New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael E Farbiarz
Referred: Cathy L Waldor
Case #: 2:20-cv-09621
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2020
Terminated:Jun 27, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 25, 2021 6:27 AM EST
Counter Claimant
MORGAN SCHILLING
Represented By
JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN
Robinson Miller LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP.
Represented By
JEREMY A. COHEN
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
MORGAN SCHILLING
Represented By
JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN
Robinson Miller LLC
contact info
Notice Only
PHV A. RICHARD M. BLAIKLOCK
Notice Only
PHV CHARLES R. WHYBREW
Plaintiff
HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP.
Represented By
JEREMY A. COHEN
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 23 2022
OPINION. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 12/23/2022. (wh)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
251 251 2 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Thu 08/08 1:20 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 8/7/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
250 250 misc Proposed Order Wed 08/07 12:47 PM
Proposed Order of Dismissal Pursuant to Settlement by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP.. (COHEN, JEREMY)
Related: [-]