Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-05690
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2020
Terminated:Apr 26, 2022
Case in other court:California Central, 2:20-cv-06110
Last checked: Sunday Jan 24, 2021 5:39 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
MICHAEL H. CHEN
Represented By
MICHAEL H CHEN
Chen Law Group - Whittier Ca
contact info
Michael H Chen
The Law Offices Of Chen & Tran
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
ETHAN SPANN
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
ANTHONY MARTINEZ
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
BRIAN NOMI
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
DARRELL M. PADGETTE
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
JEFF PIERCE
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
DAVID RAMIREZ
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
CARLOS RAZON
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
STEVEN ROMEYN
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
AMANDA RUNDLE
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
CARLOS JIMENEZ
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
DAMIEN STEMLEY
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
VICTOR TORRES
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
BRIAN YOO
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
MARK LOPEZ
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
CARLO LAZO
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
BLAKE KIBO
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
JAY HONG
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
CLARK DOAN
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
JAMES DIAMOND
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
THOMAS DELUCCIA
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
JEFFREY CROSS
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
JASON COUGHENOUR
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Plaintiff
RUBEN CARDENAS
Terminated: 07/28/2020


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
40 40 1 pgs order Order Order Dismissing Case Tue 04/26 9:20 AM
ORDER granting 16 REQUEST AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court hereby dismisses the above-entitled action, and the Clerk is directed to close this case in its entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/26/2022. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
39 39 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:44 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by BRIAN YOO. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
38 38 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:43 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by VICTOR TORRES. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:42 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by DAMIEN STEMLEY. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:41 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by ETHAN SPANN. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:40 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by AMANDA RUNDLE. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:39 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by STEVEN ROMEYN. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:38 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by CARLOS RAZON. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:37 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by DAVID RAMIREZ. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:34 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by JEFF PIERCE. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:32 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by BRIAN NOMI. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:31 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by ANTHONY MARTINEZ. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:26 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by MARK LOPEZ. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:25 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by CARLO LAZO. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:24 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by BLAKE KIBO. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:23 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by CARLOS JIMENEZ. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:19 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by JAY HONG. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:13 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by CLARK DOAN. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:11 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by JAMES DIAMOND. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:07 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by THOMAS DELUCCIA. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 6:06 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by JEFFREY CROSS. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 5:59 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by JASON COUGHENOUR. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 5:58 PM
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice by RUBEN CARDENAS. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 5:56 PM
for Dismissal Without Prejudice by DARRELL M. PADGETTE. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Request/Demand Mon 03/28 5:40 PM
for Dismissal Without Prejudice by MICHAEL H. CHEN. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
14 14 misc Request/Demand Fri 03/25 11:34 AM
for Dismissal Without Prejudice by MICHAEL H. CHEN, JASON COUGHENOUR, JEFFREY CROSS, THOMAS DELUCCIA, JAMES DIAMOND, CLARK DOAN, JAY HONG, CARLOS JIMENEZ, BLAKE KIBO, CARLO LAZO, MARK LOPEZ, ANTHONY MARTINEZ, BRIAN NOMI, DARRELL M. PADGETTE, JEFF PIERCE, DAVID RAMIREZ, CARLOS RAZON, STEVEN ROMEYN, AMANDA RUNDLE, ETHAN SPANN, DAMIEN STEMLEY, VICTOR TORRES, BRIAN YOO. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Fri 03/25 1:30 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: : See 3:19-md-02885-MCR-GRJ ECF No. 763 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17. "Any Plaintiff who wishes to voluntarily dismiss any case filed in or transferred to this MDL must comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)." Must be filed in each individual case. Re14 Request/Demand, filed by CARLOS RAZON, BLAKE KIBO, JASON COUGHENOUR, MICHAEL H. CHEN, CARLOS JIMENEZ, THOMAS DELUCCIA, STEVEN ROMEYN, CARLO LAZO, JEFF PIERCE, BRIAN YOO, DARRELL M. PADGETTE, DAVID RAMIREZ, BRIAN NOMI, VICTOR TORRES, ETHAN SPANN, MARK LOPEZ, JAMES DIAMOND, JAY HONG, AMANDA RUNDLE, JEFFREY CROSS, DAMIEN STEMLEY, CLARK DOAN, ANTHONY MARTINEZ (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 24, 2020
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/24 5:20 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (SHORT FORM) against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by MICHAEL H. CHEN. (CHEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
12 12 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 07/28 3:12 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. For any multi-plaintiff complaints filed after the date of this Order, each plaintiff will be subject to automatic severance and dismissal without prejudice. All subsequent short form complaints filed by plaintiffs who are severed and dismissed pursuant to this provision must be accompanied by appropriate filing fees and will be assigned separate civil action numbers by the Clerk. re 10 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. (Chen's Master Short Form Complaint (Amended Complaint) due by 8/27/2020 .), JEFFREY CROSS, THOMAS DELUCCIA, JAMES DIAMOND, CLARK DOAN, JAY HONG, CARLOS JIMENEZ, BLAKE KIBO, CARLO LAZO, MARK LOPEZ, ANTHONY MARTINEZ, BRIAN NOMI, DARRELL M. PADGETTE, JEFF PIERCE, DAVID RAMIREZ, CARLOS RAZON, STEVEN ROMEYN, AMANDA RUNDLE, ETHAN SPANN, DAMIEN STEMLEY, VICTOR TORRES, BRIAN YOO, RUBEN CARDENAS and JASON COUGHENOUR terminated. (djb)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 07/28 1:22 PM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION AND ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT as to Attorney, Michael H. Chen. (djb)
Related: [-]
10 10 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 07/28 11:25 AM
Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-06110. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2020
9 9 TRANSMITTAL LETTER - MDL CASE TRANSFER OUT: A certified copy of the MDL 2885 Order with electronic docket sheet sent to USDC Northern District of Florida at Pensacola on 7/27/2020. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2020.]
Related: [-]
8 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO- 69) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2885, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable M Casey Rodgers. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
7 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael H. Chen, upon Defendant 3M Company served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chen, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2020.]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
6 6 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2020.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
5 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet, No. 2 Summons in a Civil Action and No. 3 Notice of Interested Parties should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2020.]
Related: [-]
4 4 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants 3M Company, AEARO Technologies LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo, LLC. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2020.]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2020.]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27137155 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Blake Kibo, Ethan Spann, James Diamond, David Ramirez, Darrell Mevlut Padgette, Damien Stemley, Michael Hsueh Hsien Chen, Carlos Razon, Victor Torres, Jeff Pierce, Mark Lopez, Thomas Deluccia, Ruben Cardenas, Jay Hong, Carlo Lazo, Amanda Rundle, Anthony Martinez, Brian Nomi, Clark Doan, Jason Coughenour, Brian Yoo, Steven Romeyn, Carlos Jimenez, Jeffrey Cross. (Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Ruben Cardenas(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Michael Hsueh Hsien Chen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Jason Coughenour(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Jeffrey Cross(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Thomas Deluccia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party James Diamond(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Clark Doan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Jay Hong(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Carlos Jimenez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Blake Kibo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Carlo Lazo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Mark Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Anthony Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Brian Nomi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Darrell Mevlut Padgette(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Jeff Pierce(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party David Ramirez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Carlos Razon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Steven Romeyn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Amanda Rundle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Ethan Spann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Damien Stemley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Victor Torres(pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Chen added to party Brian Yoo(pty:pla))(Chen, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons in a Civil Action,
Att: 3 Notice of Interested Parties