Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Giselle Lopez-Soler
Referred: Giselle Lopez-Soler
Case #: 3:20-cv-01345
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2020
Terminated:Aug 25, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 12, 2021 4:20 AM AST
Defendant
AIG Insurance Puerto Rico
Represented By
Charles A. DeMier-LeBlanc
De Corral & De Mier, LLP
contact info
Defendant
DBR Hotel Owner, LLC
Represented By
Charles A. DeMier-LeBlanc
De Corral & De Mier, LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Represented By
Charles A. DeMier-LeBlanc
De Corral & De Mier, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Insurance Companies A, B & C
Defendant
Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico, LLC
Represented By
Charles A. DeMier-LeBlanc
De Corral & De Mier, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Operations Companies G, H & I
Defendant
Security Companies D, E and F
Defendant
The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By
Charles A. DeMier-LeBlanc
De Corral & De Mier, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mrs. Jill Bakhsh
Represented By
Juan R. Gonzalez-Munoz
Gonzalez Munoz Law Offices, P.S.C.
contact info
Joshua Blum
Blum Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Mr. Kharune Bakhsh
Represented By
Juan R. Gonzalez-Munoz
Gonzalez Munoz Law Offices, P.S.C.
contact info
Joshua Blum
Blum Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Bakhsh Community Property Conjugal Partnership
Represented By
Juan R. Gonzalez-Munoz
Gonzalez Munoz Law Offices, P.S.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Marriott International, Inc.
Terminated: 09/22/2020
Defendant
The Ritz-Carlton Hotels Company, LLC
Terminated: 09/22/2020


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM AST
Friday, August 25, 2023
109 109 1 pgs order Judgment Fri 08/25 3:19 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 8/25/2023. (SG)
Related: [-]
108 108 3 pgs misc Stipulation Fri 08/25 1:48 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jill Bakhsh, Kharune Bakhsh, Bakhsh Community Property Conjugal Partnership. (Micheo-Marcial, Javier)
Related: [-]