California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Richard M Neiter
Case #: 2:14-bk-19827
Case Filed:May 19, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Jun 25, 2014
Dismissed:Apr 01, 2015
Terminated:Apr 14, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Medcafe Westwood, LLC
1901 Avenue of the Stars Ste 1100
Los Angeles, CA 90067-6002
Represented By
Lewis R Landau
Horgan Rosen Beckham & Coren LLP
contact info
Justin Santarosa
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Hatty K Yip
Office Of The Ust/doj
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/02/2015 5:00 PM PDT
Monday, May 19, 2014
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:14-bk-19827) [misc,volp11] (1213.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 36995509. Fee amount 1213.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1213 Filed by Medcafe Westwood, LLC Schedule A due 06/2/2014. Schedule B due 06/2/2014. Schedule D due 06/2/2014. Schedule E due 06/2/2014. Schedule F due 06/2/2014. Schedule G due 06/2/2014. Schedule H due 06/2/2014. Statement of Financial Affairs due 06/2/2014. List of Equity Security Holders due 06/2/2014.Statement of Related Case due 06/2/2014. Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions due 06/2/2014. Summary of schedules due 06/2/2014. Declaration concerning debtors schedules due 06/2/2014. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor due 06/2/2014. Venue Disclosure Form due 06/2/2014. Corporate Ownership Statement due by 06/2/2014. Incomplete Filings due by 06/2/2014. (Landau, Lewis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Electronic Filing Declaration