Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-ap-50784
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2020
Terminated:Mar 16, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Nexus Partners LLC
1684 Kitchener Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94087
Represented By
Nexus Partners LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Jennifer R. Hoover
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 16, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/16 8:39 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50784 Closed (JS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/04 1:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/04 1:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Monday, March 01, 2021
15 15 court VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest Mon 03/01 3:43 PM
Default Judgment against Nexus Partners, LLC. Related [+] Tickle due by: 3/15/2021. Signed on 3/1/2021. (SS)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 03/01 3:34 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Nexus Partners, LLC Related [+] Signed on 3/1/2021. (SS)
Related: [-] 12
13 13 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Mon 03/01 11:01 AM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 12 12
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order Judgement by Default
12 12 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Mon 03/01 10:59 AM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order Entry of Default
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, November 19, 2020
11 11 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 11/19 4:54 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller, George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Capuzzi, Kevin)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing - Notice Thu 11/19 12:14 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Capuzzi, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
9 9 cmp Alias Summons Wed 10/28 4:03 PM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Nexus Partners LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 12/23/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/28/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, September 25, 2020
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Fri 09/25 2:15 PM
Certificate of Service of Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
7 7 10 pgs order Order Tue 09/22 9:57 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Signed on 9/15/2020 (JS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2020
6 6 cmp Alias Summons Thu 09/10 3:53 PM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Nexus Partners LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 11/9/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Proof of Service
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 09/10 6:32 AM
Amended Complaint to Modify Party Filed by George L. Miller Related [+] (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, August 28, 2020
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Fri 08/28 2:18 PM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 08/10 3:19 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Nexus Partners LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 08/05 6:11 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50784 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9903980, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 08/05 6:02 PM
Adversary case 20-50784 Complaint by George L. Miller against Nexus Partners LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives