Member Case
Lead case is: 2:11-bk-15975

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Deborah J Saltzman
Case #: 2:11-bk-15987
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2011
Terminated:Jun 22, 2020

Debtor
Secured California Investments, Inc., Debtor
11620 Wilshire Blvd Fl 10
Los Angeles, CA 90025-6821
Represented By
Jeffrey W Dulberg
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Jeffrey N Pomerantz
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
725 S Figueroa St., 26th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Queenie K Ng
contact info
Russell Clementson
contact info
Kenneth G Lau
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/02/2013 7:47 PM PDT
Friday, February 11, 2011
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:11-bk-15987) [misc,volp11] (1039.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18785526. Fee amount 1039.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1039 Filed by Secured California Investments, Inc. Schedule A due 02/25/2011. Schedule B due 02/25/2011. Schedule C due 02/25/2011. Schedule D due 02/25/2011. Schedule E due 02/25/2011. Schedule F due 02/25/2011. Schedule G due 02/25/2011. Schedule H due 02/25/2011. Schedule I due 02/25/2011. Schedule J due 02/25/2011. Statement of Financial Affairs due 02/25/2011. Statement - Form 22B Due: 02/25/2011. Incomplete Filings due by 02/25/2011. (Dulberg, Jeffrey) CORRECTION: Deadlines terminated re: Schedule C, Schedule I, Schedule J, Statement-Form 22B. Not required for this filing. Deficient for Aty Disclosure Stmt. due 02/25/2011. Corp. Ownership Stat. due 02/25/2011. Declaration Re Sched due 02/25/2011. Summary of Schedules due 02/25/2011. Modified on 2/14/2011 (Groves, Monica).
Related: [-]
2 2 Matrix (Mailing List) , Verification of creditor matrix Filed by Debtor Secured California Investments, Inc.. (Dulberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]