New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referred: Lois Bloom
Case #: 1:20-cv-01356
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2020
Terminated:Dec 10, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 26, 2021 4:00 AM EST
Defendant
Jane Doe 3
Defendant
Tia Smith
Defendant
Services for the UnderServed Inc.
Defendant
Byron Savage
Defendant
Taylor Rivers
Defendant
Charles Rivers
Defendant
Patryce McQueen
Defendant
Shaquawana Kirkland
Defendant
John Doe 1
Defendant
Jane Doe 2
Defendant
Jane Doe 1
Defendant
Jaleesa Harrison
Defendant
Shanna Guthrie
Defendant
Aqiyla Dunlap
Defendant
Tiasha Codginton
Defendant
Karlene Austin
Defendant
Gloria Abitol
Plaintiff
Keyona Loyd
PO Box 381024
Brooklyn, NY 11238

GPO Oct 21 2020
ORDER Dismissing 1 Complaint without prejudice. The court grants 2 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, but for the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the complaint is dismissed. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). In light of this court's duty to liberally construe pro se complaints and in an abundance of caution, plaintiff is granted 30 days leave to file an amended complaint. Cruz v. Gomez, 202 F.3d 593 (2d Cir. 2000).Should plaintiff elect to file an amended complaint, it must be captioned "AMENDED COMPLAINT" and bear the docket number 20-CV-1356 (KAM)(LB). Plaintiff must set forth in the statement of claim sufficient factual content to allow the court to draw the reasonable inference that each defendant named in the amended complaint is liable for the misconduct or harm caused to plaintiff, and that such conduct is in violation of a federal constitutional or statutory right. The amended complaint shall replace the original complaint in its entirety. That is, the amended complaint must stand on its own without reference to the original complaint. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within the time allowed or show good cause why she cannot comply, an order and judgment dismissing this action shall be entered.No summons shall issue at this time and all further proceedings shall be stayed for 30 days. The court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. Coppedge v. United States, 269 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is ordered to serve a copy of this Order on plaintiff at her last known address and to note service on the docket. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 10/21/2020. (Brasky, Michael)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, December 10, 2020
7 7 order Judgment - Clerk Thu 12/10 11:30 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT, that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice, 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3); that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), any appeal would not be taken in good faith; and that in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal, Coppedge v. United States, 269 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on 12/10/2020) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
6 6 order Order(Other) Tue 12/08 12:13 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). Plaintiff has failed to respond to this court's October 20, 2020 Memorandum and Order. (ECF No.5 .) The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment, serve plaintiff with a copy of this order, and note service on the docket. The court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. Coppedge v. United States , 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk is respectfully requested to close this case. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 12/8/2020. (Urquiola, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
5 5 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order Dismissing Case Wed 10/21 11:50 AM
ORDER Dismissing1 Complaint without prejudice. The court grants2 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , but for the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the complaint is dismissed. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). In light of this court's duty to liberally construe pro se complaints and in an abundance of caution, plaintiff is granted 30 days leave to file an amended complaint. Cruz v. Gomez , 202 F.3d 593 (2d Cir. 2000). Should plaintiff elect to file an amended complaint, it must be captioned "AMENDED COMPLAINT" and bear the docket number 20-CV-1356 (KAM)(LB). Plaintiff must set forth in the statement of claim sufficient factual content to allow the court to draw the reasonable inference that each defendant named in the amended complaint is liable for the misconduct or harm caused to plaintiff, and that such conduct is in violation of a federal constitutional or statutory right. The amended complaint shall replace the original complaint in its entirety. That is, the amended complaint must stand on its own without reference to the original complaint. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within the time allowed or show good cause why she cannot comply, an order and judgment dismissing this action shall be entered. No summons shall issue at this time and all further proceedings shall be stayed for 30 days. The court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. Coppedge v. United States , 269 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is ordered to serve a copy of this Order on plaintiff at her last known address and to note service on the docket. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 10/21/2020. (Brasky, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 24, 2020
4 4 notice Notice(Other) Wed 08/26 3:44 PM
Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge filed by Keyona Loyd. (Herrera, Isaiah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 08/04 4:47 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2020
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 08/04 4:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Keyona Loyd. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/04 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Keyona Loyd. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet