Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:20-bk-30319

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Elizabeth D Katz
Case #: 3:20-ap-03012
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2020
Terminated:Mar 01, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
American Education Services, Defendant
1200 North Seventh Street
Harrisburg, PA 17105
Represented By
Gerald Glasser
Kalill, Glasser & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole M Chisholm, Plaintiff
74 Partridge Dr
Springfield, MA 01119
Represented By
Gerald Glasser
Kalill, Glasser & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, March 01, 2021
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 03/01 8:01 AM
Disposition of Adversary Number 20-3012 Judgment Entered on Complaint. (pf)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 03/01 8:02 AM
Adversary Case 20-3012 Closed. (pf)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 14, 2021
40 40 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 02/15 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 38 Order
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 02/15 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 37 Judgment
Friday, February 12, 2021
38 38 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 02/12 9:24 AM
Order dated 2/12/2021 Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. IN LIGHT OF THE JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THIS DATE, THE PRETRIAL HEARING SET FOR MARCH 19, 2021 IS CANCELED. (pf)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Judgment Fri 02/12 9:22 AM
Judgment dated 2/12/2021. See Order for Full Text. (pf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
36 36 misc Exhibit Thu 02/11 12:07 PM
Exhibit Proposed form of Judgment Related [+] filed by Defendant KeyBank National Association (Burnett, Joshua)
Related: [-] 34 Motion to Approve
Thursday, January 28, 2021
35 35 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Approval Thu 01/28 2:24 PM
Endorsed Order dated 1/28/2021 Re:34 Joint Motion filed by Defendant KeyBank National Association to Approve33 Stipulation and Agreement for Judgment. GRANTED. THE PARTIES ARE ORDERED TO FILE A PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT BY FEBRUARY 11, 2021. (pf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
34 34 motion Approve Tue 01/26 3:51 PM
Joint Motion filed by Defendant KeyBank National Association to Approve33 Stipulation and Agreement for Judgment with certificate of service. (Burnett, Joshua)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Agreement for Judgment Tue 01/26 3:50 PM
Stipulation and Agreement for Judgment By Defendant KeyBank National Association and Plaintiff Nicole M. Chisholm Related [+]. (Burnett, Joshua)
Related: [-] 7 Amended Complaint
Friday, January 08, 2021
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 01/09 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/08/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Wed 01/06 8:44 AM
Endorsed Order dated 1/6/2021 Re:29 Joint Motion filed by Creditor KeyBank, N.A. To Substitute Party. GRANTED. NO OBJECTIONS FILED. (ag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
30 30 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/16 8:34 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Creditor KeyBank, N.A. (Burnett, Joshua)
Related: [-] 29 Motion to Substitute Party
29 29 motion Substitute Party Wed 12/16 1:47 PM
Joint Motion filed by Creditor KeyBank, N.A. To Substitute Party with certificate of service (Burnett, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 12/12 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/11/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Pre-Trial Order
27 27 misc Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference Fri 12/11 4:29 PM
Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
26 26 order Pre-Trial Order Wed 12/09 12:58 PM
Proceeding Memorandum and Order dated 12/9/2020 Re: Status Conference on1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 42(a), MADE APPLICABLE BY FED. R. BANKR. P. 7042, THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING IS CONSOLIDATED FOR TRIAL WITH ADVERSARY PROCEEDING NUMBERS 20-3013 20-3016 AND 20-3020 THE PRE-TRIAL HEARING ON THIS MATTER SET FOR JANUARY 21, 2021 HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED. THE PRE-TRIAL HEARING WILL NOW BE HEARD ON FRIDAY, MARCH 19, 2021 AT 10:00AM; THE RESCHEDULED HEARING WILL BE CONDUCTED TELEPHONICALLY; PARTIES MAY PARTICIPATE BY DIALING 888-363-4734, AND ENTERING ACCESS CODE 496 4809 WHEN PROMPTED. THE DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS EXTENDED TO 02/26/21. (pf)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Wed 12/09 12:56 PM
Status Conference Hearing Held Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. (pf)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 22, 2020
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 11/23 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 11/22/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order To Set Hearing
Friday, November 20, 2020
24 24 1 pgs order Order To Set Hearing Fri 11/20 8:59 AM
Order dated 11/20/2020 Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. A STATUS CONFERENCE IN THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING IS SET FOR DECEMBER 9, 2020 AT 11:30 A.M. SO THAT THE COURT CAN INQUIRE AS TO WHETHER THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SHOULD BE CONSOLIDATED WITH ADVERSARY PROCEEDING NUMBERS 20-3013 20-3016 AND 20-3020 THE HEARING WILL BE CONDUCTED TELEPHONICALLY. PARTIES MAY PARTICIPATE BY DIALING 888-363-4734, AND ENTERING ACCESS CODE 496 4809 WHEN PROMPTED. (pf)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 11, 2020
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 10/12 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 10/11/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing
Friday, October 09, 2020
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing Fri 10/09 12:10 PM
Endorsed Order dated 10/9/2020 Re:21 Assented To Motion filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm to Continue Pre-Trial Hearing [Re:1 Complaint]. GRANTED; THE PRE-TRIAL HEARING OF 11/18/20 IS CONTINUED TO 01/21/21 AT 2:00PM AND SHALL BE CONDUCTED BY ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE. THE CLERK WILL ISSUE THE APPROPRIATE EMAIL INVITATION IN THE DAYS BEFORE THE CONTINUED HEARING. (pf)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Continue/Cancel Hearing Fri 10/09 11:58 AM
Assented To Motion filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm to Continue Pre-Trial Hearing [Re:1 Complaint]. (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 10/08 1:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 10/07/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Pre-Trial Order
Monday, October 05, 2020
19 19 order Pre-Trial Order Mon 10/05 1:11 PM
Scheduling and Pre-Trial Order dated 10/5/2020 Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 11:00 AM at a Telephonic Hearing. See Order for Full Text. IMPORTANT DEADLINES - DO NOT IGNORE. (pf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
18 18 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 09/30 1:23 PM
Summons Service Executed on Nicole M Chisholm 9/22/2020 (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/30 10:50 AM
Answer to Complaint with certificate of service filed by KeyBank, N.A.. (Burnett, Joshua)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 09/30 10:38 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by William J. Amann with certificate of service filed by Creditor KeyBank, N.A. (Amann, William)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 09/30 10:37 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Joshua A. Burnett with certificate of service filed by Creditor KeyBank, N.A. (Burnett, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2020
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 09/25 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 09/24/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion to Amend
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
13 13 court Alias Summons Issued Tue 09/22 11:10 AM
Alias Summons Issued on The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust Related [+]. Date Issued 9/22/2020, Answer Due 10/22/2020. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (pf)
Related: [-] 7 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm
12 12 court Alias Summons Issued Tue 09/22 10:58 AM
DISREGARD. Alias Summons Issued on American Education Services Related [+]. Date Issued 9/22/2020, Answer Due 10/22/2020. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (pf) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Disregard - see doc. #13. (pf)
Related: [-] 7 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend Tue 09/22 10:56 AM
Endorsed Order dated 9/22/2020 Re:8 Motion filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm to Amend7 Amended Complaint. ALLOWED. NO OBJECTIONS HAVE BEEN FILED. (pf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/03 11:43 AM
Amended Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Amend
9 9 order Court's Order of Deficiency Thu 09/03 10:16 AM
Court's Order of Deficiency Re:8 Motion to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. The deadline to cure the deficiency is 9/10/2020 at 04:30 PM. (pf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
8 8 motion Amend Tue 08/25 2:24 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm to Amend [Re:7 Amended Complaint] with certificate of service. (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/25 2:02 PM
Amended Complaint by Gerald Glasser on behalf of Nicole M Chisholm against all defendants. Related [+]. (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-03012 Complaint by Nicole M Chisholm against American Education Services. Fee Amount $0.00. Nature of Suit(63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm
Att: 1 Motion to Amend Complaint
Monday, August 03, 2020
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 08/03 2:35 PM
Summons Service Executed on Nicole M Chisholm 7/29/2020 (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2020
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Fri 07/31 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 07/30/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Court's Order of Deficiency
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
4 4 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Wed 07/29 11:16 AM
Adversary Cover Sheet Related [+] filed by Defendant American Education Services (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 07/28 4:40 PM
Summons Issued on American Education Services. Answer Due 8/27/2020. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (ag)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Court's Order of Deficiency Tue 07/28 4:38 PM
Court's Order of Deficiency Related [+]. The deadline to cure the deficiency is 8/4/2020 at 04:30 PM. (ag)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/28 4:21 PM
Adversary case 20-03012 Complaint by Nicole M Chisholm against American Education Services. Fee Amount $0.00. Nature of Suit(63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan))(Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]