Member Case
Lead case is: 2:20-bk-18445

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John K Sherwood
Case #: 2:20-bk-18446
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2020
Terminated:Feb 22, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Lerner New York Holding, Inc.
330 W 34th St Fl 9
New York, NY 10001-2406
Represented By
Michael D. Sirota
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Fran B. Steele
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, February 22, 2021
13 13 order Final Decree Mon 02/22 1:00 PM
Final Decree; The following parties were served: Trustee and US Trustee. (zlh)
Related: [-]
utility Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 02/22 1:01 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (zlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 08/20 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
11 11 order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) or Document(s) Mon 08/17 2:44 PM
Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) E/F Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/17/2020. (lc)
Related: [-] 10 Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney) filed by Debtor Lerner New York Holding, Inc.
Saturday, August 15, 2020
10 10 misc Amended Schedules (Fee) - Use for All Amended Schedules Sat 08/15 5:32 PM
Amended Schedule(s) : E/F,Summary of Schedules Fee Amount $ 31 filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Lerner New York Holding, Inc.. (Sirota, Michael)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Sat 08/15 5:55 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney)([LINK 20-18446 JKS] ) [misc,amdsch3a] ( 31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A41361325, fee amount $ 31.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#10
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
9 9 misc Missing Document(s) Filed Wed 08/12 11:01 PM
Missing Document(s): Declaration Under Penalty For Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Schedules, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals A/B,D,E/F,G,H, filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Lerner New York Holding, Inc.. (Sirota, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
8 8 misc Document Wed 07/22 12:21 PM
Document re: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (Meeting of Creditors: August 19, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. ET) Related [+] filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Lerner New York Holding, Inc.. (Sirota, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Lerner New York Holding, Inc.
Saturday, July 18, 2020
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 07/19 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/18/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
6 6 order Joint Administration Thu 07/16 11:40 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Lead Case: 20-18445 Member Cases: 20-18446 Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/15/2020. (mg)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 07/14 10:27 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by David Gerardi on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Gerardi, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
4 4 motion Joint Administration Mon 07/13 11:56 AM
Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 20-18445 20-18446 20-18447 20-18448 20-18449 20-18450 20-18451 20-18452 20-18453 20-18454 20-18455 and 20-18456 Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Lerner New York Holding, Inc.. (Sirota, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Mon 07/13 9:00 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Fran B. Steele on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Steele, Fran)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned Mon 07/13 8:21 AM
Case Assignment. Judge John K. Sherwood added to the case. (ad)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 07/13 7:35 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Lerner New York Holding, Inc.. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 11/10/2020. (Sirota, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Resolutions
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Mon 07/13 8:46 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 20-18446 ) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A41195209, fee amount $ 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1