Member Case
Lead case is: 4:20-bk-33768

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:20-bk-33776
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2020
Terminated:Sep 10, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Mood Media North America, LLC
2100 South IH-35 Frontage Rd Suite 201
Austin, TX 78704
Represented By
Matthew D Cavenaugh
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, September 10, 2020
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 09/10 10:42 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (TylerLaws)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 01, 2020
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/01 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/01/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Joint Administration
Friday, July 31, 2020
3 3 court No Creditor Mailing List Fri 07/31 3:55 PM
No Creditor Mailing List (JacquelineMataadi)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 07/31 4:06 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-33776 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22320280. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2020
1 1 28 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Thu 07/30 1:40 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Mood Media North America, LLC. (Cavenaugh, Matthew)
Related: [-]