USA v. Enedeo Rodriguez, Jr.
Original Case: 2:17-cv-00119
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-pr-02442 |
Type | prisoner / state / other |
Nature of Suit | 690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other |
Case Filed: | Aug 04, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 31, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 01, 2020 3:40 AM CDT |
Appellant
ENEDEO RODRIGUEZ, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
2014 NISSAN ALTIMA 2.5L, VIN 1N4AL3AP9EC195679
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/01/2020 3:34 AM CDT |
Tuesday, August 04, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 State prisoner's federal other case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Enedeo Rodriguez Jr. by 08/10/2020. Fee or IFP forms due on 08/19/2020 for Appellant Enedeo Rodriguez Jr.. Transcript information sheet due by 08/19/2020. [1] [7098834] 20-2442 --[Edited 08/05/2020 by CG] (CG) [Entered: 08/05/2020 12:11 PM] | |
Att: 1 14 pgs Prisoner Other Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Fee Notice |