Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Erik P Kimball
Case #: 9:11-bk-14183
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2011
Creditor Meeting:Apr 08, 2011
Terminated:Jan 24, 2019
Plan Confirmed:Nov 03, 2011

Debtor
Zeiger Crane Rental, Inc.
4651 Dyer Blvd
Riviera Beach, FL 33407-1028
Represented By
Steven E Seward
Seese, P.A.
contact info
Michael D. Seese, Esq.
Seese, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Heidi A Feinman
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, September 30, 2019
549 549 misc Affidavit Tue 10/01 3:54 PM
Amended Affidavit of Disbursements For The Fourth Quarter of 2018. Filed by Debtor Zeiger Crane Rental, Inc. . (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-]
548 548 misc Affidavit Tue 10/01 3:53 PM
Amended Affidavit of Disbursements For The Fourth Quarter of 2018. Filed by Debtor Zeiger Crane Rental, Inc. . (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-]