North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Frank D Whitney
Referred: David Keesler
Case #: 3:20-cv-00389
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2020
Terminated:Jul 08, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 12, 2021 3:18 AM EST
Defendant
MAC Acquisition LLC
Represented By
Steven Andrew Nigh
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Defendant
Sullivan's Holding LLC
Represented By
Steven Andrew Nigh
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Sullivan's of North Carolina, LLC
Represented By
Steven Andrew Nigh
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristin Neeser
Represented By
Charlotte Claire Smith
The Law Offices Of Gilda A. Hernandez, PLLC
contact info
Gilda Adriana Hernandez
The Law Offices Of Gilda A. Hernandez, PLLC
contact info
Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci
The Law Offices Of Gilda A. Hernandez, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, July 08, 2022
77 77 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Change Venue Order on Motion to Compel Order on Memorandum and Recommendations Fri 07/08 10:19 AM
ORDER granting 59 Motion to Change Venue; denying without prejudice 63 Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice 64 Motion to Compel; accepting and adopting 76 Memorandum and Recommendations.. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/7/22. (clc)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Fri 07/08 10:20 AM
Case electronically transferred to Eastern District of North Carolina. Original electronic file and docket sheet sent. (clc)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Fri 07/08 12:21 PM
Acknowledged receipt of electronically transferred case by USDC Eastern District of North Carolina, their civil action no. 5:22-cv-00264 (rth)
Related: [-]