Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-05633
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1446pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2020
Re-opened:Jun 09, 2020
Terminated:Oct 27, 2020
Case in other court:California Northern, 4:18-cv-05114
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2021 5:21 AM EST
Defendant
MCKESSON CORPORATION
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
SHARON DOUGLASS MAYO
Arnold & Porter Llp - San Francisco Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
EMMA SANDERS
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JOANN UHRICH
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTINE CROMWELL
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ALLISON HOLLAND
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DORIAN HOWARD
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LAURA KINNEY
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
SHEILA REDMON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ALFRED NOTARGIACOMO, III
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
REBECCA MITCHELL
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL MONTGOMERY
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
EVELYN MORSE
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ELIZABETH MOZ
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ANDY OCHOA
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RANDY YOUNG
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MARCAL WITTIG
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RAY OWENS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DIANE PADGETT
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
NEIL PAGE
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RANDY PAGE
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TONI RAVEN
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DWIGHT WILLIAMS
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RONNIE RUCKER
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY SAPPIE
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SCHERYL SCOTT
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ADAM SIEGEL
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHEL STYERS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LINDA TERRY
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
APRIL THOMPSON
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ANTOINETTE TORRI
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GERARDO VIERA
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CRAIG WENTLAND
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTINE MCCAULEY
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PATRICK BOOTH
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ROSE BRAWNER
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN BROWN
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JAZIKIO CARTER
Terminated: 10/27/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID CHAVEZ
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SANDRA DALEY
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSEPH DINNER
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DANA ELAM
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RICHARD ELLIS
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ANTHONY ERMI
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GINETTE GIST
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MELISSA HAMILTON
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TONYA HARRIS
Terminated: 10/27/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
NEFFITERRI HEARNES
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LISA HIGGINS
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTINA JEFFERY
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ALICE JENKINS
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SHARLENE JOHNSON
Terminated: 10/27/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KATHARINE KNEEBULL
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SHAWN KNIGHT
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
AMIRAH LAYLA
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
YVONNE LOPEZ
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ANITA MALTESE
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
WENDY MEUNIER
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Kirtland & Packard LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 05 2018
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. This action is transferred to the Northern District of Florida. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018) Modified on 9/6/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
GPO Jul 08 2020
MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA. Signed by MDL Panel on 7/1/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
23 23 18 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 10/28 8:26 AM
ORDER - The Court has determined that the cases identified on Exhibit A were dismissed with prejudice from multi-plaintiff California complaints on October 4 or November 20, 2019, while the cases were still pending in California state court. Because those plaintiffs' cases should not have been returned to the active MDL docket, they are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2020. (case closed) (djb)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 10/27 3:56 PM
ORDER - The Court has been advised that the cases identified on Exhibit A were settled under the global settlement program for this litigation. Accordingly, the cases are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the active docket of the Court. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2020. SHARLENE JOHNSON, JAZIKIO CARTER and TONYA HARRIS terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
21 21 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 10/21 12:51 PM
ORDER - The Court has determined that the cases identified on Exhibit A were dismissed from multi-plaintiff California complaints by stipulation of the parties for lack of personal jurisdiction on October 1, 2018. See Case No. 3:16md2734, ECF No. 1008. Thereafter, the California complaints were remanded to California state court. See id., ECF No. 1043. The California complaints later were re-removed and transferred to the MDL, pursuant to the Court's Order dated February 5, 2020. See ECF No. 1238. On re-removal, all of the California plaintiffs were returned to the Court's active docket-including the plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A, whose claims were previously dismissed. Because those plaintiffs' cases should not have been returned to the active MDL docket, they are hereby DISMISSED. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/21/2020. RAY OWENS, DIANE PADGETT, SHEILA REDMON, MICHEL STYERS, GINETTE GIST and KATHARINE KNEEBULL terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2020
20 20 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/04 10:00 AM
ORDER - The Court has been advised that all but fourteen of the plaintiffs in these cases settled their respective claims under the global settlement program. The plaintiffs who settled their claims must file stipulations of dismissal by 8/13/2020 . Expert reports must be served on Defendants by October 2, 2020. By 10/9/2020 , 2020, Defendants must provide the Court with a written report identifying which of the fourteen plaintiffs timely produced an appropriate expert report and which did not. Failure to provide an expert report on specific causation that fully complies with Rule 26(a)(2) and this Order will constitute grounds for dismissal with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
19 19 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 07/13 3:08 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-05114. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 07/13 3:08 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:19 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
18 18 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA. Signed by MDL Panel on 7/1/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2020
17 17 RESPONSE TO 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE regarding Second Notice of Removal by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) Modified on 6/16/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
16 16 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING the clerk to re-open Davis v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-2584 Green v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-2588 Evans v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-2614 Adeniran v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-2620 Booth v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-5114 and Stone v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-5118 The Court further DIRECTS Defendant TO SHOW CAUSE why its "second notices of removal" filed in each case are procedurally proper and timely under 18 U.S.C. § 1446. Defendant shall file a statement of two pages or less by June 15, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
***Case Reopened.*** Show Cause Response due by 6/15/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
15 15 DEFENDANT BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB CO.S SECOND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332, 1441, and 1446 against All Plaintiffs. Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Mayo, Sharon) Modified on 6/1/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Friday, September 07, 2018
Case has been successfully transferred to the Northern District of Florida. Their case no. is 3:18-cv-02079. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 05, 2018
14 14 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. This action is transferred to the Northern District of Florida. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/6/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
13 13 Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Judge William Alsup no longer assigned to the case. The parties are instructed that all future filings are to bear the initials HSG immediately after the case number. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cpS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/5/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER RELATING CASE to case no 16-cv-0254-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/5/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 31, 2018
11 11 ORDER GRANTING 9 STIPULATED REQUEST TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 30, 2018
10 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc. for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Civ. L.R. 3-15 of Defendant Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Enns, Krista) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
9 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
8 8 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UPON REASSIGNMENT - Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (tlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order for All Judges
Wednesday, August 29, 2018
7 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/29/18.(haS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
6 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
5 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.. (Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
4 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/4/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-568990. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12612248). Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet