Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-05652
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2020
Re-opened:Jun 23, 2020
Terminated:Oct 27, 2020
Case in other court:California Northern, 3:18-cv-05046
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 13, 2021 4:04 AM EST
Defendant
MCKESSON CORPORATION
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
SHARON DOUGLASS MAYO
Arnold & Porter Llp - San Francisco Ca
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHNNY SAINZ
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DORIS RICHARDSON
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LYNNETTE REGALADO
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ANDREA PRAGER
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVENNIA POPE
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BACLY PHANVONGSA
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JODY M ORSO
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
NADA R WATSON
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
EDWARD VELASQUEZ
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DEREL SMITH
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
VIANIA CAMPBELL
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
NINA GOLLER
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
GEORGIANNA FERGUSON
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERTA DOWNS
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TERRIE DONADIO
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LINZY M BAILEY
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL ANDREWS
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TIM MARTINEZ
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
GREGORY LANIER
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ALLEN HUI
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CARTER HOLSTER
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MAURICE HANSON
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY GRIFFIN
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
ARMANDO SANCHEZ
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARLENE MILLER
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RENEE HEAVY RUNNER
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
GINA RODRIGUEZ
Terminated: 10/27/2020
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LUCILLE ROBINSON
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BIANCA ROBINSON
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARY ORNELAS
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
PAUL MOORE
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MANUEL AYAN
Terminated: 10/08/2020
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DAWN M. TURK
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CHARLES YOUNG
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
NORMA A YOUMANS
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LINDA WOODS
Terminated: 10/27/2020
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KAREN M WITHERBY
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SHARON L WILLIAMS
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
INGA WHITE
Terminated: 10/27/2020
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SCOTT WEAVER
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
FRENCHIE SCRIVENS
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SHARON THOMPSON
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TOMMY THOMAS
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
EVELYN THOMAS
Terminated: 10/27/2020
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JESSE SULLIVAN
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BILLY RAY STEWART
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
GWENDOLYN SORTOR
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TOBIE A SHERRILL
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TESHAWN GAITHER
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SHANNON EDMONDS
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RODNEY D CULLORS
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BRYANT COULTER
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RICKY MCCLARITY
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CLARA BRYANT
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ANNE BLANCO
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
GRACIE V BERRY
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARKITTA BENNETT
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ALMA ALFORD
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DAWN FINS ACERRO
Terminated: 10/27/2020
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES HAISSER
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LISA MCNAIR
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TAMMY MCCARTY
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DUANE MARTIN
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JEANNETTE MALDONADO
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LUZ MARIE LOMELI VELASCO
Terminated: 10/27/2020
Represented By
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSEPH E LEWIS
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SHERRION KEMP
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BEVERLY JONES
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LYDIA JOHNSON
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
NERISSA HARRIS
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
NOVA HALE
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info

GPO Jul 09 2020
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-32) by MDL Panel (MDL 2734) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
23 23 18 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 10/28 11:21 AM
ORDER - The Court has determined that the cases identified on Exhibit A were dismissed with prejudice from multi-plaintiff California complaints on October 4 or November 20, 2019, while the cases were still pending in California state court. Because those plaintiffs' cases should not have been returned to the active MDL docket, they are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2020. (case closed) (djb)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 10/27 4:12 PM
ORDER - The Court has been advised that the cases identified on Exhibit A were settled under the global settlement program for this litigation. Accordingly, the cases are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the active docket of the Court. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2020. GINA RODRIGUEZ, EVELYN THOMAS, INGA WHITE, LINDA WOODS, DAWN FINS ACERRO and LUZ MARIE LOMELI VELASCO terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 08, 2020
21 21 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 10/08 9:27 AM
CLERK'S DISMISSAL re20 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to MANUEL AYAN. (djb)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 10/08 12:46 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by MANUAL AYAN. (CARO, LOUISE)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2020
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/21 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LOUISE R CARO on behalf of All Plaintiffs (CARO, LOUISE)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2020
18 18 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/04 10:00 AM
ORDER - The Court has been advised that all but fourteen of the plaintiffs in these cases settled their respective claims under the global settlement program. The plaintiffs who settled their claims must file stipulations of dismissal by 8/13/2020 . Expert reports must be served on Defendants by October 2, 2020. By 10/9/2020 , 2020, Defendants must provide the Court with a written report identifying which of the fourteen plaintiffs timely produced an appropriate expert report and which did not. Failure to provide an expert report on specific causation that fully complies with Rule 26(a)(2) and this Order will constitute grounds for dismissal with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
17 17 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 07/17 11:07 AM
Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-05046. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 07/17 11:08 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:17 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Florida. (fabS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
16 16 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-32) by MDL Panel (MDL 2734) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida. (fabS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
15 15 ORDER GRANTING 14 STIPULATED REQUEST TO REOPEN CASE. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
14 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Re-Open Case filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
13 13 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL [DEFENDANT BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB CO.S SECOND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332, 1441, and 1446] against All Plaintiffs. Filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, August 31, 2018
12 12 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER(CTO-23) IN RE: ABILIFY (ARIPIPRAZOLOE) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL. 2734 (sxbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Case e-transferred to the Northern District of Florida and opened as case# 3:18-cv-2066. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 24, 2018
11 11 ORDER GRANTING 9 STIPULATED REQUEST TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 23, 2018
10 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc. for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Civ. L.R. 3-15 of Defendant Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Enns, Krista) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
9 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
8 8 ERRATA re5 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/22/2018.(jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
6 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
5 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 20, 2018
4 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/4/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 17, 2018
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-568849. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12605158). Filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet