Byun v. Authentic Brands Group LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lorna G Schofield |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-05320 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332ed Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 22, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 06, 2021 4:17 AM EST |
Defendant
Authentic Brands Group LLC
100 West 33rd Street Suite 1007
New York, NY 10001 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Byun
36 Bowers Lane
Closter, NJ 07624 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, October 22, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Thu 10/22 2:30 PM
ORDER: WHEREAS, the Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in principle in this case (Dkt. No. 16). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days of this Order. Any application to reopen filed after thirty (30) days from the date of this Order may be denied solely on that basis. Any pending motions are DISMISSED as moot, and all conferences are CANCELLED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/22/2020) (nb) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
adr
Notice of Mediator Assignment
Fri 09/25 10:51 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 10/26/2020..(rpr) |
||
adr
Mediation Conference Scheduled
Fri 09/25 11:08 AM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED First Mediation Conference scheduled for 10/20/2020 at 10:00 AM by phone or video conference..(rpr) |
||
Thursday, September 24, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 09/24 9:29 AM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Authentic Brands Group LLC..(Strand, David) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 09/24 9:27 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Authentic Brands Group LLC..(Strand, David) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/16 9:49 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Edward Strand on behalf of Authentic Brands Group LLC..(Strand, David) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
respoth
Declaration (non-motion)
Tue 09/15 4:26 PM
DECLARATION of Jason Solotaroff re:11 Order, Service . Document filed by Angela Byun..(Solotaroff, Jason) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 09/15 2:38 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that by September 17, 2020, Plaintiff shall serve a copy of the Order, dated September 11, 2020, (Dkt. No. 8) and the case management plan (Dkt. No. 9) on Defendant and file an affidavit of service. Failure to comply with Court-ordered deadlines may result in sanctions or prejudice. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/15/2020) (rj) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Mediation Referral Order
Fri 09/11 2:37 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program to take place by October 26, 2020. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. To the extent possible, the Mediation Program is directed to appoint a mediator with expertise in employment law. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 9/21/2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/11/2020) (cf) |
|
9 | 9
order
Case Management Plan
Fri 09/11 2:34 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). No additional parties may be joined after or Amended Pleadings may be filed until 9/25/2020. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than 1/8/2021. Depositions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30, 31 shall be completed by 1/8/2021. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 3-4 days. On 2/21/2021 at 11:00 A.M. a pre-motion conference will be held for any anticipated dispositive motions, as further set forth in this Order. Amended Pleadings due by 9/25/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 9/25/2020. Deposition due by 1/8/2021. Fact Discovery due by 1/8/2021. Pre-Motion Conference set for 2/21/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/11/2020) (cf) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/11 2:31 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file proof of service and Defendant note its appearance on the docket. It is further ORDERED that the September 17, 2020, initial pretrial conference is cancelled. If the parties believe that a conference would nevertheless be useful, they should inform the court immediately so the conference can be reinstated. (As further sets forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/11/2020) (cf) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Thu 09/10 4:27 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jason L. Solotaroff dated September 10, 2020 re: Initial Pre-Trial Conference. Document filed by Angela Byun..(Solotaroff, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 09/10 1:20 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Authentic Brands Group LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Angela Byun. Related document:1 Complaint..(Solotaroff, Jason) |
|
Monday, August 03, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Mon 08/03 12:06 PM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The conference will be telephonic. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/3/2020) (cf) |
|
Tuesday, July 14, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/14 2:59 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Authentic Brands Group LLC..(jgo) |
|
Monday, July 13, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 07/13 11:08 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Authentic Brands Group LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Angela Byun..(Solotaroff, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 07/13 11:06 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Solotaroff, Jason) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 07/13 9:45 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jason Louis Solotaroff to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; Civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 07/13 9:46 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jason Louis Solotaroff to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 07/13 9:48 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 07/13 9:48 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 07/13 9:48 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Friday, July 10, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/10 3:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Authentic Brands Group LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20640309)Document filed by Angela Byun..(Solotaroff, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |