New Jersey District Court
Judge:Georgette Castner
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:20-cv-08217
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2020
Re-opened:Dec 01, 2021
Terminated:Dec 09, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 29, 2020 4:39 AM EST
Defendant
CERTIFIED CREDIT & COLLECTION BUREAU
Represented By
LAWRENCE J. BARTEL, III
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1 to 10
Defendant
LISA M. MALTESE-SCHAAF
Represented By
LAWRENCE J. BARTEL, III
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
JOANNE M. POSSUMATO
Represented By
LAWRENCE J. BARTEL, III
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
DIANA M. SCHOBEL
Plaintiff
VALBONA LAHU
Represented By
YONGMOON KIM
Kim Law Firm LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Friday, December 09, 2022
31 31 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Fri 12/09 12:57 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice due to lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/8/2022. (mg, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
30 30 misc Letter Wed 11/30 1:14 PM
Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel Requesting Clarification of Text Order re 29 Order,.(STERN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Status Letter (Nov. 18, 2022)
29 29 order Order Wed 11/30 9:28 AM
TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon review of the parties' e-mail correspondence indicating their concurrence that the Court issue an Order dismissing this action without prejudice. By December 7, 2022, the parties shall file a proposed stipulation of voluntary dismissal. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/30/2022. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
28 28 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/27 9:48 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) (filed with leave per Text Minute Entry on April 20, 2022) against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by VALBONA LAHU.(STERN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Letter dated July 20, 2019)
Thursday, April 21, 2022
order Order Thu 04/21 5:21 PM
TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on review of its docket. In response to a court order, on December 8, 2021, Plaintiffs filed correspondence indicating that they did not oppose consolidating this case with Hughes v. Certified Credit & Collection Bureau , No. 19-18819 for pre-trial purposes. (ECF No.22 .) The Court accordingly consolidates this case with Hughes v. Certified Credit & Collection Bureau , No. 19-18819 for pre-trial purposes. The Court further understands that Defendant intends to file a consolidated motion to dismiss by May 27, 2022. Should Defendant file that motion, it shall brief whether Plaintiffs have standing in light of TransUnion, LLC v. Ramirez , 141 S. Ct. 2190 (2021). So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 04/21/2022. (jdb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 04/21 5:28 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (jdb, )
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic Message Fri 04/22 3:56 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Case Closed in Error, Please Disregard. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 04/20 3:02 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 4/20/2022. Defendant has leave to file a motion to dismiss by 5/27/2022; returnable 6/21/2022. Plaintiff's request22 for leave to re-file her Second Amended Class Action Complaint correcting its title in the caption to "Second Amended Class Action Complaint" is granted. (jem)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
order Order Reassigning Case Mon 04/11 1:18 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Georgette Castner for all further proceedings. Judge Michael A. Shipp no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/11/2022. (gxh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
order Order Wed 03/16 2:27 PM
TEXT ORDER: Status Conference via telephone set for 4/20/2022 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. The Court shall circulate dial-in information for the telephone conference at a later date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/16/2022. (mm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 25, 2022
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 02/25 1:51 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 2/25/2022. (mm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
order Order Tue 02/08 3:30 PM
TEXT ORDER: Telephone set for 2/23/2022 at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. The Court shall circulate dial-in information for the telephone conference at a later date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/8/2022. (mm)
Related: [-]
order Order Tue 02/08 5:10 PM
TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 2/23/2022, is hereby RESCHEDULED to 2/25/2022 at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. The Court shall circulate dial-in information for the telephone conference at a later date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/8/2022. (mm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
22 22 misc Letter Wed 12/08 4:12 PM
Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel Consenting to Consolidation and Requesting Leave to File Corrected Complaint re 21 Order Reopening Case,. (STERN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
order Order Reopening Case Wed 12/01 4:01 PM
TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on review of its docket. On November 29, 2021, Plaintiff filed a Second Amended Complaint. The Court thus directs the Clerk to reopen this matter. Separately, by December 9, 2021, Plaintiff shall show cause as to why this case should not be consolidated with Civil Action No. 19-18819 So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/1/2021. (gxh)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/29 2:33 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by VALBONA LAHU.(STERN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Letter dated 7/2/2019
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
19 19 1 pgs order Order Wed 10/27 3:21 PM
ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's8 Amended Complaint without Prejudice. Plaintiff may refile an amended complaint by 11/29/2021. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/27/2021. (jmh)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 10/27 4:07 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per19 Order. (jmh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
18 18 2 pgs order Order Tue 06/01 12:29 PM
