Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:20-bk-11884
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2020
Terminated:Jun 14, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Dec 09, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Tonopah Solar Energy, LLC
11 Gabbs Pole Line Road
Tonopah, NV 89049
Represented By
Matthew Barry Lunn
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Jared W Kochenash
Young Conaway
contact info
Allison S Mielke
Young Conaway
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
466 466 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Tue 06/14 10:10 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Tonopah Solar Energy, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/16/2022 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Kochenash, Jared)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 06/14 2:08 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (NR)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
465 465 claims Claims Register Mon 06/13 3:29 PM
Final Claims Register Numerical . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Gallerie, Bridget)
Related: [-]
464 464 claims Claims Register Mon 06/13 3:28 PM
Final Claims Register Alphabetical . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Gallerie, Bridget)
Related: [-]
463 463 claims Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135 Mon 06/13 3:14 PM
Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135. Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Gallerie, Bridget)
Related: [-]