Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Gibney, Jr
Case #: 3:20-cv-00545
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Fraud
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2020
Terminated:Aug 19, 2020
Last checked: Monday Jan 11, 2021 5:09 AM EST
Defendant
Daniel Khadduri
Represented By
Jennifer Lynn McGovern
Parrish Snead Franklin Simpson, PLC
contact info
Defendant
Marilyn K. Khadduri
Represented By
Jennifer Lynn McGovern
Parrish Snead Franklin Simpson, PLC
contact info
Defendant
Khadduri Enterprise Inc
Represented By
Jennifer Lynn McGovern
Parrish Snead Franklin Simpson, PLC
contact info
Defendant
Tri-Stone Properties LLC
Represented By
Jennifer Lynn McGovern
Parrish Snead Franklin Simpson, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carla T. Lewis
259 Union Mill Road
Farnham, VA 22460


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 24, 2021
15 15 appeal USCA Mandate Mon 05/24 1:27 PM
USCA Mandate re11 Notice of Appeal. The judgment of this court, entered April 30, 2021, takes effect today. 20-2038 (tjoh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
14 14 appeal USCA Judgment Fri 04/30 10:45 AM
USCA JUDGMENT as to11 Notice of Appeal filed by Carla T. Lewis. In accordance with the decision of this court, this appeal is dismissed. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41. 20-2038 (tjoh, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
13 13 appeal USCA Opinion Fri 04/30 10:43 AM
Opinion of USCA - DISMISSED re11 Notice of Appeal attached copy of judgment will not take effect until issuance of the mandate. 20-2038 (tjoh, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
appeal USCA Case Number Wed 09/30 10:45 AM
USCA Case Number 20-2038 Case Manager ABrownlee for11 Notice of Appeal filed by Carla T. Lewis. (lgar, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2020
12 12 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA Thu 09/24 9:36 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re11 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (lbre, )
Related: [-]
appeal Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA Thu 09/24 9:36 AM
Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re11 Notice of Appeal (lbre, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
11 11 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 09/23 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to10 Order. by Carla T. Lewis. (smej, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unmarked Attachment,
Att: 2 Local Rule 83.1
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
10 10 4 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 08/19 11:37 AM
FINAL ORDER - The Court GRANTS Lewis' motion for leave to proceed informa pauperis for the limited purposes of remanding this case to state court1 . The Court GRANTS the defendants' motion to remand4 and REMANDS this case to the Richmond County Circuit Court. The Court DENIES AS MOOT the defendants' motion to dismiss6 . The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to close the case. To the extent that Lewis believes that she has a basis to appeal this Final Order, she must file a written notice of appeal with the Clerk of Court within thirty (30) days of the date of entry. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 8/19/2020. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff) (smej, ) Modified on 8/19/2020 (smej, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2020
9 9 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 08/03 12:56 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Carla T. Lewis. (smej, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 83.1
8 8 misc Docket Annotation Mon 08/03 12:56 PM
Document filed in State Court received by Carla T. Lewis. (smej, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2020
7 7 respoth Brief in Support Mon 07/27 4:16 PM
Brief in Support to6 MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,. filed by Daniel Khadduri, Marilyn K. Khadduri, Khadduri Enterprise Inc, Tri-Stone Properties LLC. (McGovern, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss Mon 07/27 4:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,. by Daniel Khadduri, Marilyn K. Khadduri, Khadduri Enterprise Inc, Tri-Stone Properties LLC. (McGovern, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
5 5 respoth Brief in Support Mon 07/27 4:15 PM
Brief in Support to4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Daniel Khadduri, Marilyn K. Khadduri, Khadduri Enterprise Inc, Tri-Stone Properties LLC. (McGovern, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Remand to State Court Mon 07/27 4:14 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Daniel Khadduri, Marilyn K. Khadduri, Khadduri Enterprise Inc, Tri-Stone Properties LLC. (McGovern, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Disclosure Mon 07/27 4:13 PM
MOTION for Disclosure of Financial Interest by Daniel Khadduri, Marilyn K. Khadduri, Khadduri Enterprise Inc, Tri-Stone Properties LLC. (McGovern, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2020
2 2 notice Notice (other) Tue 07/21 1:17 PM
NOTICE of Removal received from Carla T. Lewis. (jsmi, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 07/16 12:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carla T. Lewis. (smej, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint (Received),
Att: 2 Unmarked Attachments,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Local Rule 83.1