LETTER ORDER granting the request for an extension of time, until 6/01/2021, to file Reply Briefs in the consolidated matters. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/01/2021. (jem)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
17 17 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/03 9:28 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by VALBONA LAHU re10 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints (CONSOLIDATED) (STERN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 16, 2021
16 16 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/16 1:55 PM
LETTER ORDER granting Mr. Hersh's request for a two week adjournment of the Defendant's Consolidated10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/16/2021. (jmh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/16 1:55 PM
Reset Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints (CONSOLIDATED) . Motion set for 5/17/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
15 15 misc Letter Thu 04/15 12:22 PM
Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel Requesting Adjournment of Motion (WITH CONSENT) re10 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints (CONSOLIDATED) . (STERN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 05, 2021
14 14 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/05 1:49 PM
LETTER ORDER granting the request to adjourn the Motions to Dismiss until 5/03/2021 and extending the deadline for filing responses to 4/19/2021 and any reply to 4/26/2021. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/05/2021. (jem)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/05 1:51 PM
Reset Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints (CONSOLIDATED) . Motion set for 5/3/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 03, 2021
13 13 misc Letter Sat 04/03 2:28 PM
Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel Requesting Adjournment of Motion (WITH CONSENT) re10 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints (CONSOLIDATED) . (STERN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 04/03 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP D. STERN on behalf of VALBONA LAHU (STERN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 21, 2021
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Sun 03/21 9:19 PM
Reset Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints (CONSOLIDATED) . Motion set for 4/19/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 20, 2021
11 11 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Sat 03/20 9:41 PM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re10 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints (CONSOLIDATED) . (KIM, YONGMOON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/11 8:34 AM
Set Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints (CONSOLIDATED) . Motion set for 4/5/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
10 10 motion Dismiss Wed 03/10 6:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints (CONSOLIDATED) by CERTIFIED CREDIT & COLLECTION BUREAU, LISA M. MALTESE-SCHAAF, JOANNE M. POSSUMATO, DIANA M. SCHOBEL. Responses due by 3/22/2021(BARTEL, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibits 1 through 4,
Att: 3 Hughes Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Lahu Proposed order,
Att: 5 Madlinger Proposed Order
Friday, January 08, 2021
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 01/11 9:33 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 1/8/2021. No later than 2/16/2021 a Consolidated Dispositive Motion is to be filed in 19-18819 (MAS), 20-8217 (MAS) and 20-13461 (MAS). (mm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
9 9 order Order Wed 12/23 11:30 AM
TEXT ORDER A telephone conference to discuss the consolidation of Civil Actions Nos. 19-18819 20-13461 20-8217 is set for January 8, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. The Court will provide counsel dial in information prior to the conference. Please mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/23/20. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/04 10:42 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CERTIFIED CREDIT & COLLECTION BUREAU, JOHN DOES 1 to 10, LISA M. MALTESE-SCHAAF, JOANNE M. POSSUMATO, DIANA M. SCHOBEL, filed by VALBONA LAHU.(KIM, YONGMOON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 02, 2020
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 11/02 5:19 PM
Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert no longer assigned to case. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
7 7 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Wed 10/07 10:31 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint. Attorney LAWRENCE J. BARTEL, III for CERTIFIED CREDIT & COLLECTION BUREAU,LAWRENCE J. BARTEL, III for LISA M. MALTESE-SCHAAF,LAWRENCE J. BARTEL, III for JOANNE M. POSSUMATO added. (BARTEL, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Wed 10/07 2:04 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by JOANNE M. POSSUMATO, CERTIFIED CREDIT & COLLECTION BUREAU, LISA M. MALTESE-SCHAAF has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/21/2020. (jem)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/25 11:29 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VALBONA LAHU. LISA M. MALTESE-SCHAAF waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (KIM, YONGMOON)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/25 11:27 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VALBONA LAHU. DIANA M. SCHOBEL waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (KIM, YONGMOON)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/25 11:26 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VALBONA LAHU. JOANNE M. POSSUMATO waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (KIM, YONGMOON)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/25 11:23 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VALBONA LAHU. CERTIFIED CREDIT & COLLECTION BUREAU waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (KIM, YONGMOON)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 07/06 11:05 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CERTIFIED CREDIT & COLLECTION BUREAU, LISA M. MALTESE-SCHAAF, JOANNE M. POSSUMATO, DIANA M. SCHOBEL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr, )
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 07/06 11:04 AM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
1 1 COMPLAINT against CERTIFIED CREDIT & COLLECTION BUREAU, JOHN DOES 1 to 10, LISA M. MALTESE-SCHAAF, JOANNE M. POSSUMATO, DIANA M. SCHOBEL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11026465) with JURY DEMAND, filed by VALBONA LAHU.(KIM, YONGMOON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet