Lukic v. Elezovic
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Allyne R Ross |
Referred: | Lois Bloom |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-03110 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 42:11601 - INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION REMEDIES |
Case Filed: | Jul 13, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2021 6:07 AM EST |
Petitioner
Tomislav Lukic
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Bahrija Elezovic
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 12, 2021 | ||
61 | 61
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Wed 05/12 3:03 PM
ORDER denying55 Motion for Costs: For the reasons set forth in the attached opinion and order, I deny petitioner's motion for costs under 22 U.S.C. § 9007(b)(3). Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 5/12/2021. (Roeck, Victoria) |