Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Case #: 3:20-cr-00167
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2020
Last checked: Friday Jul 17, 2020 3:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Adam Castro (1)
Represented By
Leo A. Latella
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Castro (3)
Represented By
Matthew L. Clemente
Matthew L. Clemente, Esq.
contact info
Joseph T. McGraw
contact info
Defendant
Richard Notarfrancesco (2)
Represented By
Joseph M. Blazosek
contact info
Interested Party
U.S. Probation - Scranton Office
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sean A. Camoni
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/17/2020 3:58 AM EDT
Thursday, February 20, 2020
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Richard Notarfrancesco (1). (ms) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Alejandro Castro (1). (ms) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Richard Notarfrancesco. (ms) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Alejandro Castro. (ms) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting4 Motion to Seal Case as to Richard Notarfrancesco (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 2/19/20. (ms) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting4 Motion to Seal as to Alejandro Castro (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 2/19/20. (ms) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Richard Notarfrancesco (ms) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Alejandro Castro (ms) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING CJA ATTORNEY OR FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Richard Notarfrancesco. Joseph M. Blazosek, Esq., appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 2/20/20. (ms) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING CJA ATTORNEY OR FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Alejandro Castro. Matthew L. Clemente, Esq., appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 2/20/20. (ms) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
9 9 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Richard Notarfrancesco Preliminary Examination set for 3/4/2020 10:00 AM in Wilkes-Barre - Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr... Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 2/20/20. (ms)(Copy to Scranton Court Reporters and Marshal from Chambers) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
9 9 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Alejandro Castro Preliminary Examination set for 3/4/2020 10:00 AM in Wilkes-Barre - Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr... Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 2/20/20. (ms)(Copy to Scranton Court Reporters and Marshal from Chambers) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Richard Notarfrancesco Detention Hearing set for 2/25/2020 09:30 AM in Wilkes-Barre - Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr... Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 2/20/20. (ms)(Copy to Scranton Court Reporters and Marshal from Chambers) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Alejandro Castro. Defendant and his counsel having stated on the record that defendant WAIVES his right to a detention hearing at this time, defendant ORDERED DETAINED without prejudice to his right to request a detention hearing at a future date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 2/20/20. (ms)(Copy to Scranton Marshal from Chambers) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
11 11 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 2/20/2020. in case as to Alejandro Castro. (cl) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Richard Notarfrancesco. Defendant released on standard and special conditions of supervision. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 2/25/20. (ms)(Copy to Scranton Marshal from Chambers) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
13 13 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 2/20/2020. in case as to Richard Notarfrancesco. (cl) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
12 12 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing by USA as to Alejandro Castro.(Camoni, Sean) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
13 13 ORDER granting12 Motion to Continue March 4, 2020, preliminary examination as to Alejandro Castro (1). Preliminary Examination set for 4/1/2020 10:00 AM in Wilkes-Barre - Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr... Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 3/3/20. (ms)(Copy to Scranton Court Reporters and Marshal from Chambers) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
14 14 MOTION for Voluntary Surrender and Waiver of Hearing by Richard Notarfrancesco.(Blazosek, Joseph) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Concurrence,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
15 15 Certificate of Service by Richard Notarfrancesco re14 MOTION for Voluntary Surrender and Waiver of Hearing (Blazosek, Joseph) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER granting14 Motion for Voluntary Surrender as to Richard Notarfrancesco (1). Defendant shall surrender by 9:00 p.m. on March 3, 2020, at Lackawanna County Prison for detainment udner supervision of the USMS.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 3/3/20. (ms)(Copy to Scranton Marshal from Chambers) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
17 17 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing by USA as to Richard Notarfrancesco.(Camoni, Sean) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
18 18 ORDER granting17 Motion to Continue March 4, 2020, preliminary examination as to Richard Notarfrancesco (1). Preliminary Examination set for 4/1/2020 10:00 AM in Wilkes-Barre - Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr... Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 3/3/20. (ms)(Copy to Scranton Court Reporters and Marshal from Chambers) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
19 19 COURT REPORTER NOTES re Richard Notarfrancesco filed by L. Boyanowski, RMR, CRR of Detention Hearing before Judge Saporito on 2/25/20. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 753(b), I certify that these original notes are a true and correct record of proceedings in the United States District Court for the Middle District of PA before Judge Saporito on 2/25/20. By s/ L. Boyanowski, RMR, CRR. (Court Reporter Notes are viewable by court staff only). (Boyanowski, Laura) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2020
14 14 MOTION to Continue Prelimiinary Hearing by USA as to Alejandro Castro.(Camoni, Sean) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
15 15 [DEEMED WITHDRAWN PER DOC. 20 ORDER]Unopposed MOTION for Pretrial Release CV19 by Alejandro Castro.(Clemente, Matthew) Modified on 4/1/2020 (ms). [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Certificate of Concurrence,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
20 20 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing by USA as to Richard Notarfrancesco.(Camoni, Sean) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 31, 2020
16 16 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Alejandro Castro Telephone Conference set for 4/2/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr. Conference to be initiated by the Court.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 3/31/20. (ms) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER granting14 Motion to Continue April 1, 2020, prelimmnary examination as to Alejandro Castro (1). Preliminary Examination set for 5/6/2020 10:00 AM in Wilkes-Barre - Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr..Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 3/31/20. (ms)(Copy to Scranton Court Reporters and Marshal from Chambers) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
18 18 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document15 Unopposed MOTION for Pretrial Release CV19 by Alejandro Castro.(Clemente, Matthew) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Concurrence,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
19 19 Amended MOTION for Release from Custody to Inpatient Treatment by Alejandro Castro.(Clemente, Matthew) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Concurrence
21 21 ORDER granting20 Motion to Continue April 1, 2020, preliminary examination as to Richard Notarfrancesco (1). Preliminary Examination set for 5/6/2020 10:00 AM in Wilkes-Barre - Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr..Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 3/31/20. (ms)(Copy to Scranton Court Reporters and Marshal from Chambers) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
20 20 ORDER granting18 Motion to Withdraw Document as to Alejandro Castro (1). (1) the Defendants Motion for Release to Inpatient Treatment (Doc. 15) isWITHDRAWN,(2) the Defendant shall be permitted to re-file an amended motion, and(3) the Courts March 31, 2020 Order scheduling a telephone conference forApril 2, 2020 at 11:00 AM remains in effect.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 4/1/20. (ms) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 02, 2020
22 22 ORDER granting19 Motion for Release from Custody as to Alejandro Castro (1).Defendants amended motion for release from custody to in-patient treatment (Doc. 19) is GRANTED. Defendant shall be released from custody pursuant to the Order Setting Conditions of Release which shall be docketed contemporaneously herewith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 4/2/20. (ms) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
23 23 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Alejandro Castro. RELEASE EFFECTIVE APRIL 6, 2020. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 4/2/20. (ms)(Copy to Scranton Marshal from Chambers) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 03, 2020
24 24 NOTICE of Executed Conditions of Release by Alejandro Castro re23 Order Setting Conditions of Release (Clemente, Matthew) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2020
22 22 Letter filed by Richard Notarfrancesco re Motion for Release. (bg) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 03, 2020
23 23 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing by USA as to Richard Notarfrancesco.(Camoni, Sean) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
25 25 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing by USA as to Alejandro Castro.(Camoni, Sean) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 04, 2020
24 24 ORDER granting23 Motion to Continue May 6, 2020, preliminary examination as to Richard Notarfrancesco (1). Preliminary Examination set for 6/3/2020 10:00 AM in Wilkes-Barre - Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr..Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 5/4/20. (ms)(Copy to Scranton Court Reporters and Marshal from Chambers) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
26 26 ORDER granting25 Motion to Continue May 6, 2020, preliminary examination as to Alejandro Castro (1). Preliminary Examination set for 6/3/2020 10:00 AM in Wilkes-Barre - Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr..Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 5/4/20. (ms)(Copy to Scranton Court Reporters and Marshal from Chambers) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
25 25 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Exam by USA as to Richard Notarfrancesco.(Camoni, Sean) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 proposed order
27 27 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Exam by USA as to Alejandro Castro.(Camoni, Sean) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
26 26 ORDER granting25 Motion to Continue June 3, 2002, preliminary examination as to Richard Notarfrancesco (1). Preliminary Examination set for 7/1/2020 10:00 AM in Wilkes-Barre - Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr..Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 6/3/20. (ms)(Copy to Scranton Court Reporters and Marshal from Chambers) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
28 28 ORDER granting27 Motion to Continue June 3, 2020, prelimn ary examination as to Alejandro Castro (1). Preliminary Examination set for 7/1/2020 10:00 AM in Wilkes-Barre - Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 6/3/20. (ms)(Copy to Scranton Court Reporters and Marshal from Chambers) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2020
27 27 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing by USA as to Richard Notarfrancesco.(Camoni, Sean) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
29 29 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing by USA as to Alejandro Castro.(Camoni, Sean) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
28 28 ORDER granting27 Motion to Continue July 1, 2020, preliminary examination. as to Richard Notarfrancesco (1) Preliminary Examination set for 8/5/2020 10:00 AM in Wilkes-Barre - Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr..Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 6/30/20. (ms)(Copy to Scranton Court Reporters and Marshal from Chambers) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
30 30 ORDER granting29 Motion to Continue July 1, 2020, preliminary examination as to Alejandro Castro (1) Preliminary Examination set for 8/5/2020 10:00 AM in Wilkes-Barre - Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr..Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 6/30/20. (ms)(Copy to Scranton Court Reporters and Marshal from Chambers) [5:20-mj-00010-JFS]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
29 29 MOTION to Revoke Detention Order and Allow Pretrial Release by Richard Notarfrancesco.(Blazosek, Joseph) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s)
30 30 Certificate of Service by Richard Notarfrancesco re29 MOTION to Revoke Detention Order and Allow Pretrial Release (Blazosek, Joseph) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
31 31 BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Richard Notarfrancesco re29 MOTION to Revoke Detention Order and Allow Pretrial Release Brief in Opposition due by 7/27/2020 (Blazosek, Joseph) [5:20-mj-00013-JFS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
38 38 PRAECIPE by the Government to issue a Summons for defendant Notarfranceso (cl)
Related: [-]
39 39 PRAECIPE by the Government to issue a Summons for defendant Alejandro Castro (cl)
Related: [-]