Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11240

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:20-ap-50773
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2020
Terminated:Apr 06, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.
www.omniagentsolutions.com 5955 DeSoto Avenue, Suite #100
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
East West Bancorp, Inc.
135 North Los Robles Avenue 7th Floor
Pasadena, CA 91101
Represented By
East West Bancorp, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Eric Schwarz
5955 DeSoto Avenue Suite 100
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Eric Schwarz
contact info
Defendant
Brian Osborne
5955 DeSoto Avenue Suite 100
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Brian Osborne
contact info
Plaintiff
Howley Law PLLC, Liquidating Trustee for the GUE Debtor Liquidation Trust
711 Louisiana Suite 1850
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
David B. Stratton
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/06 8:40 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50773 Closed (BJM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
25 25 misc Certificate of Service Tue 03/23 9:23 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Howley Law PLLC. (Listwak, Kenneth)
Related: [-] 24
Monday, March 22, 2021
24 24 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 03/22 12:38 PM
Order of Dismissal Related [+] Order Signed on 3/22/2021. (CMB)
Related: [-] 22
Friday, March 19, 2021
23 23 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Fri 03/19 9:29 AM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion of the Liquidating Trustee to Dismiss the Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Filed by Howley Law PLLC. (Stratton, David)
Related: [-] 22
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
22 22 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding - Motion Wed 03/03 2:21 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Howley Law PLLC. Objections due by 3/17/2021. (Stratton, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, January 21, 2021
21 21 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 01/21 1:42 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Committee Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 1/21/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Capuzzi, Kevin)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Thu 01/21 1:05 PM
Order Approving (I) Settlement Agreement Between The Debtor Liquidation Trust and Omni Agent Solutions, Inc. d/b/a Omni Management Group, Eric Schwarz, Brian Osborne and East West Bank and (II) Bar of Certain Claims Related [+] Order Signed on 1/21/2021. (LJJ)
Related: [-] 17
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Executed Settlement Agreement
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
19 19 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing - Notice Tue 01/19 3:16 PM
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing Filed by Committee Liquidation Trustee Hearing scheduled for 1/21/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Capuzzi, Kevin)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Tue 01/19 10:13 AM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion of the Liquidating Trustee for Entry of an Order Approving Settlement and Resolving Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Filed by Howley Law PLLC. (Stratton, David)
Related: [-] 17
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Thursday, December 31, 2020
17 17 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Thu 12/31 1:40 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 [Motion of the Liquidating Trustee for Entry of an Order Approving Settlement and Resolving Adversary Proceeding] Filed by Howley Law PLLC. Hearing scheduled for 1/21/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 1/14/2021. (Stratton, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/02 10:25 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Howley Law PLLC. (Listwak, Kenneth)
Related: [-] 15
Thursday, October 29, 2020
15 15 2 pgs order Order Thu 10/29 11:12 AM
Order Rescheduling Mediation Related [+] Order Signed on 10/29/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 14
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
14 14 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Wed 10/28 1:33 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Rescheduling of Mediation Filed by Howley Law PLLC. (Stratton, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Proposed Order
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, October 09, 2020
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/09 5:39 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Howley Law PLLC. (Listwak, Kenneth)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, October 08, 2020
12 12 2 pgs order Order Thu 10/08 3:47 PM
Order Approving The Stipulation Of The Parties Regarding Mediation Of The Adversary Proceeding, Extension Of The Defendants Response Deadline To The Second Amended Complaint, And Rescheduling Of The Pretrial Conference Related [+] Order Signed on 10/8/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 11
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
11 11 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Tue 10/06 3:33 PM
Certification of Counsel / Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation of the Parties Regarding Mediation of the Adversary Proceeding, Extension of the Defendants' Response Deadline to the Second Amended Complaint, and Rescheduling of the Pretrial Conference Filed by Howley Law PLLC. (Stratton, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Proposed Order
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Tue 09/15 8:54 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Howley Law PLLC. (Stratton, David)
Related: [-] 5 ,8 ,9
9 9 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 09/15 8:45 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants East West Bank, Omni Agent Solutions, Inc., Brian Osborne, Eric Schwarz. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 11/16/2020. (Listwak, Kenneth)
Related: [-] ument1 ,5 ,8
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Monday, September 14, 2020
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 09/14 2:41 PM
Second Amended Complaint to Modify Party Filed by Howley Law PLLC Related [+] (Stratton, David)
Related: [-] 1 ,5 ,7
Friday, September 11, 2020
7 7 1 pgs order Order Fri 09/11 4:25 PM
Order Granting Plaintiff Leave To File Second Amended Complaint Related [+] Order Signed on 9/11/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 6
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Second Amended Complaint
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
6 6 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Tue 09/08 6:41 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Second Amended Complaint Related [+] Filed by Howley Law PLLC.
Related: [-] 1 ,5
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order (with attached Exhibit 1- Second Amended Complaint) (Stratton, David
Friday, August 07, 2020
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 08/07 12:37 PM
Amended Complaint to Add additional fact information Filed by Howley Law PLLC Related [+] AP Summons Served due date: 11/5/2020. (Stratton, David)
Related: [-] 1
4 4 notice Withdrawal of Document - Notice Fri 08/07 10:33 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Pleading [regarding Corrected Complaint] Related [+] Filed by Howley Law PLLC (Listwak, Kenneth)
Related: [-] 3
Thursday, July 30, 2020
3 3 misc Exhibit Thu 07/30 11:19 AM
Exhibit(s) [Corrected Complaint] Related [+] Filed by Howley Law PLLC. (Stratton, David)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 07/29 6:54 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50773 LSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9894671, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 07/29 6:40 PM
Adversary case 20-50773 Complaint by Howley Law PLLC, Liquidating Trustee for the GUE Debtor Liquidation Trust against Omni Agent Solutions, Inc., East West Bancorp, Inc., Eric Schwarz, Brian Osborne. Fee Amount $350 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))). (Stratton, David)
Related: [-]