Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sage M Sigler
Case #: 1:20-bk-68667
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2020
Dismissed:Oct 23, 2020
Terminated:Dec 08, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
UA Investments LLC
Atlanta 311 Heritage Park Trce NW
Kennesaw, GA 30144
Represented By
Eric E. Thorstenberg
Eric E. Thorstenberg, Attorney At Law,
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 10 seconds ago
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
misc 06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed Tue 12/08 10:36 AM
Case Closed (cws)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2020
misc Meeting of Creditors Not Held - Case Converted/Dismissed Tue 11/10 3:41 PM
Meeting of creditors was not held because case has been converted or dismissed. (aam)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 25, 2020
33 33 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order of Dismissal Mon 10/26 2:07 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order of Dismissal Notice Date 10/25/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Employ (408) Mon 10/26 2:07 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Employ Notice Date 10/25/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2020
31 31 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (PDF Order) Fri 10/23 1:33 PM
ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the above-styled case is hereby DISMISSED. Service by BNC Entered on 10/23/2020. Related [+] (cws)
Related: [-] 18
30 30 order Application to Employ Fri 10/23 8:10 AM
Order GRANTING Application to Employ Eric E. Thorstenberg for UA Investments LL Related [+]. Service by BNC.. Entered on 10/23/2020. (cws)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
29 29 misc Operating Report Tue 10/20 7:58 PM
Operating Report for: Debtor, UA Investments LLC, 09/01/2020 through 09/30/2020 filed by Eric E. Thorstenberg on behalf of UA Investments LLC. (Thorstenberg, Eric)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Operating Report Tue 10/20 7:56 PM
Operating Report for: Debtor, UA Investments, LLC, 08/03/2020 through 08/31/2020 filed by Eric E. Thorstenberg on behalf of UA Investments LLC. (Thorstenberg, Eric)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc P-Schedule G Tue 10/20 6:30 PM
Amended Schedule G ,Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, filed by Eric E. Thorstenberg on behalf of UA Investments LLC. (Thorstenberg, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2020
26 26 6 pgs motion Approve Use of Cash Collateral, Motion to Mon 10/19 7:52 PM
Amended Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral and to Provide for Adequate Protection filed by Eric E. Thorstenberg on behalf of UA Investments LLC. Related [+] (Thorstenberg, Eric)
Related: [-] 25
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
misc Hearing Held Wed 10/07 4:17 PM
Hearing Held - Order to be submitted re: Related [+] (njm)
Related: [-] 14
misc Hearing Wed 10/07 4:18 PM
Hearing Held and Continued. Continued Hearing to be held on 10/21/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1201, Atlanta, Related [+] (njm)
Related: [-] 18
Friday, October 02, 2020
25 25 motion Approve Use of Cash Collateral, Motion to Fri 10/02 7:19 PM
Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral and Notice of Hearing filed by Eric E. Thorstenberg on behalf of UA Investments LLC. Hearing to be held on 10/21/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1201, Atlanta, (Thorstenberg, Eric)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 19, 2020
24 24 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Assignment of Hearing (165) Sun 09/20 12:53 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Hearing Notice Date 09/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
23 23 misc Notice of Hearing/Rescheduled Hearing (BK) Thu 09/17 8:39 AM
Notice of Hearing on Debtor's Application to Employ Attorney Under General Retainer. Service by BNC. Hearing to be held on 10/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1201, Atlanta, Related [+] (njm)
Related: [-] 14
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
22 22 crditcrd Autodocket of Credit Card Wed 09/09 5:05 PM
Receipt of Payment of Fees on Motion for Relief from Stay 20-68667 sms) [misc,228] ( 181.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 54354493. Fee Amount 181.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#
misc Hearing Wed 09/09 10:08 AM
Hearing Held and Continued. Continued hearing to be held on 10/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1201, Atlanta, Related [+] (njm)
Related: [-] 18
misc 00-Payment of Fees on Motion for Relief from Stay Wed 09/09 5:04 PM
Payment of Fees on Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Aaron R. Anglin on behalf of Aspen LLC. Related [+] (Anglin, Aaron)
Related: [-] 18
Friday, September 04, 2020
20 20 misc 0-Certificate of Service Fri 09/04 3:44 PM
Certificate of Service of Order and Notice of Expedited Hearing On Aspen LLCs Emergency Motion For Relief From The Automatic Stay And Motion To Dismiss filed by Aaron R. Anglin on behalf of Aspen LLC. Related [+] (Anglin, Aaron)
Related: [-] 19
19 19 3 pgs notice Order and Notice Fri 09/04 2:51 PM
Order And Notice Of Expedited Hearing On Aspen LLCs Emergency Motion For Relief From The Automatic Stay And Motion To Dismiss. Service by Counsel and BNC. Hearing to be held on 9/9/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1201, Atlanta (The Expedited Hearing will be conducted telephonically), Entered on 9/4/2020. Related [+] (jlc)
Related: [-] 18
18 18 motion 05-Motion to Dismiss Case (FOR OTHER) Fri 09/04 9:08 AM
Emergency Motion to Dismiss Case for Cause and for Relief from Automatic Stay filed by Aaron R. Anglin on behalf of Aspen LLC. (Anglin, Aaron)
Related: [-]
court Miscellaneous Deficiencies Fri 09/04 2:37 PM
Document is incorrect or deficient in the following manner: Missing Fee, $181.00 Related [+] (law)
Related: [-] 18
Thursday, September 03, 2020
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/03 2:39 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices of Counsel for Pinson's Filed by Thomas D. Richardson on behalf of Pinson's, Inc.. (Richardson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
misc Meeting of Creditors Held but Continued Mon 09/14 9:15 AM
Section 341(a) meeting held but continued for production of additional documents or information Telephonic 341 Meeting to be held on 10/30/2020 at 03:00 PM (See previous notice for call-in information). (aam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
16 16 misc Small Business Balance Sheet Tue 09/01 8:20 PM
Small Business Balance Sheet , Small Business Cash-Flow Statement filed by Eric E. Thorstenberg on behalf of UA Investments LLC. (Thorstenberg, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/28 9:57 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Aaron R. Anglin on behalf of Aspen LLC. (Anglin, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
14 14 10 pgs motion 07-Application to Employ Wed 08/19 2:40 PM
Application to Employ Eric E. Thorstenberg as Attorney for Debtor , UA Investments LLC, filed by Eric E. Thorstenberg on behalf of UA Investments LLC. (Thorstenberg, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
13 13 misc P-Schedule A/B Mon 08/17 7:08 PM
Schedule A/B filed by Eric E. Thorstenberg on behalf of UA Investments LLC. (Thorstenberg, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
12 12 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding List of Creditors Mon 08/10 12:49 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding List of Creditors Notice Date 08/07/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors Mon 08/10 12:49 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 08/07/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual Fri 08/07 12:54 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual. Notice Date 08/06/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
9 9 misc 0-Certificate of Service Wed 08/05 5:43 PM
Certificate of Service of Regarding Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case filed by Eric E. Thorstenberg on behalf of UA Investments LLC. Related [+] (Thorstenberg, Eric)
Related: [-] 7
8 8 1 pgs order Order Regarding List of Creditors Wed 08/05 8:43 AM
Order Regarding the List of Creditors with deficiencies noted. Failure to comply will result in dismissal of case without further notice. Service by BNC. List of all creditors due 8/12/2020. Entered on 8/5/2020. (jlc)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc 03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11) Wed 08/05 8:35 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11). Telephonic 341 Meeting to be held on 9/3/2020 at 10:00 AM (See notice for telephonic call-in information (Ch. 11 Atlanta)). (jlc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/04 3:32 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Shawna Staton on behalf of United States Trustee. (Staton, Shawna)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc P-Amendment to Voluntary Petition Tue 08/04 3:11 PM
Amendment to Voluntary Petition to: Correct Debtor(s) Name, with Certificate of Service and Original Signature Pages filed by Eric E. Thorstenberg on behalf of UA Investments LLC. Related [+] (Thorstenberg, Eric)
Related: [-] 1
4 4 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual) Tue 08/04 12:56 PM
Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual). Service by BNC. Schedule(s)A/B due by 8/17/2020. List of Equity Security Holders due 8/17/2020. Tax Return Date: 8/10/2020. Balance Sheet Date: 8/10/2020.Statement of Operations Due 8/10/2020. Cash Flow Statement due 8/10/2020 (jlc)
Related: [-]
court Miscellaneous Deficiencies Tue 08/04 1:03 PM
Document is incorrect or deficient in the following manner: Missing Signature(s), Document is illegible or incomplete, (missing signature page for petition) Related [+] (jlc)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, August 03, 2020
3 3 misc P-Corporate Resolution Mon 08/03 8:39 PM
Corporate Resolution Regarding Authority to Sign & File Petition filed by Eric E. Thorstenberg on behalf of UA Investments LLC. (Thorstenberg, Eric)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Autodocket of Credit Card Mon 08/03 8:36 PM
Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-68667 [misc,4002aty] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 54181300. Fee Amount 1717.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 24 pgs misc Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 08/03 8:33 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Non-Individual Fee Collected $ 1717, Filed by Eric E. Thorstenberg of Eric E. Thorstenberg, Attorney at Law, on behalf of UA Investments LLC. Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 02/1/2021., Disclosure Statement due by 02/1/2021. (Thorstenberg, Eric)
Related: [-]