Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-05658
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 20, 2020
Re-opened:Jun 24, 2020
Terminated:Oct 27, 2020
Case in other court:California Northern, 3:18-cv-02514
Last checked: Saturday Jan 16, 2021 4:15 AM EST
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
SHARON DOUGLASS MAYO
Arnold & Porter Llp - San Francisco Ca
contact info
Defendant
MCKESSON CORPORATION
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Plaintiff
LEONARD TYLER
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
NICHOLAS BREEZE
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JANICE BROOKINS
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DELVIN GALLIMORE
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TRACY C HAYDEN
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TRACEY VICTORIA MCCRACLIN
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SHARON NORMAN
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL SHANKLIN
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ARIANA VENEGAS
Terminated: 08/06/2020
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info

GPO May 10 2018
MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Florida re MDL No. 2734. ***3:18-cv-01327*** (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018) Modified on 5/15/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
GPO Jul 08 2020
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 32) by MDL Panel TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Florida re: MDL No. 2734 (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
19 19 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 10/27 4:16 PM
ORDER - The Court has been advised that the cases identified on Exhibit A were settled under the global settlement program for this litigation. Accordingly, the cases are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the active docket of the Court. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2020
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/21 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LOUISE R CARO on behalf of All Plaintiffs (CARO, LOUISE)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2020
17 17 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/04 10:00 AM
ORDER - The Court has been advised that all but fourteen of the plaintiffs in these cases settled their respective claims under the global settlement program. The plaintiffs who settled their claims must file stipulations of dismissal by 8/13/2020 . Expert reports must be served on Defendants by October 2, 2020. By 10/9/2020 , 2020, Defendants must provide the Court with a written report identifying which of the fourteen plaintiffs timely produced an appropriate expert report and which did not. Failure to provide an expert report on specific causation that fully complies with Rule 26(a)(2) and this Order will constitute grounds for dismissal with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2020
16 16 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 07/20 10:17 AM
Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-02514. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 07/20 10:17 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:16 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
15 15 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 32) by MDL Panel TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Florida re: MDL No. 2734 (elyS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
14 14 Order, signed 6/24/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 13 Stipulation to Reopen Case.(klhS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
13 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Re-Open Case filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 28, 2020
12 12 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL [DEFENDANT BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB CO.S SECOND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. §§ 1332, 1441, AND 1446] against Nicholas Breeze, Janice Brookins, Delvin Gallimore, Tracy C. Hayden, Tracey Victoria McCraclin, Sharon Norman, Michael Shanklin, Leonard Tyler, Ariana Venegas. Filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, May 10, 2018
11 11 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Florida re MDL No. 2734. ***3:18-cv-01327*** (gbaS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 5/15/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
Related: [-]
10 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Nicholas Breeze. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 5/24/2018. Replies due by 5/31/2018.(Liakos, Jennifer) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
9 9 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-86) by MDL Panel on 05/10/2018. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 5/10/2018 (rcsS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 04, 2018
8 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 03, 2018
7 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
6 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. re5 Certificate of Counsel (Enns, Krista) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
Related: [-]
5 5 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re1 Notice of Removal, by Sharon D. Mayo on behalf of Bristol-Myers Squibb Company(Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, April 30, 2018
4 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc. for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Civ. L.R. 3-15 (Enns, Krista) Modified on 5/3/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/11/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company re1 Notice of Removal, (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action; Demand for Jury Trial from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-566068. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-12308117). Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) Modified on 5/3/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet