Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Nitza I Quinones Alejandr
Case #: 2:20-cv-03649
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction Against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Jan 23, 2021 5:00 AM EST
Counter Claimant
JOSEPH T. MASRUD
Represented By
MICHAEL D. HOMANS
Homans Peck LLC
contact info
JULIANNE PECK
Homans Peck LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
POLYSCIENCES, INC.
Represented By
ERIC E. REED
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
STEVEN JOSEPH DAROCI, II
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
JONATHAN R. LAGARENNE
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
CALI R. SPOTA
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
GERARD P. NORTON
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOSEPH T. MASRUD
Represented By
MICHAEL D. HOMANS
Homans Peck LLC
contact info
JULIANNE PECK
Homans Peck LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
POLYSCIENCES, INC.
Represented By
ERIC E. REED
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
STEVEN JOSEPH DAROCI, II
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
JONATHAN R. LAGARENNE
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
CALI R. SPOTA
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
GERARD P. NORTON
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Respondent
MATTHEW W. GRIFFIN
1705 MORRIS CT.
NORTH WALES, PA 19454


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
297 297 order Order on Motion to Seal Document Tue 05/13 3:00 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SEAL, (ECF 294), AND FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED, AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE EXHIBITS 1 THROUGH 3 TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO RECONSIDER, (ECF 293-3, 293-4, AND 293-5), UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/13/2025.5/13/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
296 296 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 05/13 10:11 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re293 MOTION for Reconsideration re280 Order on Motion for Sanctions, filed by JOSEPH T. MASRUD, SEROCHEM LLC.. (PECK, JULIANNE)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
295 295 trial Exhibit Tue 05/13 8:45 AM
Exhibits re293 MOTION for Reconsideration by POLYSCIENCES, INC. *FILED UNDER SEAL* (lisad, ) (lisad, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/13/2025) Sealed Exhibit 2_ECF 109,
Att: 2 (5/13/2025) Sealed Exhibit 3_Bihovsky Report
294 294 motion Seal Document Mon 05/12 4:39 PM
MOTION to Seal Document293 MOTION for Reconsideration re280 Order on Motion for Sanctions, Exhibits 1 through 3 filed by POLYSCIENCES, INC., POLYSCIENCES, INC..Certificate of Service.(VERNICK, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
293 293 motion Reconsideration Mon 05/12 4:34 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re280 Order on Motion for Sanctions, filed by POLYSCIENCES, INC., POLYSCIENCES, INC..Brief and Certificate of Service.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief and Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal),
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal),
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal),
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 (Sur-Reply)(VERNICK, SCOTT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
292 292 1 pgs order Order on Motion in Limine Thu 05/08 3:10 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE OF PRIOR ROUTINE DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (ECF 234), DEFENDANTS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION, (ECF 261), AND PLAINTIFFS REPLY, (ECF 270), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. ACCORDINGLY, DEFENDANTS ARE PRECLUDED FROM INTRODUCING ANY EVIDENCE AND/OR ARGUMENT WITH RESPECT TO DISCOVERY DISPUTES THAT OCCURRED OVER THE COURSE OF THIS LITIGATION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/8/2025.5/8/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
291 291 1 pgs order Order on Motion in Limine Thu 05/08 3:03 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE IRRELEVANT AND PREJUDICIAL STATEMENTS IN POLYSCIENCES TRADE SECRET IDENTIFICATIONS, (ECF 241, 248), AND PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION, (ECF 259), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/8/2025.5/8/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
290 290 1 pgs order Order on Motion in Limine Thu 05/08 3:01 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE SPECIFIC INADMISSIBLE ABUSE OF PROCESS ARGUMENTS AND EVIDENCE, (ECF 231), DEFENDANTS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION, (ECF 262), AND PLAINTIFFS REPLY, (ECF 270), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: (1) THE MOTION IS GRANTED WITH RESPECT TO THE INTRODUCTION OF ANY EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT AS TO PLAINTIFFS ALLEGED FAILURES TO COMPLY WITH DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS OR ORDERS; AND (2) THE MOTION IS DENIED WITH RESPECT TO THE INTRODUCTION OF ANY EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT AS TO PLAINTIFFS INITIATION AND CONTINUATION OF THIS LITIGATION AND THE JOINTLY REQUESTED AND AGREED-TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/8/2025.5/8/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
289 289 1 pgs order Order on Motion in Limine Thu 05/08 2:59 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS FROM INTRODUCING SUPPOSED EVIDENCE OF LOST PROFITS, (ECF 232), DEFENDANTS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION, (ECF 256), AND PLAINTIFFS REPLY, (ECF 271), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/8/2025.5/8/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
288 288 1 pgs order Order on Motion in Limine Thu 05/08 2:57 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE CONCERNING OR REFERENCING CO-DEFENDANT MATHEW GRIFFINS DISMISSED ABUSE OF PROCESS COUNTERCLAIM, (ECF 239), AND PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION, (ECF 257), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. ACCORDINGLY, PLAINTIFF IS PRECLUDED FROM INTRODUCING ANY EVIDENCE AND/OR ARGUMENT REGARDING THE DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT MATHEW GRIFFINS ABUSE OF PROCESS CLAIM. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/8/2025.5/8/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
287 287 1 pgs order Order on Motion in Limine Thu 05/08 2:55 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF EVIDENCE 401, 402, AND 403, (ECF 233), AND DEFENDANTS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION, (ECF 260), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: (1) PLAINTIFFS MOTION IS GRANTED, BY AGREEMENT, WITH RESPECT TO THE PRECLUSION OF EVIDENCE OF UNRELATED LAWSUITS; AND (2) THE MOTION IS DENIED WITH RESPECT TO EVIDENCE OF INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT 6,013,240 AND POLYSCIENCES FINANCIAL POSITION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/8/2025.5/8/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
286 286 1 pgs order Order on Motion in Limine Thu 05/08 2:53 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE LEGAL CONCLUSIONS AND/OR STATE OF MIND OPINIONS BY DR. JOACHIM KOHN, (ECF 240, 247), AND PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION, (ECF 258), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/8/2025.5/8/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
285 285 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Hearing Thu 05/08 2:51 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT (DOC. 268) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/8/2025.5/8/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
284 284 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/07 10:36 PM
NOTICE by MATHEW W. GRIFFIN, MATHEW GRIFFIN, JOSEPH T. MASRUD, SEROCHEM LLC. Corrected Deposition Designations for Michael ("Ryan") Ott (PECK, JULIANNE)
Related: [-]
283 283 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/07 7:37 PM
NOTICE by POLYSCIENCES, INC. of Deposition Designations(VERNICK, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. A - Deposition Designations of Gary Willman,
Att: 2 Ex. B - Deposition Designations of Muluken Taye
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
282 282 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 05/07 9:30 AM
PLAINTIFF POLYSCIENCES, INC.S SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO RULE 37 (ECF 252), filed by POLYSCIENCES, INC.. (sg)
Related: [-]
281 281 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 05/07 9:27 AM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY, (ECF 279), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED, AND THE SUR-REPLY ATTACHED TO THE UNDERLYING MOTION AS EXHIBIT A SHALL BE DEEMED FILED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/6/2025. 5/7/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]