Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Charlene Edwards Honeywel
Referred: Julie S Sneed
Case #: 8:14-cv-01182
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:May 19, 2014
Terminated:Dec 08, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 16, 2014 4:56 AM EST
Defendant
Buccaneers Limited Partnership
Represented By
Thomas M. Gonzalez
Thompson, Sizemore, Gonzalez & Hearing, PA
contact info
Mediator
James G. Brown
Represented By
James G. Brown
Ford & Harrison, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Manouchcar Pierre-Val
Represented By
Kimberly De Arcangelis Woods
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info
Andrew Ross Frisch
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info


1. Tampa Bay Buccaneers cheerleaders get $825,000 in wage lawsuit settlement (washingtonpost.com)
Submitted Mon 03/09/2015
Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
75 75 notice Notice to counsel of filing of official transcript Tue 07/28 4:26 PM
NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson. (SRC)
Related: [-]
74 74 misc Transcript Tue 07/28 4:26 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing (Final Fairness Hearing) held on 10/1/2015 before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sherrill L. Jackson, email: stenorella@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 8/18/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/28/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2020. (SRC)
Related: [-]