New York Southern District Court
Judge:John P Cronan
Referred: Sarah L Cave
Case #: 1:20-cv-05642
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Jul 21, 2020
Terminated:Dec 14, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Jan 17, 2021 6:52 AM EST
Petitioner
Vector Media Group, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew Karr Parker
Hodgson Russ, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Joseph Paul Goldberg
Hodgson Russ, Llp (nyc)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Counter Claimant
All American Manufacturing and Supply
Terminated: 12/14/2020
Represented By
Hillel Ira Parness
Parness Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Mylocker.com, LLC
Terminated: 12/14/2020
Represented By
Hillel Ira Parness
Parness Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Vector Media Group, Inc.
Terminated: 12/14/2020
Represented By
Matthew Karr Parker
Hodgson Russ, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Joseph Paul Goldberg
Hodgson Russ, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Respondent
All American Manufacturing and Supply
Terminated: 12/14/2020
Represented By
Hillel Ira Parness
Parness Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Respondent
Mylocker.com, LLC
Terminated: 12/14/2020
Represented By
Hillel Ira Parness
Parness Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, January 15, 2021
31 31 2 pgs misc Satisfaction of Judgment Fri 01/15 8:54 AM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re:25 Judgment entered In favor of Vector Media Group, Inc. Against Mylocker.com, LLC in the amount of $135,778.57. Judgment satisfied on 01/14/2021.(km)
Related: [-]
30 30 2 pgs misc Satisfaction of Judgment Fri 01/15 8:52 AM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re:24 Judgment entered In favor of Vector Media Group, Inc. Against All American Manufacturing and Supply in the amount of $7,210.19. Judgment satisfied on 01/14/2021.(km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 14, 2021
29 29 misc Proposed Satisfaction of Judgment Thu 01/14 5:48 PM
PROPOSED FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT. Satisfaction of Judgment to be Mailed by the Court. Document filed by All American Manufacturing and Supply..(Parness, Hillel) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Proposed Satisfaction of Judgment Thu 01/14 5:48 PM
PROPOSED FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT. Satisfaction of Judgment to be Mailed by the Court. Document filed by Mylocker.com, LLC..(Parness, Hillel) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Proposed Satisfaction of Judgment Thu 01/14 11:41 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT. Satisfaction of Judgment to be Mailed by the Court. Document filed by Vector Media Group, Inc.(Goldberg, Joseph) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 1/14/2021 (dt)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Proposed Satisfaction of Judgment Thu 01/14 11:40 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT. Satisfaction of Judgment to be Mailed by the Court. Document filed by Vector Media Group, Inc.(Goldberg, Joseph) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 1/14/2021 (dt)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Proposed Satisfaction of Judgment Thu 01/14 12:10 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT: Notice to Attorney Joseph Goldberg. RE-FILE Document No. 26 Proposed Satisfaction of Judgment. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the proposed satisfaction of judgment is not signed (ink signatures); the proposed satisfaction of judgment is not notarized; Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Satisfaction of Judgment found under the event list Proposed Orders - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF that lists the following - the correct entry date of the judgment, the correct name of the party(ies) the judgment is in favor of, the correct name of the party(ies) the judgment is against, the correct amount of the judgment - and is notarized. (dt)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Proposed Satisfaction of Judgment Thu 01/14 12:11 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT: Notice to Attorney Joseph Goldberg. RE-FILE Document No. 27 Proposed Satisfaction of Judgment. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the proposed satisfaction of judgment is not signed (ink signatures); the proposed satisfaction of judgment is not notarized; Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Satisfaction of Judgment found under the event list Proposed Orders - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF that lists the following - the correct entry date of the judgment, the correct name of the party(ies) the judgment is in favor of, the correct name of the party(ies) the judgment is against, the correct amount of the judgment - and is notarized. (dt)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2020
25 25 2 pgs order Judgment ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Mon 12/14 3:03 PM
JUDGMENT. It is ADJUDGED that Petitioner Vector Media Group, Inc., a New York corporation with a place of business at 99 Madison Avenue, 10th Floor, New York, New York 10016, does recover of Respondent MyLocker.Com, L.L.C. d/b/a My Locker.Net, a Michigan limited liability company with a principal place of business located at 1300 Rosa Parks Blvd., Detroit, Michigan 48216, the sum of One Hundred Thirty Five Thousand Seven Hundred Seventy Eight Dollars and Fifty Seven Cents ($135,778.57), plus post-judgment interest thereon at the statutory rate, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1961, from the date judgment is entered until the date judgment is paid. There being no just reason for delay, the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to enter this Judgment against Respondent MyLocker.Com, L.L.C. d/b/a My Locker.Net forthwith and without further notice. SO ORDERED. Vector Media Group, Inc. and Mylocker.com, LLC terminated. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/14/2020) (rjm)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Judgment ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Mon 12/14 2:51 PM
JUDGMENT. It is ADJUDGED that Petitioner Vector Media Group, Inc., a New York corporation with a place of business at 99 Madison Avenue, 10th Floor, New York, New York 10016, does recover of Respondent All Americanlook, Inc. a/k/a All American Manufacturing and Supply, a Pennsylvania corporation with a principal place of business located at 495 E. Erie Ave., Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19134, the sum of Seven Thousand Two Hundred Ten Dollars and Nineteen Cents ($7,210.19), plus post-judgment interest thereon at the statutory rate, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1961, from the date judgment is entered until the date judgment is paid. There being no just reason for delay, the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to enter this Judgment against Respondent All Americanlook, Inc. a/k/a All American Manufacturing and Supply forthwith and without further notice. SO ORDERED. All American Manufacturing and Supply terminated. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/14/2020) (rjm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
23 23 misc Proposed Judgment Fri 12/11 11:18 AM
PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Vector Media Group, Inc...(Goldberg, Joseph) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Proposed Judgment Fri 12/11 11:17 AM
PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Vector Media Group, Inc...(Goldberg, Joseph) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Fri 12/11 12:02 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. 22 Proposed Judgment 23 Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2020
21 21 order Memo Endorsement Mon 12/07 2:52 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT re:20 Letter filed by Vector Media Group, Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: Petitioner shall file a proposed judgment against each Respondent by December 21, 2020. The judgment shall include the statutorily specified post-judgment interest rate and a citation to relevant authority. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/5/2020) (nb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2020
20 20 misc Letter Thu 11/05 11:06 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Joseph Goldberg dated 11/5/2020 re: Request entry of judgment. Document filed by Vector Media Group, Inc...(Goldberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
19 19 2 pgs misc Letter Thu 10/15 2:31 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Joseph P. Goldberg dated 10/15/2020 re: docket no. 17. Document filed by Vector Media Group, Inc...(Goldberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
18 18 1 pgs order Order Wed 10/14 11:03 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-john-p-cronan. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, all prior orders, dates, and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the case's reassignment. Any currently scheduled conference or oral argument before this Court is adjourned pending further order of this Court, but any conference or oral argument before the Magistrate Judge will proceed as ordered. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/13/2020) (ama)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Wed 09/30 3:45 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John Peter Cronan. Judge Jed S. Rakoff is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
17 17 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/16 11:41 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER re:16 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. This matter having been referred to the undersigned to conduct an inquest and issue a report and recommendation concerning Plaintiff's attorney's fees and costs (ECF No. 16), it is hereby ORDERED that: By October 16, 2020, Plaintiff shall file a brief letter outlining its request for attorneys fees and costs, accompanied by the attached Attorneys' Fees and Costs Charts. Plaintiff must support all factual assertions and requests with evidentiary material. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 9/16/2020) (kv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
16 16 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 09/15 4:47 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Inquest After Default/Damages Hearing: All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/15/2020) (jwh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
15 15 11 pgs order Order Tue 09/08 5:21 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Because respondents' vacatur motion is untimely under the Federal Arbitration Act (the "FAA"), the Court denies respondents' cross-motion to vacate and correspondingly grants petitioner's motion to confirm the award. The Court also grants petitioner's motion to confirm the award. The Court also grants peititoner's request for attorneys' fees incurred in connection with this confirmation proceeding and refers the matter to the designated Magistrate Judge for an inquest into the proper amount. (As further set forth herein this Order.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/8/2020) (va)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
14 14 9 pgs respoth Reply Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion) Thu 08/27 5:22 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support OF PETITION TO CONFIRM THE ARBITRATION AWARD . Document filed by Vector Media Group, Inc...(Goldberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2020
