Utah District Court
Judge:Jill N Parrish
Referred: Daphne A Oberg
Case #: 2:20-cv-00520
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Jul 21, 2020
Terminated:Jul 30, 2024
Case in other court:3rd District Salt Lake County, 200903928
Last checked: Sunday Jan 17, 2021 3:54 AM MST
Defendant
Melissa Koerner
Represented By
Jaryl L. Rencher
Rencher Anjewierden
contact info
Benjamin K. Lusty
Rencher Anjewierden
contact info
Defendant
Westminster College
Represented By
Jaryl L. Rencher
Rencher Anjewierden
contact info
Benjamin K. Lusty
Rencher Anjewierden
contact info
Plaintiff
Emily Sharp Rains
881 BAXTER DR STE 100
SOUTH JORDAN, UT 84095

GPO Feb 01 2022
MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Compel IN RELATION TO CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION; (finding as moot 31 Motion to Expedite). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 2/1/22. (alf)
GPO Feb 01 2022
MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part re 32 MOTION to Compel Short Form and for In Camera Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 2/1/22. (alf)
GPO Feb 01 2022
MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion for Sanctions and 33 MOTION to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 2/1/22. (alf)
GPO Feb 01 2022
MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying re 50 MOTION to Compel Discovery Related to Background Checks of Emily Rains and for Sanctions (finding as moot MOTION to Expedite Ruling). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 2/1/22. (alf)
GPO Apr 26 2022
MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 26 Motion to Amend/Correct/File Amended Complaint to add Defendant. Ms. Rains shall file the second amended complaint in the form found at Doc. No. [26-1] within fourteen days of the date of this order. Once filed on the docket, the second amended complaint will be the operative complaint in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 4/26/22. (alf)
GPO Sep 09 2022
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 39 Motion to Quash; granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 9/9/2020. (alf)
GPO Dec 21 2022
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 67 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Westminster College, Richard Badenhausen, Melissa Koerner. See R&R for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 12/21/22. (jrj)
GPO Feb 07 2023
ORDER ADOPTING 109 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to 67 Motion to Dismiss Party, Richard Badenhausen: Richard Badenhausen is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 2/7/23 (alt)
GPO Mar 14 2023
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 112 114 Motion to Strike Deposition Notices. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/14/23. (dle)
GPO Apr 11 2023
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 117 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Sanctions for Spoliation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 4/11/23. (dle)
GPO Jul 08 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to grant in part and deny in part Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 126), to Dismiss Plaintiff's State Law Claims for Lack of Jurisdiction, and to deny Plaintiff's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 128). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 7/8/24. (dle)
GPO Jul 30 2024
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Report and Recommendation, ECF No. 146, is ADOPTED IN FULL. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/29/24. (dle)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
148 148 order Judgment Tue 07/30 8:27 AM
JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that summary judgment is entered in favor of Defendants Westminster College and Melissa Koerner and against Plaintiff Emily Sharp Rains as to CLAIM FOUR. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's remaining claims are dismissed without prejudice. Case Closed. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/29/24. (dle)
Related: [-]
147 147 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Order on Report and Recommendations Tue 07/30 8:22 AM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Report and Recommendation, ECF No. 146 , is ADOPTED IN FULL. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/29/24. (dle)
Related: [-]