Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Gregory A Presnell
Referred: David A Baker
Case #: 6:20-cv-01210
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2020
Terminated:Aug 25, 2022
Last checked: Monday Aug 22, 2022 8:08 PM EDT
Counter Claimant
Jomy Sterling
Represented By
Thomas Herbert Stanton
Stanton Ip Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Shaun Patrick Keough
Keough Law, PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Tyler Gnass
Represented By
Ian Johnson
Losey PLLC
contact info
Robert Jett Rubin
Losey PLLC
contact info
George R. Coe
Losey PLLC
contact info
Louis Raymond Gigliotti, Jr.
Louis R. Gigliotti, Jr., PA
contact info
Adam Colby Losey
Losey PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
David Ndalamba
Represented By
Ian Johnson
Losey PLLC
contact info
Robert Jett Rubin
Losey PLLC
contact info
George R. Coe
Losey PLLC
contact info
Louis Raymond Gigliotti, Jr.
Louis R. Gigliotti, Jr., PA
contact info
Adam Colby Losey
Losey PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Jomy Sterling
Represented By
Thomas Herbert Stanton
Stanton Ip Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Shaun Patrick Keough
Keough Law, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Shaun Patrick Keough
Plaintiff
David Ndalamba
Represented By
Ian Johnson
Losey PLLC
contact info
Robert Jett Rubin
Losey PLLC
contact info
George R. Coe
Losey PLLC
contact info
Louis Raymond Gigliotti, Jr.
Louis R. Gigliotti, Jr., PA
contact info
Adam Colby Losey
Losey PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Starline Media, Inc.
Represented By
Ian Johnson
Losey PLLC
contact info
Robert Jett Rubin
Losey PLLC
contact info
George R. Coe
Losey PLLC
contact info
Louis Raymond Gigliotti, Jr.
Louis R. Gigliotti, Jr., PA
contact info
Adam Colby Losey
Losey PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Counter Claimant
Star Status Group
Terminated: 02/10/2022
Represented By
Thomas Herbert Stanton
Stanton Ip Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Shaun Patrick Keough
Keough Law, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Star Status Group
Terminated: 02/10/2022
Represented By
Thomas Herbert Stanton
Stanton Ip Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Shaun Patrick Keough
Keough Law, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Elisha Trice
Terminated: 03/29/2022
an individual resident of Florida 4315 E. Amsterdam St.
Ocala, FL 34453


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
251 251 NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION of Defendant's exhibits re238 Exhibit List,211 Exhibit List from the Jury Trial held April 4-6, 2022 and the motion hearing held 8/4/22 before the Honorable Gregory A. Presnell. Following notice to counsel the exhibits have been destroyed. (AKC)
Related: [-]
250 250 NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION of Court's Exhibits212 Exhibit List,149 Exhibit List from the Jury Trial held April 4-6, 2022 and the Show Cause hearing held 2/9/22 before the Honorable Gregory A. Presnell. Following notice to counsel the exhibits have been destroyed. (AKC)
Related: [-]
notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/05 9:55 AM
NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION of Court's Exhibits212 Exhibit List,149 Exhibit List from the Jury Trial held April 4-6, 2022 and the Show Cause hearing held 2/9/22 before the Honorable Gregory A. Presnell. Following notice to counsel the exhibits have been destroyed. (AKC)
Related: [-]
notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/05 9:58 AM
NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION of Defendant's exhibits re238 Exhibit List,211 Exhibit List from the Jury Trial held April 4-6, 2022 and the motion hearing held 8/4/22 before the Honorable Gregory A. Presnell. Following notice to counsel the exhibits have been destroyed. (AKC)
Related: [-]