Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-05682
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2020
Re-opened:Jun 24, 2020
Terminated:Oct 27, 2020
Case in other court:California Northern, 4:18-cv-04806
Last checked: Saturday Jan 23, 2021 4:49 AM EST
Defendant
MCKESSON CORPORATION
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
SHARON DOUGLASS MAYO
Arnold & Porter Llp - San Francisco Ca
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Plaintiff
CHARRAE SMITH
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
NINA UEDA
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIA CANO
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
AMANDA COLLINS
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARGO FIRESTONE
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
RALPH KNUTH
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BRENTON HALE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIE LEE, JR
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MISTY MILEY
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
VALERIE MILLER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DENISA MITCHELL
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RAYMOND MITCHELL
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES MORRIS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TABITHA MUJIHAD
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARY NEWSON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LAURA NICHOLS
Terminated: 10/27/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ANGELA MARIE PAYNE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JENNIFER PORTER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
NICOLAS RADO
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TABITHA REDENBAUGH
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
NAKIIA DELORES ROBERTS
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHELLE SOUZA
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DEBRA STOLTE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIO TREVINO
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
VIRGINIA VANWINKLE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LYNN WESLEY
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JESSE GONZALES
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TARIQ AHMAD
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIE ALONSO
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LAURIE ARRELOA
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LADONNA BINKERD
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMIE BLAKE
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DORETHA BRAGGS
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CRAIG BUCK
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SHAWN BUTKUS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RICKY CAMPBELL
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TREMAYNE CHAPMAN
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KISHA CRISP
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DON STEVEN DALTON
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ALEX DIAKOGIANNIS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JANET LYNN DOCKERY
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
IDALIA DUENES
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JESSICA ESQUER
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CANDEE FAST
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TARIQ FATTAAH
Terminated: 08/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
STEVEN FORTNER
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JACQUELINE HICKS
Terminated: 10/21/2020
Represented By
RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Kirtland & Packard - El Segundo Ca
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info

GPO Aug 20 2018
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. This action is transferred to the Northern District of Florida. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
21 21 18 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 10/28 9:43 AM
ORDER - The Court has determined that the cases identified on Exhibit A were dismissed with prejudice from multi-plaintiff California complaints on October 4 or November 20, 2019, while the cases were still pending in California state court. Because those plaintiffs' cases should not have been returned to the active MDL docket, they are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2020. (case closed) (djb)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 10/27 4:03 PM
ORDER - The Court has been advised that the cases identified on Exhibit A were settled under the global settlement program for this litigation. Accordingly, the cases are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the active docket of the Court. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2020. LAURA NICHOLS terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
19 19 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 10/21 3:31 PM
ORDER - The Court has determined that the cases identified on Exhibit A were dismissed from multi-plaintiff California complaints by stipulation of the parties for lack of personal jurisdiction on October 1, 2018. See Case No. 3:16md2734, ECF No. 1008. Thereafter, the California complaints were remanded to California state court. See id., ECF No. 1043. The California complaints later were re-removed and transferred to the MDL, pursuant to the Court's Order dated February 5, 2020. See ECF No. 1238. On re-removal, all of the California plaintiffs were returned to the Courts active docket-including the plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A, whose claims were previously dismissed. Because those plaintiffs' cases should not have been returned to the active MDL docket, they are hereby DISMISSED. The Clerk is directed to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/21/2020. LADONNA BINKERD, JAMIE BLAKE, CRAIG BUCK, SHAWN BUTKUS, RICKY CAMPBELL, TREMAYNE CHAPMAN, DON STEVEN DALTON, ALEX DIAKOGIANNIS, JANET LYNN DOCKERY, IDALIA DUENES, CANDEE FAST, STEVEN FORTNER, JESSE GONZALES, BRENTON HALE, JACQUELINE HICKS, RALPH KNUTH, VALERIE MILLER, DENISA MITCHELL, RAYMOND MITCHELL, JAMES MORRIS, TABITHA MUJIHAD, MARY NEWSON, ANGELA MARIE PAYNE, JENNIFER PORTER, TABITHA REDENBAUGH, DEBRA STOLTE, MARIO TREVINO, VIRGINIA VANWINKLE, TARIQ AHMAD and LAURIE ARRELOA terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2020
18 18 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/04 10:00 AM
ORDER - The Court has been advised that all but fourteen of the plaintiffs in these cases settled their respective claims under the global settlement program. The plaintiffs who settled their claims must file stipulations of dismissal by 8/13/2020 . Expert reports must be served on Defendants by October 2, 2020. By 10/9/2020 , 2020, Defendants must provide the Court with a written report identifying which of the fourteen plaintiffs timely produced an appropriate expert report and which did not. Failure to provide an expert report on specific causation that fully complies with Rule 26(a)(2) and this Order will constitute grounds for dismissal with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2020
17 17 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 07/27 2:00 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-04806. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 07/27 2:01 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:17 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
16 16 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by MDL Panel Clerk on 7/8/2020. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
15 15 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING the clerk to re-open Crisp v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-4806 The Court understands that the parties anticipate that the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation will transfer this action to the Abilify MDL, MDL No. 2734. This terminates Dkt. No. 14 the parties' stipulation to re-open the case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
14 14 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED]ORDER To Re-Open Case filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., Kisha Crisp. (Mayo, Sharon) Modified on 6/24/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
13 13 DEFENDANT BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB CO.S SECOND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332, 1441, and 1446 against All Plaintiffs. Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Mayo, Sharon) Modified on 6/1/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
Case has been successfully transferred to the Northern District of Florida. Their case number is 3:18-cv-2036. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
11 11 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re1 Notice of Removal, by Sharon D. Mayo on behalf of Bristol-Myers Squibb Company(Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, August 20, 2018
12 12 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. This action is transferred to the Northern District of Florida. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 16, 2018
10 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for November 13, 2018, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by November 6, 2018. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:18-cv-04806-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/16/18. (haS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 15, 2018
8 8 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer To The Abilify MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka American Pharmaceutical, Inc., Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd, and all Plaintiffs. (Gramacy, Ryan) Modified on 8/16/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
7 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc. for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Enns, Krista) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
6 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
5 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.. (Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 09, 2018
4 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/23/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 08, 2018
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-568685. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12579611). Filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet