Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-05419

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:20-ap-00094
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2020
Terminated:Jan 28, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Alex Ingredients, Inc.
Represented By
Mark A. Amendola
Martyn And Associates Co., Lpa
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregory B Crampton, Trustee
Nicholls & Crampton, P.A. PO Box 18237
Raleigh, NC 27619
Represented By
Gregory B Crampton
Nicholls & Crampton, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
crditcrd none (ADI) Wed 09/28 2:25 PM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Payment of AP Fee([LINK 20-00094 5-SWH] ) [admis,payfeeap] ( 350.00), Receipt Number A16940364, Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
admis Pay Fee-AP Wed 09/28 2:23 PM
Payment of AP Filing Fee in the amount of $350 filed by Gregory B Crampton on behalf of Gregory B Crampton, Trustee. (Crampton, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 30, 2021
19 19 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Sun 01/31 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Notice Date 01/30/2021. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Thursday, January 28, 2021
18 18 order Dismiss and Close AP (Compromise, Conversion, Dismissal of BK Case) Thu 01/28 9:27 AM
Order Dismissing and Closing Adversary Proceeding 5:20-ap-94 closed . (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
17 17 notice Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 01/25 5:56 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by John Paul H. Cournoyer, Gregory B Crampton on behalf of Gregory B Crampton, Trustee. (Crampton, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
utility Matter Removed from Calendar Fri 01/22 11:10 AM
Matter Removed from Calendar Prior to Hearing - reschedule Trial if compromise is not approved AP Settled Related [+] (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 9 Trial
Sunday, January 17, 2021
16 16 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 01/18 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 01/17/2021. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
Friday, January 15, 2021
15 15 order Compromise Fri 01/15 2:34 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Related [+] (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, December 17, 2020
14 14 misc Certificate of Service (Not for Summons) Thu 12/17 7:54 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Gregory B Crampton on behalf of Gregory B Crampton, Trustee Related [+]. (Crampton, Gregory)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Motion
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
13 13 misc Notice of Motion Tue 12/15 2:48 PM
Notice of Motion filed by Gregory B Crampton on behalf of Gregory B Crampton, Trustee Related [+]. (Crampton, Gregory)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Approve Compromise With Alex Ingredients, Inc.
12 12 motion Compromise Tue 12/15 2:47 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise With Alex Ingredients, Inc. filed by Gregory B Crampton on behalf of Gregory B Crampton, Trustee Related [+]. (Crampton, Gregory)
Related: [-] ument no.1 Complaint
Thursday, October 22, 2020
11 11 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 10/23 1:54 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 10/22/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
10 10 utility Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Tue 10/20 1:43 PM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Related [+] (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] ument no.9 Scheduling Order - Trial
9 9 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/20 1:40 PM
Scheduling Order. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due: waived. Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures due: 1/4/2021. Discovery due: 2/17/2021. Mediation Notification due 1/4/2021. Amendment(s) due by 12/4/2020. Motions due by 3/22/2021. Pretrial Order due by 4/2/2021. Trial date set for 4/28/2021 at 10:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
8 8 admis Pre-Conference Report Wed 09/30 1:18 PM
Pre-Conference Report filed by John Paul H. Cournoyer, Gregory B Crampton on behalf of Alex Ingredients, Inc., Gregory B Crampton, Trustee Related [+]. (Crampton, Gregory)
Related: [-] 6 Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report
Monday, August 31, 2020
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 08/31 4:46 PM
Summons Service Executed on Alex Ingredients, Inc. 8/20/2020. filed by Gregory B Crampton on behalf of Gregory B Crampton, Trustee. (Crampton, Gregory)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Directing Filing of Joint Report Mon 08/31 10:06 AM
Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report Pre-Conference Report due by 9/30/2020. . (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility Calendar - Schedule Mon 08/31 9:47 AM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/28 2:10 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by John Paul H. Cournoyer on behalf of Alex Ingredients, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2020
3 3 misc Certificate of Service (Not for Summons) Thu 07/30 4:08 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Gregory B Crampton on behalf of Gregory B Crampton, Trustee. (Crampton, Gregory)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 07/30 3:48 PM
Summons Issued on Alex Ingredients, Inc. Answer Due 08/31/2020 (Crampton, Gregory)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/30 3:48 PM
Adversary case 20-00094 5. Complaint by Gregory B. Crampton against Alex Ingredients, Inc. (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Crampton, Gregory)
Related: [-]