Arizona District Court
Judge:Susan R Bolton
Case #: 2:20-cv-01358
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2020
Terminated:Feb 23, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 05, 2021 2:56 AM MST
Defendant
Arizona, State of
Represented By
Byron Jeffords Babione
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Stephanie Susan Elliott
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Defendant
Mike Deltrene
Represented By
Byron Jeffords Babione
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Stephanie Susan Elliott
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Defendant
Jack Lane
Represented By
Byron Jeffords Babione
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Stephanie Susan Elliott
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Defendant
Frank Milstead
Represented By
Byron Jeffords Babione
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Stephanie Susan Elliott
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Defendant
Mark Perkovich
Represented By
Byron Jeffords Babione
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Stephanie Susan Elliott
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Plaintiff
Taylor E Barlow
Represented By
Matthew Israel Barlow
Barlow Law Firm LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM MST
Friday, March 04, 2022
38 38 appeal USCA Mandate Mon 03/07 12:58 PM
MANDATE of USCA re:33 Notice of Appeal filed by Taylor E Barlow. AFFIRMED.(BAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo
Monday, March 29, 2021
36 36 appeal Transcript - Appeal Wed 03/31 5:01 PM
*( DUPLICATE FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT AT DOC. 32 ) - NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS proceedings for date of 02/11/2021 before Judge SUSAN R. BOLTON re:33 Notice of Appeal. [Court Reporter: Hilda E. Lopez, RMR, FCRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7256]. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/19/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2021. (RAP) *Modified to reference duplication and create docket entry relationship on 3/31/2021 (RAP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
35 35 misc Transcript Request Wed 03/24 8:42 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST [February 11, 2021] by Arizona, State of, Mike Deltrene, Jack Lane, Frank Milstead, Mark Perkovich for proceedings held on 02/11/2021, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Babione, Byron)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
34 34 appeal USCA Case Number Fri 03/19 4:44 PM
USCA Case Number re:33 Notice of Appeal. Case number 21-15499 Ninth Circuit. (LAD)
Related: [-]
33 33 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 03/19 1:56 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re:28 Clerks Judgment,27 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Taylor E Barlow. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-19270934. (Barlow, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 05, 2021
32 32 misc Transcript Mon 03/08 11:17 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS proceedings held on 02/11/2021, before Judge SUSAN R. BOLTON. [Court Reporter: Hilda E. Lopez, RMR, FCRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7256]. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/26/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2021. (RAP)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2021
31 31 misc Transcript Request Fri 02/26 2:13 PM
AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST pursuant to 30 Notice of Deficiency by Taylor E Barlow for proceedings held on 02/11/2021, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Barlow, Matthew)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Notice of Deficiency re Transcript Request Fri 02/26 1:58 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: AO43529 Transcript Request filed by Taylor E Barlow. Item 18 - ORDER: No box was checked for delivery instructions and an e-mail address was not provided where e-mail copy should be sent. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with applicable boxes checked under DELIVERY INSTRUCTIONS and provide an email address for delivery. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RAP)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Transcript Request Fri 02/26 1:28 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Taylor E Barlow for proceedings held on 02/11/2021, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Barlow, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
28 28 order Clerks Judgment Tue 02/23 3:28 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed February 23, 2021, judgment is hereby entered and this case is dismissed with prejudice. (SST)
Related: [-]
27 27 11 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 02/23 3:21 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc.17 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing Plaintiff's claims with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk to enter judgment accordingly. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/23/21. (SST)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
26 26 minutes Motion Hearing 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 02/11 3:44 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Susan R Bolton: Motion Hearing held on 2/11/2021. Argument held. IT IS ORDERED taking under advisement17 Motion to Dismiss. APPEARANCES: Matthew Barlow (appearing telephonically) for Plaintiff. Stephanie Elliott and Byron Babione (both appearing telephonically) for Defendants. Also present telephonically: Defendants Mark Perkovich and Jack Lane. (Court Reporter Hilda Lopez) Hearing held 10:33 AM to 10:55 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Objection Thu 02/11 9:56 AM
OBJECTION re:24 Notice (Other) by Plaintiff Taylor E Barlow. (Barlow, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 08, 2021
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/08 5:04 PM
NOTICE re: STATE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Arizona, State of, Mike Deltrene, Jack Lane, Frank Milstead, Mark Perkovich .(Elliott, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Thursday, January 28, 2021
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Hearing on Motion Thu 01/28 2:22 PM
ORDER granting22 State Defendants' Request for Oral Argument on State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. IT IS ORDERED setting oral argument on State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for February 11, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel shall not appear in person. Counsel are directed to call (866) 390-1828; Access code: 9667260 five minutes prior to the hearing. Counsel are advised that speaker phones are not permitted. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/28/21. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/26 1:24 PM
NOTICE re: NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT ON STATE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Arizona, State of, Mike Deltrene, Jack Lane, Frank Milstead, Mark Perkovich . (Elliott, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 01/25 5:08 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:17 First MOTION to Dismiss Case State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss filed by Arizona, State of, Mike Deltrene, Jack Lane, Frank Milstead, Mark Perkovich. (Elliott, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2021
20 20 respm Response to Motion Mon 01/11 5:04 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:17 First MOTION to Dismiss Case State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Taylor E Barlow.(Barlow, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
19 19 minutes ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order on Stipulation Tue 12/29 2:23 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the stipulation that Plaintiff Taylor E. Barlow file his Response Memorandum to State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by January 11, 2021 and for State Defendants' to file their Reply Memorandum by January 25, 2021. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/29/20. (SST)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
18 18 misc Stipulation Mon 12/28 3:02 PM
STIPULATION First Request by Arizona, State of, Mike Deltrene, Jack Lane, Frank Milstead, Mark Perkovich.(Babione, Byron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER
Friday, December 11, 2020
17 17 motion Dismiss Case Fri 12/11 4:59 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Case State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Arizona, State of, Mike Deltrene, Jack Lane, Frank Milstead, Mark Perkovich.(Elliott, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - ALJ Decision 4/2/18
Thursday, November 19, 2020
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/19 2:08 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Taylor E Barlow.(Barlow, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2020
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 11/16 10:52 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulation to File an Amended Complaint and Response (Doc.14 ), and that Plaintiff file an Amended Complaint by November 19, 2020, and State Defendants to file a responsive pleading or motion to dismiss by December 11, 2020. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/16/20. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 12, 2020
14 14 misc Stipulation Thu 11/12 12:36 PM
STIPULATION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RESPONSE (First Request) by Arizona, State of, Mike Deltrene, Jack Lane, Frank Milstead, Mark Perkovich.(Elliott, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
13 13 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges Wed 10/21 7:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan R Bolton. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 20-1358 PHX-SRB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
12 12 misc 25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge Wed 10/21 7:41 AM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 10/02 9:29 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties at ECF No.9 , IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall have until November 16, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 10/1/20. (SST)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
9 9 misc Stipulation Thu 10/01 3:07 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint [First Request] by Arizona, State of, Mike Deltrene, Jack Lane, Frank Milstead, Mark Perkovich.(Babione, Byron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 service Service Executed Thu 10/01 9:35 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Taylor E Barlow: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 10/01/2020 to Frank Milstead . (Barlow, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
7 7 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 09/29 2:23 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. That this case be reassigned, by lot, to another Judge in the District of Arizona. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Camille D. Bibles. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV 20-01358 PHX-CDB. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 9/29/20.(MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Instruction,
Att: 2 Consent Form
misc 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline Tue 09/29 2:23 PM
Magistrate Election Form Deadline. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 28, 2020
6 6 service Service Executed Mon 09/28 4:20 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Taylor E Barlow: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 09/03/2020 to State of Arizona AZ POST, DPS, Jack Lane, Mike Deltenre, Mark Perkovich .(Barlow, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waiver of Summons AZPOST,
Att: 2 Waiver of Summons DPS,
Att: 3 Waiver of Summons Jack Lane,
Att: 4 Waiver of Summons Mike Deltenre,
Att: 5 Waiver of Summons Mark Perkovich
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
5 5 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 07/29 11:29 AM
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on October 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/29/2020. (ESG)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order re Rule 12(b) Motions Wed 07/29 11:29 AM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/29/2020. (ESG)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Wed 07/29 11:28 AM
ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/29/2020. (ESG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
2 2 misc New Case Opened Thu 07/09 4:28 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18452899. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 20-01358 PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/09 4:27 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18452899 filed by Taylor E Barlow. (submitted by Matthew Barlow) (REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet