Miller v. Diners Club International Ltd.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50781 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 05, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 13, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Diners Club International Ltd.
2500 Lake Cook Road
Riverwoods, IL 60015 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 13, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 10/13 9:43 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50781 Closed (TM) |
||
Wednesday, October 12, 2022 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Wed 10/12 3:24 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Case # 20-50781 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
31 | 31
order
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
Thu 04/21 5:02 PM
Order Approving Plaintiff's Seventh Motion for an Order Approving the Settlement of an Avoidance Action Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Order Signed on 4/21/2022. (RC) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2022 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Multi)
Wed 04/20 9:55 AM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding 9019 Motion (Adv. # 20-50781 Filed by George L. Miller. (Capuzzi, Kevin) |
|
Friday, March 25, 2022 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion
Fri 03/25 9:39 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 (7th) Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/5/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/15/2022. (Capuzzi, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, February 03, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Status Report
Thu 02/03 12:39 PM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Action Assigned to The Honorable John T. Dorsey Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, January 18, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 01/18 3:22 PM
Notice of Settlement BMO Harris Bank, N.A. Filed by George L. Miller (JC) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 01/18 12:22 PM
Notice of Settlement Filed by George L. Miller (Gentile, John) |
|
Thursday, October 28, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Thu 10/28 2:09 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Requests Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, October 01, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Status Report
Fri 10/01 7:15 PM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Actions Assigned to the Honorable John T. Dorsey Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, September 30, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Service
Thu 09/30 5:15 PM
Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, September 27, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 09/27 2:29 PM
Notice of Service Initial Disclosures of Defendant, BMO Harris Bank, N.A. Filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Kerrick, Daniel) |
|
Monday, September 13, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 09/13 1:32 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Establish Procedures and Deadlines Governing This Adversary Proceeding Order Signed on 9/13/2021. (RC) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, September 08, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Wed 09/08 3:04 PM
Certification of Counsel Submitting Proposed Order Approving Stipulation to Establish Procedures and Deadlines Governing this Adversary Proceeding Filed by George L. Miller. (Capuzzi, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, July 15, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 07/15 2:44 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint Filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A. Mediation due date: 11/12/2021.(Kerrick, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, June 18, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
cmp
Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 06/18 12:38 PM
Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant BMO Harris Bank N.A.. Tickle due by: 8/17/2021. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, June 17, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 06/17 10:26 AM
Amended Complaint to Modify Party Filed by George L. Miller AP Summons Served due date: 9/15/2021. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives | ||
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 06/14 12:19 PM
Order Approving Stipulation (I) Reopening the Adversary Proceeding and (II) Vacating Default and Default Judgment Order Signed on 6/14/2021. (RC) |
|
Att: 1 | ||
utility
Reopen AP Case
Mon 06/14 2:54 PM
Adversary Case Reopened. (JS) |
||
Wednesday, June 09, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Wed 06/09 1:27 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation (I) Reopening the Adversary Proceeding and (II) Vacating Default and Default Judgment Filed by Diners Club International Ltd.. (Falgowski, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Monday, December 28, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 12/28 11:37 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50781 Closed (SH) |
||
Thursday, December 10, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 12/11 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/10/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 12/10 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/09/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, December 08, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
court
VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest
Tue 12/08 11:21 AM
Default Judgment against Diners Club International Ltd. Tickle due by: 12/22/2020. Signed on 12/8/2020. (LBr) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default
Mon 12/07 11:05 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Diners Club International Ltd Signed on 12/7/2020. (ATo) |
|
Wednesday, December 02, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv)
Wed 12/02 11:51 AM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order Judgement by Default | ||
9 | 9
motion
Request for Entry of Default (Adv)
Wed 12/02 11:31 AM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order Entry of Default | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, November 19, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Thu 11/19 4:54 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller, George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Capuzzi, Kevin) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing - Notice
Thu 11/19 12:14 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Capuzzi, Kevin) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 09/25 2:15 PM
Certificate of Service of Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
10
pgs
order
Order
Tue 09/22 10:04 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. Signed on 9/15/2020 (JS) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary)
Fri 08/28 2:18 PM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, August 10, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Mon 08/10 3:16 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Diners Club International Ltd.. Pretrial Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 08/05 6:11 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50781 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9903980, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Wed 08/05 5:50 PM
Adversary case 20-50781 Complaint by George L. Miller against Diners Club International Ltd.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |