Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03054
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 31, 2020
Terminated:May 03, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
E. Paul Cauley, Jr.
Comerica Bank Building 1717 Main Street Suite 5400
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
E. Paul Cauley, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman, solely in his capacity as the Liquidating Trustee of the Sedgwick LLP Liquidating Trust
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jason B. Komorsky
Brutzkus Gubner Rozansky Weber Seror LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Wed 05/03 9:46 AM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3054. (rs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
41 41 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/18 10:38 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 40 Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
40 40 stip Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 04/18 10:35 AM
Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. Case Management Action due after 05/2/2023. (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
court Hearing Dropped Tue 04/18 10:50 AM
Hearing Dropped Related [+] (Hearing of 6/22/23 is vacated per the stipulation to dismiss proceeding filed on 4/18/23.) (ds)
Related: [-] 32 Scheduling Order
Thursday, September 29, 2022
39 39 order Stipulation Thu 09/29 2:23 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Stay Adversary Proceeding Pending Consummation of Settlement Agreement Related [+]. (lp)
Related: [-] 37 Stipulation for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
38 38 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/29 1:39 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 37 Stipulation for Miscellaneous Relief
37 37 stip Miscellaneous Relief Thu 09/29 1:34 PM
Stipulation, to Stay Adversary Proceeding Pending Consummation of Settlement Agreement Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
order Judge Docket Order Thu 09/29 2:26 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) On September 29, 2022, the court entered an order (Dkt. 39) staying this proceeding and all related dates and deadlines pending consummation of the parties' settlement. Assuming no stipulation of dismissal is filed prior to June 23, 2023, the court will treat the pre-trial conference scheduled for that date as a status conference. Related [+]. (Fuchs, Cheyanna)
Related: [-] 39 Order on Stipulation
Thursday, August 04, 2022
36 36 misc Certificate of Service Thu 08/04 12:06 PM
Certificate of Service Certificate of Service of Notice of Completed Mediation Without Settlement Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 35 Notice
35 35 notice Notice Thu 08/04 12:03 PM
Notice Regarding Notice of Completed Mediation Without Settlement Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 32 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
34 34 order Withdraw As Attorney Tue 05/31 4:00 PM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw Appearance Related [+] (ds)
Related: [-] 33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
33 33 motion Withdraw As Attorney Tue 05/31 11:53 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
32 32 order Scheduling Order Fri 04/01 5:09 PM
Scheduling Order Pre-Trial Hearing scheduled for 6/22/2023 at 02:00 PM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Discovery due by 12/16/2022. (ds)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Dropped Fri 04/01 5:11 PM
Hearing Dropped Related [+] (Hearing vacated per order filed on 4/1/22.) (ds)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Thursday, March 31, 2022
31 31 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/31 1:53 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 30 Status Conference Statement
30 30 misc Status Conference Statement Thu 03/31 1:26 PM
Status Conference Statement Joint Status Conference Statement and Discovery Plan Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, January 10, 2022
29 29 notice Notice of Change of Address (Multi) Mon 01/10 5:57 PM
Notice of Change of Address Notice of Change of Firm Name . (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
28 28 order Stipulation Mon 11/15 3:40 PM
Order Approving Sixth Stipulation Requesting An Order To Continue Initial Scheduling Conference Hearing And All Attendant Dates Pursuant To LocalBankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. (ds)
Related: [-] 26 Stipulation to Continue Hearing filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/15 2:07 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 26 Stipulation to Continue Hearing
26 26 stip Continue Hearing Mon 11/15 2:04 PM
Sixth Stipulation to Continue Hearing re Scheduling Conference Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/7/2022 at 02:00 PM Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars for 1 ,. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Friday, July 23, 2021
25 25 order Stipulation Fri 07/23 10:07 AM
Order Approving Fifth Stipulation Requesting An Order To Continue InitialScheduling Conference Hearing And All Attendant Dates Pursuant To LocalBankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 23 Stipulation to Continue Hearing filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/23 7:46 AM
Certificate of Service of Fifth Stipulation Requesting an Order to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference Hearing and All Attendant Dates Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 23 Stipulation to Continue Hearing
23 23 stip Continue Hearing Fri 07/23 7:42 AM
Fifth Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Initial Scheduling Conference and All Attendant Dates Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2021 at 02:00 PM Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars for 1 ,. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Thursday, May 20, 2021
22 22 order Stipulation Thu 05/20 1:32 PM
Order Approving Fourth Stipulation Requesting An Order To Continue InitialScheduling Conference Hearing And All Attendant Dates Pursuant To Local Rule6-2(a) And Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 20 Stipulation to Continue Hearing filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/20 12:46 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 19 Order on Stipulation,20 Stipulation to Continue Hearing
20 20 stip Continue Hearing Thu 05/20 12:38 PM
Fourth Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Intial Scheduling Conference Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/5/2021 at 02:00 PM Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars for 1 ,. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Friday, February 05, 2021
19 19 order Stipulation Fri 02/05 4:46 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Requesting An Order To Continue Initial Scheduling Conference Hearing And All Attendant Dates Pursuant To Local Rule 6-2(a) And Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation to Continue Hearing filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/05 1:25 PM
Certificate of Service of Stipulation Requesting An Order To Continue Initial Scheduling Conference Hearing And All Attendant Dates Pursuant To Local Rule 6-2(a) And Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2; and Order Approving Stipulation Requesting An Order To Continue Initial Scheduling Conference Hearing And All Attendant Dates Pursuant To Local Rule 6-2(a) And Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation to Continue Hearing
17 17 stip Continue Hearing Fri 02/05 12:48 PM
Stipulation to Continue Hearing Stipulation Requesting An Order To Continue Initial Scheduling Conference Hearing And All Attendant Dates Pursuant To Local Rule 6-2(a) And Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/3/2021 at 02:00 PM Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars for 1 ,. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Friday, November 20, 2020
16 16 order Stipulation Fri 11/20 12:18 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Requesting An Order To Continue Initial SchedulingConference Hearing And All Attendant Dates At Least 90 Days Pursuant To Local Rule 6-2(a) And Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation to Continue Hearing filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Thursday, November 19, 2020
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Thu 11/19 2:55 PM
Certificate of Service of Stipulation Requesting an Order to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference Hearing and All Attendant Dates at Least 90 Days Pursuant to Local Rule 6-2(a) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation to Continue Hearing
14 14 stip Continue Hearing Thu 11/19 2:52 PM
Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Initial Scheduling Conference and All Attendant Dates at Least 90 Days Pursuant to Local Rule 6-2(a) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 3/4/2021 at 02:00 PM Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars for 1 ,. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Thursday, October 01, 2020
13 13 notice Notice of Change of Address (Multi) Thu 10/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Change of Address for Attorney Danisha Brar. (yw)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/01 1:04 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Defendant E. Paul Cauley Jr. (Brar, Danisha)
Related: [-] 11 Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/30 5:02 PM
Answer to Complaint OF DEFENDANT E. PAUL CAULEY, JR. TO LIQUIDATING TRUSTEES COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND FOR ARBITRATION Filed by E. Paul Cauley Jr.. (Benvenutti, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/24 10:10 AM
Certificate of Service re Declaration of Joseph M. Rothberg Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 9 Declaration
9 9 misc Declaration Thu 09/24 10:08 AM
Declaration of Joseph M. Rothberg in support of service of summons and complaint Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 5 Summons Service Executed
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
8 8 order Continue Hearing Tue 09/15 3:36 PM
Order Approving Stipulation To Extend Time In Which Defendants May Respond To TheComplaint And To Continue The Initial Status Conference Pursuant To Local Rule 6-1(a) And Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 09/15 2:28 PM
Certificate of Service re Stipulation Requesting an Order to Extend Time In Which Defendant May Respond to the Complaint and to Continue the Initial Status Conference Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
6 6 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Tue 09/15 2:26 PM
Stipulation Requesting an Order to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,5 Summons Service Executed
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Tue 09/15 3:36 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 9/15/20. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Friday, September 11, 2020
order Judge Docket Order Fri 09/11 11:35 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) This proceeding is set to come before the court on October 1, 2020 for a scheduling conference. The court issued its Summons on July 31, 2020 (Dkt. 2). Pursuant to FRBP 7012(a), Defendant's answer was due no later than August 31, 2020, but has not been filed. The court has reviewed Plaintiff's certificate of service of the Summons (Dkt. 5), which reflects that Plaintiff served Defendant with process by first class mail sent to Faegre Dinker Biddle & Reaath, Comerica Bank Building, 1717 Main Street, Ste. 5400, Dallas, TX 75201. According to Plaintiff's Complaint (Para. 9), Defendant is an individual. Under FRBP 7004(b)(3), individuals can be served with process by first class mail sent to their residence or place of business. Nothing in the complaint or certificate of service permits the court to determine whether the address Plaintiff used for service of process satisfies FRBP 7004(b)(3). Accordingly, on or before September 24, 2020, Plaintiff shall file and serve a declaration that provides the court with information sufficient to permit a determination as to whether FRBP 7004(b)(3) has been satisfied, prior to the October 1 scheduling conference. Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, August 07, 2020
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 08/07 9:17 AM
Summons Service Executed on E. Paul Cauley Jr. 8/6/2020 . (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 08/05 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/05/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, July 31, 2020
3 3 order Discovery Fri 07/31 10:33 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (pw)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 07/31 10:32 PM
Summons Issued on E. Paul Cauley Jr. Answer Due 8/31/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/1/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (pw)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/31 10:55 AM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03054 . 13 Related [+], 12, 14 Complaint by James Gansman against E. Paul Cauley Jr.. Fee Amount $350. (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet