New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela K Chen
Referred: Sanket J Bulsara
Case #: 1:20-cv-03097
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2020
Terminated:Jan 07, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 06, 2021 5:34 AM EST
Defendant
WeVapeUSA
Plaintiff
Juul Labs, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas David Pease
Quinn Emanuel Et Al.
contact info
Kevin P.B. Johnson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Victoria F. Maroulis
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, January 14, 2021
19 19 notice Notice of Report Patent or Trademark AO120 Thu 01/14 12:41 PM
Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Hong, Loan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Electronic order dismissing case
Thursday, January 07, 2021
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 01/07 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Juul Labs, Inc. (Maroulis, Victoria)
Related: [-]
order Order Dismissing Case Thu 01/07 5:03 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 1/7/2021. (Larson, Emma)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
17 17 service Affidavit of Service Fri 12/11 2:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Default Request, Declaration and Proposed Certificate Draft served on by mail on David Alfih on November 30, 2020, filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Pease, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2020
order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Mon 12/07 2:39 PM
ORDER: The Court's 12/3/2020 order supersedes the Court's 10/22/2020 order. The portion of the 10/22/2020 order that relates to the timing of the default judgment motion is vacated. Per Judge Chen's order, the motion for default judgment shall be filed by 2/1/2021 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/7/2020. (Altreuter, Sylvia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
order Scheduling Order Thu 12/03 8:08 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a motion for default judgment by February 1, 2021. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 12/3/2020. (Larson, Emma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
order Order Reassigning Case Tue 12/01 10:41 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen for all further proceedings. Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 12/1/2020. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
16 16 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 11/30 11:09 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant WeVapeUSA has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant WeVapeUSA is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
15 15 misc Request for Certificate of Default Mon 11/23 4:51 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Juul Labs, Inc. (Pease, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Thomas Pease in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Certificate of Default Form
Monday, October 26, 2020
14 14 service Acknowledgment of Service Mon 10/26 12:07 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Order Acknowledgement filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Pease, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2020
order Order(Other) Fri 10/23 11:15 AM
ORDER: Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Court's order dated October 22, 2020, on Defendant and file proof of service on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/23/2020. (Altreuter, Sylvia)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Fri 10/23 11:15 AM
ORDER: Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Court's order dated October 22, 2020, on Defendant and file proof of service on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/23/2020. (Altreuter, Sylvia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2020
order Order(Other) 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 10/22 12:24 PM
ORDER: In light of the failure for counsel for the defendant corporation to make an appearance in this case, the initial conference scheduled for 10/23/2020 is adjourned sine die . Plaintiff shall seek a certificate of default by 11/23/2020 , and file any motion for default judgment by 1/22/2021 . Failure to take action consistent with these deadlines will lead to the closure of this case and dismissal of the complaint without prejudice. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/22/2020. (Manson, Eddie)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 11, 2020
13 13 service Acknowledgment of Service Fri 09/11 3:42 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Pease, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2020
order Order on Motion to Stay Scheduling Order Thu 09/10 11:49 AM
ORDER: The Motion to stay12 is denied. Defendant WeVapeUSA is apparently a corporation, not an individual; corporations may not proceed pro se in federal court, and corporations who fail to obtain counsel may have a default judgment entered against them. See Premium Sports, Inc. v. Mendes , No. 17-CV-1309, 2018 WL 2078488, at *5 (E.D.N.Y. Mar. 1, 2018) (citing Shapiro, Bernstein & Co. v. Cont'l Record Co. , 386 F.2d 426, 427 (2d Cir. 1967) (per curiam) ("[I]t is settled law that a corporation cannot appear other than by its attorney.")), report and recommendation adopted , Order (Mar. 16, 2018). An initial/telephone conference will be held at 2:30 PM on 10/23/2020 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274. The access code is 6534420. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the 2:30 PM conference. The motion to stay may be renewed at the initial conference, assuming Defendant appears via counsel. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on Defendant and file proof of service on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/10/2020. (Altreuter, Sylvia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
12 12 motion Stay Wed 09/09 7:11 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Case & Stipulation by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Maroulis, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Institution
Thursday, August 27, 2020
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 08/27 12:02 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Lee, Tiffeny)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
order Patent Pilot Reassignment Order Wed 08/26 12:45 PM
PATENT PILOT REASSIGNMENT ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case from the patent pilot wheel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/26/2020. (Marino, Janine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2020
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Tue 07/21 9:58 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice, Judge Levy's Individual Rules, and Magistrate Judge Matsumoto's served on WeVapeUSA on July 16, 2020, filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Pease, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Report Patent or Trademark AO120 Fri 07/17 2:52 PM
Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Rocco, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 complaint
Thursday, July 16, 2020
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/16 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P.B. Johnson on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Johnson, Kevin)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/16 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria F. Maroulis on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Maroulis, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
7 7 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 07/13 3:08 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 07/13 3:05 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 07/13 3:04 PM
Summons Issued as to WeVapeUSA. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 07/13 2:13 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint, by Juul Labs, Inc. (Pease, Thomas)
Related: [-]
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Mon 07/13 12:03 PM
Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/13 2:26 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
3 3 notice Notice(Other) Fri 07/10 7:31 PM
NOTICE by Juul Labs, Inc. Related [+] (Pease, Thomas)
Related: [-] port On The Filing And Determination Of An Action Regarding A Patent Or Trademark
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 07/10 7:30 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Juul Labs, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc. for Juul Labs, Inc.. (Pease, Thomas)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 07/10 7:29 PM
COMPLAINT against WeVapeUSA filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13049500 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Pease, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons