California Central District Court
Case #: 2:20-cr-00271
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2020
Last checked: Friday Jul 10, 2020 12:28 AM PDT
Defendant
Jose David Ortega Castelo (1)
Represented By
Claire M Simonich
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Alex R Kessel
Law Offices Of Alex R Kessel
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patrick Castaneda
Sausa - Us Attorneys Office
contact info
Anna Farias-Eisner
Ausa - Us Attorneys Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/10/2020 12:42 AM PDT
Friday, April 10, 2020
1 1 COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo in violation of 18:922(g)(1). Approved by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian as to Jose David Ortega Castelo (1). (ja) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo (ja) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2020
4 4 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo; defendants Year of Birth: 1988; date of arrest: 4/15/2020 (ja) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE ON LOCAL COMPLAINT held before Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar as to Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo. Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: Claire M Simonich for Jose David Ortega Castelo, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Court orders bail set as: Jose David Ortega Castelo (1) $20,000 Appearance Bond, SEE ATTACHED BOND FOR TERMS AND CONDITIONS. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Preliminary Hearing set for 5/7/2020 10:00 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Post-Indictment Arraignment set for 5/14/2020 11:00 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. (SPANISH) INTERPRETER Required as to Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo. Release Order No 39345. Court Reporter: Miranda Algorri. (ja) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (ja) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER of Defendants Presence filed by Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo (ja) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS in Spanish filed by Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo. (ja) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR for Preliminary Hearing and Arraignment on Indictment/Information. Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo is directed to appear for Preliminary Hearing on 5/7/2020 at 10:00 AM and for Post Indictment Arraignment on 5/14/2020 at 11:00 AM before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (ja) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
10 10 DECLARATION RE: PASSPORT filed by Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo, declaring that I am unable to locate my passport(s) or other travel document(s). If I locate any passport or other travel document issued to me, I will immediately surrender it to the U.S. Pretrial Services Agency. I will not apply for a passport or other travel document during the pendency of this case. (ja) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 16, 2020
11 11 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $10,000 by surety: Alexa Green for Bond and Conditions Filed by Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo (ja) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
12 12 SEALED UNREDACTED Affidavit of Surety (CR-4) filed by Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo re: Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4)11 (ja) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
13 13 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $10,000 by surety: Martinez for Bond and Conditions Filed by Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo (ja) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
14 14 SEALED UNREDACTED Affidavit of Surety (CR-4) filed by Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo re: Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4)13 (ja) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 19, 2020
15 15 BOND AND CONDITIONS OF RELEASE filed as to Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo conditions of release: $20,000 Appearance Bond approved by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ja) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2020
16 16 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Alex R. Kessel in place of attorney Claire M. Simonich Filed by Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo. (Kessel, Alex) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 01, 2020
17 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg granting16 REQUEST for Approval of Substitution of Attorney. Attorney Alex R Kessel for Jose David Ortega Castelo added; Attorney Claire M Simonich terminated as to Jose David Ortega Castelo (1) (ja) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
18 18 PRELIMINARY HEARING BRIEF filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo (Castaneda, Patrick) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
19 19 MINUTES OF Preliminary Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish as to Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo. Witnesses sworn and examined. Exhibits admitted. Court Smart: CS 5/7/2020. (ja) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
20 20 LIST OF EXHIBITS AND WITNESSES at trial as to Jose David Ortega Castelo. (ja) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
21 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for TO EXTEND AND EXCLUDE TIME FROM THE SPEEDY TRIAL ACTS INDICTMENT AND TRIAL CLOCKS BASED ON SUSPENSION OF THE GRAND JURY AS TO DEFENDANT JOSE DAVID ORTEGA CASTELO AND TO CONTINUE POST-INDICTMENT ARRAIGNMENT Filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo. (Attorney Patrick Castaneda added to party USA(pty:pla)) (Castaneda, Patrick) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
22 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver granting21 MOTION for Order EXTENDING AND EXCLUDING TIME FROM THE SPEEDY TRIAL ACT BASED ON SUSPENSION OF THE GRAND JURY AT TO DEFENDANT JOSE DAVID ORTEGA CASTELO AND CONTINUING POST-INDICTMENT ARRAIGNMENT as to Jose David Ortega Castelo (1) (ja) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
23 23 STIPULATION to Continue Post Indictment Arraignment from June 25, 2020 to July 15, 2020 filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo(Castaneda, Patrick) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 25, 2020
24 24 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver as to Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo, GRANTING Stipulation to Continue23 Post-Indictment Arraignment to 7/15/2020 11:00 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. (ja) [2:20-mj-01619-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
25 25 INDICTMENT Filed as to Jose David Ortega Castelo (1) count(s) 1. Offense occurred in LA. (mhe) (Main Document 25 replaced on 7/9/2020) (mhe).
Related: [-]
26 26 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Patrick Castaneda as to Defendant Jose David Ortega Castelo; defendants Year of Birth: 1988 (mhe)
Related: [-]
27 27 1 pgs MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA (See attachment) (mhe)
Related: [-]
28 28 2 pgs MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA (See attachment) (mhe)
Related: [-]