for not delivering texts after she ditched her iPhone (venturebeat.com)
Submitted Mon 05/19/2014
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, April 11, 2016
180 180 appeal USCA Order Tue 04/12 8:37 AM
ORDER of USCA as to165 USCA Case Number 15-80209 Petitioners April 1, 2016 unopposed motion to withdraw the petition is granted. This petition is withdrawn. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). All pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk shall strike the provisionally sealed exhibits filed on December 4, 2015 and March 17, 2016. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2016
179 179 order Order Wed 04/06 3:36 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 6, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016) **THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THE CASE FILE** Modified on 4/6/2016 (sms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2016
178 178 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 04/04 9:49 PM
STIPULATION Stipulation Of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Adrienne Moore. (Katriel, Roy) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
Related: [-]