Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-10780

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John K Sherwood
Case #: 2:20-ap-01410
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2020
Terminated:Sep 20, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
David Gamburg
5 Denison Drive
Upper Saddle River, NJ 07458
Represented By
David Gamburg
contact info
Plaintiff
Solomon Halioua
Represented By
Brian Gregory Hannon
Law Office Of Norgaard O'Boyle
contact info
Plaintiff
Montvale Medical Group, LLC
Represented By
Brian Gregory Hannon
Law Office Of Norgaard O'Boyle
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
utility Close Adversary Case Tue 09/20 3:45 PM
Adversary Case (2:20-ap-1410) Closed. (mff)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
court Hearing Held Tue 09/20 3:42 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Moot. Related [+] (mff)
Related: [-] 8 Joint Scheduling Order
Monday, May 09, 2022
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 05/09 12:38 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 4/28/2021. Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/29/2020 Discovery due by 2/19/2021. Trial date set for 8/17/2022 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (zlh
Saturday, October 31, 2020
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 11/01 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/31/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 11/01 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/31/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 29, 2020
8 8 3 pgs order Joint Scheduling Order Thu 10/29 2:58 PM
Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/29/2020 Discovery due by 2/19/2021. Trial date set for 4/28/2021 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (mcp)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Mediation Order Thu 10/29 2:56 PM
Mediation Order. Mark Hall added to the case. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/29/2020 (mcp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
court Hearing Held Tue 10/20 3:31 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Status conference held, counsel will discuss and prepare a joint pretrial order as well as a mediation order. Related [+] (mg)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, October 08, 2020
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Thu 10/08 10:30 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Daniel M. Eliades on behalf of David Gamburg. (Eliades, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Thu 10/08 10:26 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Caitlin Conklin on behalf of David Gamburg. (Conklin, Caitlin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Wed 10/07 12:49 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 2:00 P Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2020 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (zlh)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, September 28, 2020
4 4 12 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/28 8:24 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by David S. Catuogno on behalf of David Gamburg. (Catuogno, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2020
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/31 8:50 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brian Gregory Hannon on behalf of Solomon Halioua, Montvale Medical Group, LLC. (Hannon, Brian)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-01410 Complaint by Solomon Halioua, Montvale Medical Group, LLC against David Gamburg. Fee Amount $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Attachments: # 1 Summons) filed by Plaintiff Solomon Halioua, Plaintiff Montvale Medical Group, LLC
Friday, July 17, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 07/17 8:34 AM
Summons Issued to Solomon Halioua, Montvale Medical Group, LLC for Service on David Gamburg Answer due on 8/17/2020 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 10/20/2020 at 02:00 PM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (smz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
Thursday, July 16, 2020
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 07/16 5:30 PM
Adversary case 20-01410 Complaint by Solomon Halioua, Montvale Medical Group, LLC against David Gamburg. Fee Amount $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Hannon, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Summons