Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joseph F Leeson, Jr
Case #: 5:20-cv-03767
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2020
Terminated:Dec 21, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Jan 30, 2021 4:44 AM EST
Defendant
PERSON DIRECTED SUPPORTS, INC.
Represented By
JEFFREY S. STEWART
White And Williams, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Oakes
Represented By
WILLIAM P. MANSOUR
Mansour Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, December 21, 2020
15 15 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Mon 12/21 1:59 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b), PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL WITHOUT COSTS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: HENRY S. PERKIN ON 12/21/20. 12/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Settlement Conference Mon 12/21 1:58 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 12/21/20. (DT) Modified on 12/21/2020 (fb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
13 13 minutes Status Conference Mon 11/30 3:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. A Telephonic Pretrial Conference was held on 11/30/20. (dt, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2020
12 12 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 11/05 10:07 AM
ORDER OF 11/5/20 THAT A TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON NOVEMBER 30, 2020 AT 2:30PM. ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: HENRY S. PERKIN ON 11/5/20. 11/5/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 11/05 10:05 AM
ORDER OF 11/5/20 THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD VIA TELEPHONE ON DECEMBER 21, 2020 AT 9:30AM.ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: HENRY S.PERKIN ON 11/5/20. 11/5/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
10 10 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Wed 11/04 1:38 PM
ORDER OF 11/4/20 THAT THE WITHIN MATTER IS REFERRED TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: HENRY S. PERKIN FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 11/4/20.11/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Scheduling Order Wed 11/04 1:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER OF 11/4/20 THAT ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE MARCH 2, 2021, ETC. DEADLINE FOR COMPLETION OF EXPERT DISCOVERY MARCH 2, 2021. ETC. ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED NOT LATER THAN MARCH 2, 2021. ETC. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/5/2021 04:00 PM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR.. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 5/10/2021 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR.. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/4/20. 11/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
8 8 minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 11/03 12:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. A Rule 16 Scheduling Conference was held on 11/2/20.(DT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 10/06 10:58 AM
NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR MONDAY, NOVEMBER 2, 2020, AT 3:30 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. VIA TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. COUNSEL WILL BE PROVIDED WITH CALL-IN INFORMATION BY EMAIL.(dja, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
6 6 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Wed 09/30 3:39 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PERSON DIRECTED SUPPORTS, INC..(STEWART, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/30 3:26 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by PERSON DIRECTED SUPPORTS, INC..(STEWART, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 08/25 12:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kenneth Oakes. PERSON DIRECTED SUPPORTS, INC. waiver sent on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (MANSOUR, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2020
3 3 2 pgs order Order Mon 08/03 4:33 PM
INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER OF 8/3/20. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR., ON 8/3/20. 8/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
2 2 trial Exhibit Mon 08/03 3:29 PM
EXHIBIT A & B to Complaint by Kenneth Oakes.. (MANSOUR, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 08/03 3:24 PM
COMPLAINT against PERSON DIRECTED SUPPORTS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14467071.), filed by Kenneth Oakes.(MANSOUR, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 08/03 3:47 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kenneth Oakes. (fb)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Mon 08/03 4:57 PM
Summons Issued as to PERSON DIRECTED SUPPORTS, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/3/2020 (bw, )
Related: [-]