Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 8:20-cv-50952
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2020
Terminated:Jul 09, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Jan 03, 2021 5:32 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
DANIEL GREVELY


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, July 09, 2021
2 2 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 07/09 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DANIEL GREVELY. (case closed) (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/07 11:38 AM
MASTER SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. (lsd)
Related: [-]