Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02036 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Atlantic Sea Pride, Inc.
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02028 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. S&B Commodities, Ltd.
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02029 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Santa Barbara Smokehouse Inc.
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02030 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Sea Salt Lobster
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02031 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Seacrest Seafood
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02032 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Shun Jeng Company
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02033 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Star Food Products, Inc.
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02034 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Tai Foong Int'l Ltd.
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02035 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. O'Neals Sea Harvest Inc.
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02010 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Hilton Hotels Corporation
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02037 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Bluenose Seafood Inc.
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02038 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Champlin's Seafood
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02039 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Chester River Clam Company
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02040 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Chris Long
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02041 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Cleanfish, Inc.
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02042 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. D&D Seafood Corporation
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02043 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Driftwood Fisheries, Inc.
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02044 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. F.J. O'Hara & Sons, Inc.
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02017 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Nature's Catch, Inc.
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02027 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Rio Import & Export Ltd.
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02009 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Health Pass
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02011 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Ideal Fish Market Co.
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02012 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Independence Fish Company
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02013 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Inedis LLC
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02014 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Ipswich Shellfish Company, Inc.
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02015 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. John Nagle Co.
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02016 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Marseafoods International, Inc.
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02018 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Network Voice & Data
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02019 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. New London Seafood Dist
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02020 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. New Zealand Seafood Marketing
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02021 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Ocean Edge Foods
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02022 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Paetec Communications, Inc.
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02023 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Paiva's Shellfish, Inc.
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02024 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. PK's Seafood
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02025 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Purdy Fisheries Limited
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:12-ap-02026 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Richards Freight/Seafood LLC
|
11/28/2012
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01188 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Nico Commodityes, SA DE CV
|
02/07/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01189 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Lockwood & Winant Seafood LLC
|
02/07/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01186 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Seafreeze Limited
|
02/07/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01185 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Phillips Foods, Inc.
|
02/07/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01187 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Sea-Trek Enterprises, Inc.
|
02/07/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01191 - O'Connell, as Post-Confirmation Trust Adminis v. Winkler
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01192 - Richard E. O'Connell, as Post-Confirmation Tr v. Alco East, Inc.
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01193 - Richard E. O'Connell, as Post-Confirmation Tr v. Coastal Pride Company, Inc.
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01194 - Richard E. O'Connell, as Post-Confirmation Tr v. Fishork, Inc.
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01196 - Richard E. O'Connell, as Post-Confirmation Tr v. FV Evening Prayer
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01198 - Richard E. O'Connell, as Post-Confirmation Tr v. Cubicles, Inc.
|
02/08/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01226 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Intersea Fisheries Ltd.
|
02/11/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01225 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Universal Seafood, Inc., G&G Seafood, Inc. d/b/a U
|
02/11/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01223 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Pt. Judith Fisherman's Company
|
02/11/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01227 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Ariel Seafoods Inc.
|
02/12/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01228 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. East Bay Seafood Co.
|
02/12/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01230 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Twin Tails Seafood Corp.
|
02/12/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01232 - O'Connell, as Post Consummation Trust Adminis v. Slavin et al
|
02/13/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01239 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Four Sea's Inc.
|
02/13/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01240 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Marder Trawling Inc.
|
02/13/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01241 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Seatrade International, Inc.
|
02/13/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01242 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Frank M. Flower & Sons, Inc.
|
02/13/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01243 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Sousa Seafood, Inc.
|
02/13/2013
|
Adversary
|
1:13-ap-01244 - O'Connell, in his capacity as Post Consummati v. Censea, Inc.
|
02/13/2013
|