13 13 respoth Response (non-motion) Fri 08/21 4:16 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE re:8 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,,11 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support . Document filed by All American Manufacturing and Supply, Mylocker.com, LLC..(Parness, Hillel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Matthew D. Novello,
Att: 2 3 pgs Affidavit Declaration of Mike Sova
Friday, August 07, 2020
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 08/07 3:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/7/2020. (Kotowski, Linda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2020
12 12 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Thu 08/06 5:31 PM
DECLARATION of Joseph P. Goldberg in Support re:1 Notice of Removal,. Document filed by Vector Media Group, Inc...(Goldberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affirmation of Joseph P. Goldberg in support of claimant's motion for summary judgment,
Att: 2 Declaration of Lee Goldberg in support of claimant's motion for summary judgment,
Att: 3 Letter and email serving Vector's motion for summary judgment,
Att: 4 emails in the underlying arbitration,
Att: 5 November 6, 2019 email from JAMS,
Att: 6 November 6, 2019 email from Matthew Novello,
Att: 7 November 12, 2019 email from Matthew Novello,
Att: 8 November 13, 2019 email from Matthew Novello,
Att: 9 November 20, 2019 email from Matthew Novello,
Att: 10 December 9, 2019 cease and desist letter to Matthew Novello,
Att: 11 December 20, 2019 email from Matthew Novello,
Att: 12 February 27, 2020 JAMS deposit request to Matthew Novello,
Att: 13 March 10, 2020 email from JAMS attaching Final Award,
Att: 14 March 10, 2020 Final Award with Proof of Service,
Att: 15 March 17, 2020 email from JAMS attaching Amended Final Award
11 11 13 pgs respoth Reply Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion) Thu 08/06 4:06 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:1 Notice of Removal, . Document filed by Vector Media Group, Inc...(Goldberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2020
10 10 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 07/31 6:38 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by All American Manufacturing and Supply, Mylocker.com, LLC..(Parness, Hillel)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 07/31 1:28 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Vector Media Group, Inc...(Parker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
8 8 7 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Tue 07/28 12:03 PM
ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Vector Media Group, Inc.. Document filed by All American Manufacturing and Supply, Mylocker.com, LLC..(Parness, Hillel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Affidavit Declaration of Matthew Novello,
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit Novello Exhibit A - 2020.07.17 Email Request,
Att: 3 2 pgs Affidavit Declaration of J. Adam Behrendt,
Att: 4 Exhibit Behrendt Exhibit A 2020.07.17 1031 JAMS to AB,
Att: 5 Exhibit Behrendt Exhibit B 2020.07.17 1400 JG to MK,
Att: 6 2 pgs Affidavit Declaration of Hillel I. Parness,
Att: 7 Exhibit Parness Exhibit A - 2020.03.17 Amended Final Award,
Att: 8 Exhibit Parness Exhibit B - Comprehensive Arbitration Rules and Procedures _ JAMS Mediation, Arbitration, ADR Services,
Att: 9 11 pgs Supplement Memo of Law In Support of Opposition to Petition to Confirm, and Cross-Petition to Vacate, Arbitration Award
Friday, July 24, 2020
7 7 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 07/24 5:31 PM
NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 8/7/2020 at 11:15 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/24/2020) (jca)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Other Fri 07/24 5:02 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Petition and Verified Petition served on Mylocker.com, LLC dba Mylocker.net on July 13, 2020. Service was accepted by Veronica Salazar. Document filed by Vector Media Group, Inc...(Parker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Other Fri 07/24 4:59 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Petition and Verified Petition served on All American Manufacturing and Supply on July 13, 2020. Document filed by Vector Media Group, Inc...(Parker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/24 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Karr Parker on behalf of Vector Media Group, Inc...(Parker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/24 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Paul Goldberg on behalf of Vector Media Group, Inc...(Goldberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
2 2 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 07/22 10:35 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Parness, Hillel)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 07/22 10:13 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Hillel Ira Parness. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 09:1;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Wed 07/22 10:13 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Hillel Ira Parness. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 07/22 10:16 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 07/22 10:16 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 07/22 10:17 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2020
1 1 4 pgs notice Notice of Removal Tue 07/21 4:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 651995/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20781969).Document filed by All American Manufacturing and Supply, Mylocker.com, LLC..(Parness, Hillel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 114 pgs Exhibit EX A All Prior State Pleadings