Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:C Kathryn Preston
Case #: 2:20-bk-53411
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2020
Creditor Meeting:Aug 21, 2020
Claims Deadline:Sep 23, 2020
Terminated:Apr 14, 2023

Debtor
Idea Buyer LLC
10380 Forest Glen Pl
Powell, OH 43065-8764
Represented By
David M. Whittaker
Isaac Wiles
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Larry J McClatchey
65 East State Street Suite 1800
Columbus, OH 43215
U.S. Trustee
Asst US Trustee (Col)
Office of the US Trustee 170 North High Street Suite 200
Columbus, OH 43215

GPO Dec 15 2022
Order Approving Trustee's Final Report and Overruling Objection of James Bobreski. (kam)

Docket last updated: 07/16/2020 12:01 AM EDT
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 07/15 1:14 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:20-bk-53411) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 38603784, amount $ 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Auto Assignment (7 Business Asset) Wed 07/15 11:55 PM
Auto Assignment of Judge and Trustee with Meeting of Creditors to Be Noticed for 08/21/2020 at 09:30 AM at Columbus 341.Proof of Claim due by 09/23/2020. Governmental Proof of Claim due by 01/11/2021. (ad, )
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 07/15 1:11 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Fee Paid $335 - Filing fee amount required is $335.00 Filed by Idea Buyer LLC (Whittaker, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement 1015-2 with Prior Filing Wed 07/15 1:11 PM
Statement 1015-2 with Prior Filing(s) Filed by Debtor Idea Buyer LLC. (Whittaker, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Verification of Creditor Matrix Wed 07/15 1:12 PM
Verification of Creditor Matrix Filed by Debtor Idea Buyer LLC. (Whittaker, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Resolution Wed 07/15 2:22 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor Idea Buyer LLC. (Whittaker, David)
Related: [-]