New Jersey District Court
Judge:Noel L Hillman
Referred: Matthew J Skahill
Case #: 1:20-cv-10075
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2020
Terminated:Aug 09, 2021
Case in other court:Superior Court of New Jersey, Camden County, CAM-L-002085-20
Last checked: Monday Feb 01, 2021 5:09 AM EST
Defendant
NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
JEFFREY ALLEN BEER, JR.
Riker Danzig Scherer Hyland & Perretti LLP
contact info
LANCE J. KALIK
Riker Danzig Scherer Hyland & Perretti, LLP
contact info
Defendant
SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
JEFFREY ALLEN BEER, JR.
Riker Danzig Scherer Hyland & Perretti LLP
contact info
LANCE J. KALIK
Riker Danzig Scherer Hyland & Perretti, LLP
contact info
Defendant
SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By
ELIZABETH J. SHER
Day Pitney LLP
contact info
Defendant
SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW ENGLAND
Represented By
ELIZABETH J. SHER
Day Pitney LLP
contact info
Defendant
TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
JAMES L. BROCHIN
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Defendant
HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
JAMES L. BROCHIN
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Defendant
SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP, INC.
Represented By
ELIZABETH J. SHER
Day Pitney LLP
contact info
Defendant
THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Represented By
JAMES L. BROCHIN
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Notice Only
PHV SARAH D.. GORDON
Plaintiff
ANY GARMENT CLEANERS SOMERDALE, LLC
Represented By
ALAN C. MILSTEIN
Sherman, Silverstein, Kohl, Rose & Podolsky, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Z BUSINESS PROTOTYPES LLC
Represented By
ALAN C. MILSTEIN
Sherman, Silverstein, Kohl, Rose & Podolsky, PC
contact info

GPO Aug 09 2021
OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/9/2021. (dmr)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, August 09, 2021
41 41 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 08/09 11:41 AM
ORDER granting Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company's28 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/9/2021. (dmr)
Related: [-]
40 40 18 pgs order Opinion Mon 08/09 11:35 AM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/9/2021. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
39 39 misc Statement 7.1.1 Third Party Funding Thu 08/05 1:44 PM
Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
38 38 misc Statement Tue 06/29 4:18 PM
STATEMENT - Plaintiff's Disclosure of Third-Party Litigation Funding Statement Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1.1. by ANY GARMENT CLEANERS SOMERDALE, LLC, Z BUSINESS PROTOTYPES LLC.(MILSTEIN, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, June 28, 2021
37 37 order Order Mon 06/28 3:25 PM
TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to L. CIV. R. 7.1.1 (eff. June 21, 2021), the parties, including intervening parties, are required to file a statement (separate from any pleading) containing specific information regarding third-party litigation funding. See L. Civ. R. 7.1.1(a)(1-3). This statement shall be filed within 45 days of the effective date of this Rule, or no later than August 5, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 6/28/2021. (se, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
36 36 misc Letter Mon 04/26 7:54 PM
Letter from James L. Brochin.(BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15
Monday, March 15, 2021
35 35 misc Letter Mon 03/15 2:37 PM
Letter from James L. Brochin.(BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 03/15 9:18 AM
Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider no longer assigned to case. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
34 34 respm Brief in Support of Motion Tue 03/02 10:04 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY re28 MOTION to Dismiss (BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
33 33 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/02 4:22 PM
NOTICE by Z BUSINESS PROTOTYPES LLC(MILSTEIN, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Monday, February 15, 2021
32 32 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/15 12:13 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by ANY GARMENT CLEANERS SOMERDALE, LLC re28 MOTION to Dismiss (MILSTEIN, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
31 31 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/09 12:11 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadlines as to28 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 2/16/2021, Replies due by 3/2/2021. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 2/9/2021. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
30 30 misc Stipulation Mon 02/01 9:03 PM
STIPULATION re Briefing Schedule by TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Thu 01/21 9:23 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, SARAH D.. GORDON, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
29 29 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Wed 01/20 5:40 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sarah D. Gordon to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/20 9:26 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to28 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 2/16/2021 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
28 28 motion Dismiss Tue 01/19 10:20 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.(BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Exhibit J,
Att: 12 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
27 27 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/13 3:26 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sarah D. Gordon, Esquire. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/12/2021. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
26 26 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 12/28 3:10 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by ANY GARMENT CLEANERS SOMERDALE, LLC.(MILSTEIN, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Amended Complaint with Track Changes,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A 2019-2020,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A 2020-2021,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
25 25 3 pgs order Order Wed 12/16 11:59 AM
CONSENT ORDER dismissing claims asserted by Plaintiff Z Business Prototypes LLC against Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company and The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/14/2020. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
qc QC - Pro Hac Vice request Wed 10/14 9:59 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel submitted by JAMES BROCHIN on 10/13/2020 cannot be processed until pro hac counsel has been admitted and the application fee paid. Please review the Electronic Notification for Pro Hac Vice instructions on our website. Counsel is advised to resubmit the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel once Sarah Gordon has been admitted. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
24 24 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Tue 10/13 6:45 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sarah D. Gordon to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11496185.) (BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 28, 2020
minutes Status Conference Mon 10/05 11:31 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/28/2020. (se, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2020
23 23 misc Proposed Order Mon 09/14 4:09 PM
Proposed Order on Consent by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY re 21 Order,14 MOTION to Sever claims against Hartford Defendants MOTION to Remand claims against Selective Defendants .(KALIK, LANCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Sunday, September 13, 2020
22 22 misc Proposed Order Sun 09/13 8:41 PM
Proposed Order on Consent by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY re 21 Order,14 MOTION to Sever claims against Hartford Defendants MOTION to Remand claims against Selective Defendants .(KALIK, LANCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
21 21 order Order Wed 09/02 5:18 PM
TEXT ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED by September 17, 2020, the parties shall serve a Consent Order addressing plaintiffs Motion to Sever and Remand [Doc. No. 14]. An initial conference will be scheduled after the motion is decided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/2/20. (Shaw, A)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Certification Wed 09/02 12:11 PM
Certification of Citizenship (Joint Certification) on behalf of HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Fri 09/04 2:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Initial Conference by phone held on 9/2/2020. (se, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
19 19 misc Application/Petition Tue 09/01 1:37 PM
APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission of Sarah D. Gordon Pro Hac Vice for by HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.(BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of James L. Brochin,
Att: 2 Certification of Sarah D. Gordon,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
qc QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney Tue 09/01 11:48 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certification of Sarah D. Gordon attached to the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice18 submitted by James L. Brochin on 8/31/2020 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER SCANNED SIGNATURE using the "Certification" event found under Responses and Replies. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/01 11:49 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah D. Gordon . Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/31 6:16 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah D. Gordon by HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.(BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of James L. Brochin,
Att: 2 Certification of Sarah D. Gordon,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
17 17 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 08/31 10:49 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ANY GARMENT CLEANERS SOMERDALE, LLC, Z BUSINESS PROTOTYPES LLC. (MILSTEIN, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
16 16 order Order Fri 08/28 2:39 PM
TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to counsel's request, the time of the initial conference on September 2, 2020 is hereby changed to 3:30 p.m. The call-in number and access codes are unchanged. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/28/20. (Shaw, A)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order Fri 08/28 2:35 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold Oral Argument via telephone on September 28, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. on Plaintiffs Motion to Sever [Doc. No. 14]. The call-in number for the call is 1-888-684-8852, access code 3436790#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/28/20. (Shaw, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
14 14 motion Sever Remand to State Court Thu 08/27 1:04 PM
MOTION to Sever claims against Hartford Defendants , MOTION to Remand claims against Selective Defendants by All Plaintiffs.(MILSTEIN, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 08/27 2:36 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to14 MOTION to Sever claims against Hartford Defendants MOTION to Remand claims against Selective Defendants . Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2020
13 13 order Order Fri 08/21 4:00 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is prepared to go forward with the initial conference scheduled on September 2, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. via telephone. The call-in number for the call is 1-888-684-8852, access code 3436790#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/21/20. (Shaw, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
12 12 1 pgs order Order Wed 08/19 3:54 PM
ORDER granting letter request to extend Scottsdale's time go respond to the Complaint until 9/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/19/2020. (dmr)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Letter Wed 08/19 11:21 AM
Letter from Lance J. Kalik to Judge Schneider with Consent of Plaintiffs Counsel Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint.. (KALIK, LANCE)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Wed 08/19 9:53 AM
Clerk's Text Order - The document10 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW ENGLAND, SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP, INC., SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/4/2020. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
10 10 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 08/18 1:35 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants. Attorney ELIZABETH J. SHER for SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA,ELIZABETH J. SHER for SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW ENGLAND,ELIZABETH J. SHER for SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP, INC. added. (SHER, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
9 9 order Stipulation and Order Mon 08/17 10:15 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the Hartford Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint until 9/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/14/2020. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 13, 2020
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/13 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY ALLEN BEER, JR on behalf of NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY (BEER, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
7 7 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Wed 08/12 2:41 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company and Scottsdale Insurance Company. Attorney LANCE J. KALIK for NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY,LANCE J. KALIK for SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY added. (KALIK, LANCE)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Wed 08/12 3:49 PM
Clerk's Text Order - The document7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/26/2020. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
6 6 misc Stipulation Tue 08/11 6:01 PM
STIPULATION by HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2020
5 5 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Thu 08/06 9:28 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 9/2/2020 02:00 PM in Camden - Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/6/2020. (cry, )
Related: [-]
order Order re Diversity of Citizenship (Hillman) Thu 08/06 9:23 AM
Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties,[LINK:click here] , no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/6/2020. (cry, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Thu 08/06 9:33 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information: In the future please make sure all alias information is added using the add alias icon . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 08/05 10:11 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 08/05 10:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. d/b/a THE HARTFORD. (BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 08/05 10:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, identifying HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 08/05 10:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY,, THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. d/b/a THE HARTFORD, TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY from Superior Court of New Jersey, Camden County, case number CAM-L-002085-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11170191), filed by HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY,, THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. d/b/a THE HARTFORD, TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.(BROCHIN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 08/06 8:56 AM
Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
Related: [-]