North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Richard E Myers, II
Case #: 4:20-cv-00138
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2020
Terminated:Oct 06, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2021 4:16 AM EST
Defendant
Healthcare Fiscal Management, Inc.
Represented By
Mark W. Ishman
Ishman Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
St. Mary's Health Care System, Inc.
Represented By
Martin R. Jernigan
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Misty Cece
Represented By
Gary E. Mason
Whitfield Bryson And Mason LLP
contact info
Joel R. Rhine
Rhine Martin Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Martin A. Ramey
Rhine Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Shanita Reed
Represented By
Gary E. Mason
Whitfield Bryson And Mason LLP
contact info
Joel R. Rhine
Rhine Martin Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Martin A. Ramey
Rhine Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, October 05, 2020
25 25 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 10/05 4:26 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Misty Cece, Shanita Reed as to St. Mary's Health Care System, Inc. and Healthcare Fiscal Management, Inc.. (Mason, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
24 24 notice Notice of Special Appearance Fri 09/18 4:57 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Gary E. Mason on behalf of Misty Cece, Shanita Reed. (Mason, Gary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
notice Reminder to Counsel - Judge Myers Tue 09/15 11:22 AM
REMINDER TO COUNSEL regarding22 and23 . Pursuant to Judge Myers Practice Preferences, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of any motion, memorandum, or brief which exceeds 30 pages or of any exhibits which exceed a total of 30 pages, by mailing or delivering to the attention of the Clerk, U.S. District Court, 1003 South 17th Street, Wilmington, NC 28401. The courtesy copies of any motion, memorandum, or brief and supporting exhibits which exceed a combined total of 100 pages shall be submitted in a three-ring binder. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2020
23 23 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 09/14 8:39 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding22 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction; Alternatively, Failure to State Any Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Healthcare Fiscal Management, Inc.. (Ishman, Mark)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Dismiss Mon 09/14 8:37 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction; Alternatively, Failure to State Any Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Healthcare Fiscal Management, Inc.. (Ishman, Mark)
Related: [-]
21 21 27 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 09/14 4:01 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding20 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by St. Mary's Health Care System, Inc.. (Jernigan, Martin)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 09/14 3:56 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by St. Mary's Health Care System, Inc.. (Jernigan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
utility Motion Referred Tue 09/08 9:57 AM
Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Complaint, (Second Consented To Motion) . (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 09/08 10:22 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Healthcare Fiscal Management, Inc.'s Second Motion for Extension of Time 19 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiffs, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including September 14, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/8/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2020
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 09/04 4:54 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Complaint, (Second Consented To Motion) filed by Healthcare Fiscal Management, Inc.. (Ishman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, August 27, 2020
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 08/27 9:05 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Defendant St. Mary's Health Care System, Inc.'s Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 18 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including September 14, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint 1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/27/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 08/26 12:26 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by St. Mary's Health Care System, Inc.. (Jernigan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Wed 08/26 4:02 PM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 20, 2020
notice Notice of Deficiency Thu 08/20 9:32 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding17 Notice of Special Appearance. As previously provided in Notice to Counsel dated 7/16/2020, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. Local Civil Rule 83.1 (e ) requires attorneys to file the Notice of Special Appearance. This information is available on the court's website. Counsel, Gary Mason, should file a Notice of Special Appearance that complies with this rule. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
17 17 notice Notice of Special Appearance Wed 08/19 12:31 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Joel R. Rhine on behalf of Misty Cece, Shanita Reed. (Rhine, Joel)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 08/19 11:23 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by St. Mary's Health Care System, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Trinity Health Corporation for St. Mary's Health Care System, Inc.. (Jernigan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
15 15 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 08/17 4:06 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Healthcare Fiscal Management, Inc. (Ishman, Mark)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/17 4:05 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Mark W. Ishman on behalf of Healthcare Fiscal Management, Inc.. (Ishman, Mark)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 08/17 4:04 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Complaint, with proposed order filed by Healthcare Fiscal Management, Inc.. (Ishman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Mon 08/17 2:19 PM
Affidavit of Service for Summons, Complaint, Financial Disclosures and Notices of Appearance filed by Misty Cece, Shanita Reed served on St. Mary's Health Care System on 07/20/2020. (Rhine, Joel)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Mon 08/17 5:03 PM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Complaint, with proposed order . (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Mon 08/17 5:06 PM
Notice to Counsel regarding:15 Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. The deputy clerk will flatten the document. No action by counsel is required. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 08/17 5:15 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Healthcare Fiscal Management, Inc.'s unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 13 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including September 8, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint 1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/17/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2020
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/10 12:37 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Martin R. Jernigan on behalf of St. Mary's Health Care System, Inc.. (Jernigan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 08/07 1:18 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by St. Mary's Health Care System, Inc.. (Jernigan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
notice Notice to Counsel Fri 08/07 3:01 PM
Notice to Counsel regarding:10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Fri 08/07 3:06 PM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 08/07 3:47 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Defendant St. Mary's Health Care System, Inc.'s unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 10 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including August 31, 2020 within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint 1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/7/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2020
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Thu 07/30 3:32 PM
Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint on Healthcare Fiscal Management, Inc. filed by Misty Cece, Shanita Reed served on Healthcare Fiscal Management, Inc. on 07/27/2020. (Rhine, Joel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 07/16 12:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Healthcare Fiscal Management, Inc., St. Mary's Health Care System, Inc. *Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice-other Thu 07/16 9:20 AM
Notice filed by Misty Cece, Shanita Reed Proposed Summons . (Rhine, Joel)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice-other Thu 07/16 9:18 AM
Notice filed by Misty Cece, Shanita Reed Proposed Summons . (Rhine, Joel)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Thu 07/16 9:10 AM
Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the proposed summons prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Thu 07/16 9:13 AM
Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-4] Proposed Summons, [1-5] Proposed Summons. Counsel should refile the proposed summons using the event "Notice-Other". One of the summons was blank and the other was failed to be "flattened" per the CM/ECF requirements. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
utility Case Selected for Mediation Thu 07/16 9:22 AM
Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
notice Reminder to Counsel - Judge Myers Thu 07/16 9:25 AM
REMINDER TO COUNSEL regarding1 . Pursuant to Judge Myers Practice Preferences, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of any motion, memorandum, or brief which exceeds 30 pages or of any exhibits which exceed a total of 30 pages, by mailing or delivering to the attention of the Clerk, U.S. District Court, 1003 South 17th Street, Wilmington, NC 28401. The courtesy copies of any motion, memorandum, or brief and supporting exhibits which exceed a combined total of 100 pages shall be submitted in a three-ring binder. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Thu 07/16 9:37 AM
Notice to Counsel regarding:1 Complaint. The attorney information in the signature blocks for Gary E. Mason, David K. Lietz and Gary M. Klinger does not match the information the court has in its CM/ECF database. Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/13 4:50 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Martin A. Ramey on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ramey, Martin)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/13 4:48 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Joel R. Rhine on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Rhine, Joel)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 07/13 4:35 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Shanita Reed (Rhine, Joel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 07/13 4:35 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Misty Cece (Rhine, Joel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/13 4:34 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5514919.), filed by Misty Cece, Shanita Reed. (Rhine, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice Letter,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons